Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2039154

EP2039154 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR INSERTING MEDIA BASED ON KEYWORD SEARCH [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  13.04.2012
Database last updated on 09.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.11.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
12.11.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Invidi Technologies Corporation
750 College Road East, Suite 175
Princeton, New Jersey 08540-6617 / US
[2009/13]
Inventor(s)01 / DOWNEY, David
100 Warren Street
Jersey City, NJ 07302 / US
02 / ANDERSON, Bruce J.
116 Davenport Drive
Chesterfield, NJ 08515 / US
03 / BOULET, Daniel, A.
32 Meadowwood Cr.
Sherwood Park, Alberta T8A 0L7 / CA
04 / WILSON, Daniel, C.
402, 12331 Jasper Avenue NW
Edmonton, Alberta T5N 3K6 / CA
 [2009/13]
Representative(s)D Young & Co LLP
120 Holborn
London EC1N 2DY / GB
[N/P]
Former [2009/13]Meldrum, David James , et al
D Young & Co 120 Holborn
London EC1N 2DY / GB
Application number, filing date07798463.112.06.2007
[2009/13]
WO2007US71044
Priority number, dateUS20060804460P12.06.2006         Original published format: US 804460 P
US2007076197612.06.2007         Original published format: US 761976
[2009/13]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2007146961
Date:21.12.2007
Language:EN
[2007/51]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2039154
Date:25.03.2009
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.12.2007
[2009/13]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US06.11.2008
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.04.2011
ClassificationInternational:H04N7/10, H04N7/025
[2009/13]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/13]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR MEDIENEINGABE AUF DER BASIS VON STICHWORTSUCHE[2009/13]
English:SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR INSERTING MEDIA BASED ON KEYWORD SEARCH[2009/13]
French:SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ POUR INSÉRER DES CONTENUS MULTIMÉDIAS D'APRÈS UNE RECHERCHE PAR MOT-CLÉ[2009/13]
Entry into regional phase09.01.2009National basic fee paid 
09.01.2009Search fee paid 
09.01.2009Designation fee(s) paid 
09.01.2009Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure09.01.2009Examination requested  [2009/13]
20.10.2011Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
16.12.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
12.04.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.06.2014Date of oral proceedings
24.06.2014Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
24.06.2014Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Appeal following examination07.07.2014Appeal received No.  T2125/14
21.10.2014Statement of grounds filed
07.05.2020Date of oral proceedings
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  16.12.2011
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.06.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
11.06.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
13.06.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
14.06.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
10.06.2013Renewal fee patent year 07
12.06.2014Renewal fee patent year 08
10.06.2015Renewal fee patent year 09
10.06.2016Renewal fee patent year 10
16.06.2017Renewal fee patent year 11
11.06.2018Renewal fee patent year 12
13.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 13
Documents cited:Search[XI]US6698020  (ZIGMOND DANIEL J [US] ET AL) [X] 1,2,4,5,7,9,15-17,20,30-34 * column 4, line 7 - column 8, line 11 * * column 10, line 35 - column 17, line 49 * [I] 3,6,8,10-14,18,19;
 [A]US2002083441  (FLICKINGER GREGORY C [US] ET AL) [A] 1-20,30-34 * paragraphs [0030] - [0065] - [0093] - [0098] *;
 [A]US6029045  (PICCO MARTIN R [US] ET AL) [A] 1-20,30-34 * column 2, line 49 - column 3, line 29 * * column 6, line 17 - column 8, line 6 * * column 9, line 40 - column 11, line 47 * * column 13, line 66 - column 14, line 16 *;
 [A]US2002056107  (SCHLACK JOHN A [US]) [A] 1-20,30-34 * the whole document *
International search[X]US7051351  (GOLDMAN PHILLIP Y [US], et al) [X] 1-48 * , Figures 3A-3B, 4 and 6; Column 7, Line 64 through Column 10, Line 51, Column 11, Lines 17-34 and Column 12, Line 50 through Column 13, Line 22 *
by applicantUS6698020