Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2026739

EP2026739 - APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR THE TREATMENT OF TISSUE WITH ULTRASOUND ENERGY BY DIRECT CONTACT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  25.05.2012
Database last updated on 15.08.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip25.05.2012Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 27.06.2012  [2012/26]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Babaev, Eilaz
5929 Baker Road, Suite 470
Minnetonka, MN 55345 / US
[2009/09]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2009/09]
Representative(s)Miller, James Lionel Woolverton , et al
Kilburn & Strode LLP
Lacon London
84 Theobalds Road
London WC1X 8NL / GB
[N/P]
Former [2009/09]Miller, James Lionel Woolverton , et al
Kilburn & Strode, 20 Red Lion Street
London WC1R 4PJ / GB
Application number, filing date07798169.406.06.2007
[2009/09]
WO2007US70507
Priority number, dateUS2006044922007.06.2006         Original published format: US 449220
[2009/09]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2007143686
Date:13.12.2007
Language:EN
[2007/50]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2026739
Date:25.02.2009
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.12.2007
[2009/09]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US12.09.2008
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.11.2011
ClassificationInternational:A61H1/00
[2009/09]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/09]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:GERÄT UND VERFAHREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON GEWEBE MIT ULTRASCHALLENERGIE DURCH DIREKTEN KONTAKT[2009/09]
English:APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR THE TREATMENT OF TISSUE WITH ULTRASOUND ENERGY BY DIRECT CONTACT[2009/09]
French:APPAREIL ET PROCEDE POUR LE TRAITEMENT DE TISSUS AVEC UNE ENERGIE ULTRASONORE PAR CONTACT DIRECT[2009/09]
Entry into regional phase23.12.2008National basic fee paid 
23.12.2008Search fee paid 
23.12.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
23.12.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure14.10.2008Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
23.12.2008Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
23.12.2008Examination requested  [2009/09]
03.01.2012Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2012/26]
08.02.2012Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2012/26]
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.02.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
11.05.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.06.201105   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[Y]US6799729  (VOIC DAN [US]) [Y] 1-15 * column 4, line 36 - column 47; figures 5,6 * * column 5, line 25 - column 6, line 43 * * column 1, line 38 - line 40 *;
 [Y]US6267594  (HUGO BURKHARD [DE]) [Y] 1,3,14 * column 5, line 14 - line 16 * * column 9, line 41 - line 67 *;
 [Y]EP0238667  (SUMITOMO BAKELITE CO [JP]) [Y] 1,2,4-8,11-13 * page 10, line 4 - line 14; figures 2-4 * * page 8, line 3 *;
 [Y]EP1192907  (ETHICON ENDO SURGERY [US]) [Y] 1,9,10,15 * paragraph [0003] * * paragraph [0006] * * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0018]; figures 1-4 * * paragraph [0016] *;
 [A]US6080170  (NASH JOHN E [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * column 7, line 40 - line 57 *;
 [A]US2002103497  (SATOU YUICHIROU [JP]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0057]; figure 6 *
International search[X]US6799729  (VOIC DAN [US])