Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2026857

EP2026857 - FAIL SAFE DUAL CHAMBER PERITONEAL DIALYSIS/INFUSION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  05.09.2014
Database last updated on 18.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip05.09.2014Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 08.10.2014  [2014/41]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Baxter International Inc.
One Baxter Parkway
Deerfield, IL 60015 / US
For all designated states
Baxter Healthcare S.A.
Thurgauerstrasse 130
8152 Glattpark (Opfikon) / CH
[2010/01]
Former [2009/09]For all designated states
Baxter International Inc.
One Baxter Parkway
Deerfield, IL 60015 / US
For all designated states
Baxter Healthcare SA
Hertistrasse 2 Wallisellen
8304 Zurich / CH
Inventor(s)01 / KEELEY, Robert C.
22606 Bridle Trail
Kildeer, Illinois 60047 / US
 [2009/09]
Representative(s)Potter Clarkson
The Belgrave Centre
Talbot Street
Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB
[N/P]
Former [2013/37]Potter Clarkson LLP
The Belgrave Centre
Talbot Street
Nottingham
NG1 5GG / GB
Former [2009/09]Dee, Ian Mark , et al
Potter Clarkson LLP Park View House 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham
NG1 5DD / GB
Application number, filing date07798298.108.06.2007
[2009/09]
WO2007US70744
Priority number, dateUS2006042334509.06.2006         Original published format: US 423345
[2009/09]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2007146794
Date:21.12.2007
Language:EN
[2007/51]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2026857
Date:25.02.2009
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.12.2007
[2009/09]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP24.04.2008
ClassificationInternational:A61M1/28, A61M39/22, A61J1/00
[2009/09]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/09]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:AUSFALLSICHERES ZWEIKAMMER-PERITONEAL-DIALYSE-/INFUSIONSSYSTEM[2009/09]
English:FAIL SAFE DUAL CHAMBER PERITONEAL DIALYSIS/INFUSION SYSTEM[2009/09]
French:SYSTÈME À DOUBLE CHAMBRE ET SÉCURITÉ INTÉGRÉE DE DIALYSE/PERFUSION PÉRITONÉALE[2009/09]
Entry into regional phase03.12.2008National basic fee paid 
03.12.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
03.12.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure03.12.2008Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
03.12.2008Examination requested  [2009/09]
25.11.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.04.2014Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2014/41]
14.05.2014Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2014/41]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  25.11.2013
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.06.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
25.06.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
27.06.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
26.06.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
27.06.2013Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.06.201408   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[A]WO9508299  (TRAVENOL LAB ISRAEL LTD [IL], et al) [A] 1,16 * abstract *;
 [AD]US5209347  (FABISIEWICZ EUGENE [US], et al) [AD] 1,16 * column A; figure - *