Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2044495

EP2044495 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR TRANSPORTING INVENTORY ITEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  09.09.2011
Database last updated on 09.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip14.09.2016Change - representative 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Amazon Technologies, Inc.
P.O. Box 8102
Reno, NV 89507 / US
[2013/07]
Former [2011/52]For all designated states
Kiva Systems, Inc.
300 Riverpark Drive
North Reading, MA 01864 / US
Former [2009/15]For all designated states
Kiva Systems, Inc.
225 Wildwood Avenue
Woburn, MA 01801 / US
Inventor(s)01 / WURMAN, Peter, R.
7620 Sutcliffe Drive
Raleigh, NC 27613 / US
02 / D'ANDREA, Raffaello
101 Rhodes Hall
Ithaca, NY 14853 / US
03 / BARBEHENN, Michael, T.
6 Mcmahon Road
Bedford, MA 01730 / US
04 / HOFFMAN, Andrew, E.
96 Palmer Street
Arlington, MA 02474 / US
05 / MOUNTZ, Michael, C.
1039 Massachusetts Avenue, Apt. 502
Cambridge, MA 02138 / US
 [2009/15]
Representative(s)D Young & Co LLP
120 Holborn
London EC1N 2DY / GB
[N/P]
Former [2010/14]Lawrence, John , et al
Barker Brettell LLP 138 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham
B16 9PW / GB
Former [2009/15]Ljungberg, Robert
Baker Botts (UK) LLP 41 Lothbury
London EC2R 7HF / GB
Application number, filing date07798296.508.06.2007
[2009/15]
WO2007US70742
Priority number, dateUS2006042506619.06.2006         Original published format: US 425066
[2009/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2007149712
Date:27.12.2007
Language:EN
[2007/52]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2044495
Date:08.04.2009
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.12.2007
[2009/15]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2044495
Date:12.10.2011
Language:EN
[2011/41]
Type: B8 Corrected title page of specification 
No.:EP2044495
Date:21.03.2012
[2012/12]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP02.10.2008
ClassificationInternational:G05B19/418, G05D1/02, B65G1/04
[2009/15]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/15]
TitleGerman:SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN FÜR DEN TRANSPORT VON INVENTARSTÜCKEN[2009/15]
English:SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR TRANSPORTING INVENTORY ITEMS[2009/15]
French:SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE TRANSPORT D'ARTICLES D'INVENTAIRE[2009/15]
Entry into regional phase16.01.2009National basic fee paid 
16.01.2009Designation fee(s) paid 
16.01.2009Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure16.01.2009Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
16.01.2009Examination requested  [2009/15]
01.07.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
11.01.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.04.2011Communication of intention to grant the patent
23.08.2011Fee for grant paid
23.08.2011Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP11005390.7  / EP2407845
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  01.07.2009
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  10.07.2012  13.07.2012  ADMISSIBLE
Oleaster GmbH
Schönstr. 12
81543 München / DE
Opponent's representative
Kindermann, Peter
Patentanwälte Kindermann
Postfach 10 02 34
85593 Baldham / DE
 02  11.07.2012  17.07.2012  ADMISSIBLE
Telejet Kommunikations GmbH
Sodener Str. 6
61462 Königstein / DE
Opponent's representative
Weickmann & Weickmann PartmbB
Postfach 860 820
81635 München / DE
 [2016/31]
Former [2015/14]
Opponent(s)01  10.07.2012  13.07.2012  ADMISSIBLE
Oleaster GmbH
Schönstr. 12
81543 München / DE
Opponent's representative
Kindermann, Peter
Patentanwalte Kindermann
Postfach 10 02 34
85593 Baldham / DE
 02  11.07.2012  17.07.2012  ADMISSIBLE
Telejet Kommunikations GmbH
Sodener Str. 6
61462 Königstein / DE
Opponent's representative
Weickmann & Weickmann
Maximilianstrasse 4b
82319 Starnberg / DE
Former [2012/33]
Opponent(s)01  10.07.2012   
Oleaster GmbH
Schönstr. 12
81543 München / DE
Opponent's representative
Kindermann, Peter
Kindermann Patentanwälte Postfach 10 02 34
85593 Baldham / DE
 02  11.07.2012   
Telejet Kommunikations GmbH
Sodener Str. 6
61462 Königstein / DE
Opponent's representative
Alber, Norbert
Hansmann & Vogeser
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Albert-Roßhaupter-Straße 65
81369 München / DE
17.08.2012Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
29.04.2013Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
05.04.2016Date of oral proceedings
20.04.2016Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
20.04.2016Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition03.06.2016Appeal received No.  T1357/16
17.08.2016Statement of grounds filed
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.06.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
25.06.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
27.06.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU08.06.2007
AT12.10.2011
BE12.10.2011
CY12.10.2011
CZ12.10.2011
DK12.10.2011
EE12.10.2011
FI12.10.2011
IT12.10.2011
LT12.10.2011
LV12.10.2011
MT12.10.2011
NL12.10.2011
PL12.10.2011
RO12.10.2011
SE12.10.2011
SI12.10.2011
SK12.10.2011
TR12.10.2011
BG12.01.2012
GR13.01.2012
ES23.01.2012
IS12.02.2012
PT13.02.2012
IE08.06.2012
LU08.06.2012
CH30.06.2012
LI30.06.2012
MC30.06.2012
[2014/34]
Former [2014/27]AT12.10.2011
BE12.10.2011
CY12.10.2011
CZ12.10.2011
DK12.10.2011
EE12.10.2011
FI12.10.2011
IT12.10.2011
LT12.10.2011
LV12.10.2011
MT12.10.2011
NL12.10.2011
PL12.10.2011
RO12.10.2011
SE12.10.2011
SI12.10.2011
SK12.10.2011
TR12.10.2011
BG12.01.2012
GR13.01.2012
ES23.01.2012
IS12.02.2012
PT13.02.2012
IE08.06.2012
LU08.06.2012
CH30.06.2012
LI30.06.2012
MC30.06.2012
Former [2014/21]AT12.10.2011
BE12.10.2011
CY12.10.2011
CZ12.10.2011
DK12.10.2011
EE12.10.2011
FI12.10.2011
IT12.10.2011
LT12.10.2011
LV12.10.2011
MT12.10.2011
NL12.10.2011
PL12.10.2011
RO12.10.2011
SE12.10.2011
SI12.10.2011
SK12.10.2011
TR12.10.2011
BG12.01.2012
GR13.01.2012
ES23.01.2012
IS12.02.2012
PT13.02.2012
IE08.06.2012
CH30.06.2012
LI30.06.2012
MC30.06.2012
Former [2013/35]AT12.10.2011
BE12.10.2011
CY12.10.2011
CZ12.10.2011
DK12.10.2011
EE12.10.2011
FI12.10.2011
IT12.10.2011
LT12.10.2011
LV12.10.2011
MT12.10.2011
NL12.10.2011
PL12.10.2011
RO12.10.2011
SE12.10.2011
SI12.10.2011
SK12.10.2011
BG12.01.2012
GR13.01.2012
ES23.01.2012
IS12.02.2012
PT13.02.2012
IE08.06.2012
CH30.06.2012
LI30.06.2012
MC30.06.2012
Former [2013/29]AT12.10.2011
BE12.10.2011
CY12.10.2011
CZ12.10.2011
DK12.10.2011
EE12.10.2011
FI12.10.2011
IT12.10.2011
LT12.10.2011
LV12.10.2011
NL12.10.2011
PL12.10.2011
RO12.10.2011
SE12.10.2011
SI12.10.2011
SK12.10.2011
BG12.01.2012
GR13.01.2012
ES23.01.2012
IS12.02.2012
PT13.02.2012
IE08.06.2012
CH30.06.2012
LI30.06.2012
MC30.06.2012
Former [2012/28]BE12.10.2011
CY12.10.2011
LT12.10.2011
LV12.10.2011
NL12.10.2011
SE12.10.2011
SI12.10.2011
GR13.01.2012
IS12.02.2012
PT13.02.2012
Former [2012/24]BE12.10.2011
LT12.10.2011
LV12.10.2011
NL12.10.2011
SE12.10.2011
SI12.10.2011
GR13.01.2012
IS12.02.2012
PT13.02.2012
Former [2012/23]BE12.10.2011
LT12.10.2011
NL12.10.2011
GR13.01.2012
IS12.02.2012
PT13.02.2012
Former [2012/21]BE12.10.2011
LT12.10.2011
IS12.02.2012
Former [2012/20]LT12.10.2011
Cited inInternational search[Y]US2002008005  (EGUCHI KOJI [JP]) [Y] 1-16 * abstract * * paragraphs [0004] , [0008] , [0009] , [0023] , [0024] , [0027] , [0029] * * paragraphs [0036] , [0042] , [0057] , [0064] * * figures 1A,1B *;
 [Y]US2002154974  (FUKUDA ISAO [JP], et al) [Y] 1-16 * abstract * * paragraphs [0001] , [0002] , [0037] , [0040] , [0044] - [0047] * * paragraphs [0074] - [0089] * * figures 1-3,9 *;
 [Y]US6652213  (MITCHELL PAT R [US], et al) [Y] 1-16 * abstract * * column 3, line 31 - column 4, line 32 * * column 8, line 1 - line 29 * * figures 1,6 *
by applicantUS2002154974
 US2002008005