Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2046262

EP2046262 - POLYETHER-BASED PREPARATIONS AND USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusOpposition rejected
Status updated on  14.07.2017
Database last updated on 17.08.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip21.07.2017Opposition rejectedpublished on 23.08.2017  [2017/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
3M Innovative Properties Company
3M Center
P.O.Box 33427
St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US
[N/P]
Former [2009/16]For all designated states
3M Innovative Properties Company
3M Center P.O.Box 33427
St. Paul MN 55133-3427 / US
Former [2008/31]For all designated states
3M Innovative Properties Company
3M Center, Post Office Box 33427
Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US
Inventor(s)01 / KLETTKE, Thomas
ESPE Platz
D-82229 Seefeld / DE
02 / KUPPERMANN, Bernd
ESPE Platz
D-82229 Seefeld / DE
03 / GRUPP, Hendrik
ESPE Platz
D-82229 Seefeld / DE
 [2009/16]
Representative(s)Brem, Roland , et al
3M ESPE AG IP Department ESPE Platz
82229 Seefeld / DE
[2009/50]
Former [2009/16]Brem, Roland , et al
3M ESPE AG OIPC ESPE Platz
82229 Seefeld / DE
Application number, filing date07799773.224.07.2007
[2009/16]
WO2007US74162
Priority number, dateEP2006001583028.07.2006         Original published format: EP 06015830
[2009/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2008014224
Date:31.01.2008
Language:EN
[2008/05]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2046262
Date:15.04.2009
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.01.2008
[2009/16]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2046262
Date:11.01.2012
Language:EN
[2012/02]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP24.04.2008
ClassificationInternational:A61K6/10
[2009/16]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/16]
TitleGerman:AUF POLYETHER BASIERENDE ZUBEREITUNGEN UND IHRE VERWENDUNG[2009/16]
English:POLYETHER-BASED PREPARATIONS AND USE THEREOF[2009/16]
French:PRÉPARATION À BASE DE POLYETHER ET LEUR UTILISATION[2009/16]
Entry into regional phase27.01.2009National basic fee paid 
27.01.2009Designation fee(s) paid 
20.02.2009Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure27.01.2009Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
20.02.2009Examination requested  [2009/16]
28.07.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
29.10.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.08.2011Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.11.2011Fee for grant paid
08.11.2011Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  28.07.2009
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  04.10.2012  12.10.2012  ADMISSIBLE
Heraeus Kulzer GmbH
Grüner Weg 11
D-63450 Hanau / DE
Opponent's representative
Bendele, Tanja
RUHR-IP Patentanwälte
Brucker Holt 58
45133 Essen / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2012/47]
Opponent(s)01  04.10.2012  12.10.2012  ADMISSIBLE
Heraeus Kulzer GmbH
Grüner Weg 11
D-63450 Hanau / DE
Opponent's representative
Bendele, Tanja
RUHR-IP Postfach 23 01 44
45069 Essen / DE
16.11.2012Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
16.05.2013Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
07.11.2013Date of oral proceedings
10.12.2013Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
10.12.2013Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
13.04.2017Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2017/34]
16.05.2017Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
Appeal following opposition11.02.2014Appeal received No.  T0260/14
10.04.2014Statement of grounds filed
13.04.2017Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in unamended form
04.02.2014Appeal received No.  T0260/14
07.04.2014Statement of grounds filed
13.04.2017Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in unamended form
13.04.2017Date of oral proceedings
20.04.2017Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.07.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
14.07.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
12.07.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU24.07.2007
AT11.01.2012
BE11.01.2012
CY11.01.2012
CZ11.01.2012
DK11.01.2012
EE11.01.2012
FI11.01.2012
IT11.01.2012
LT11.01.2012
LV11.01.2012
MT11.01.2012
NL11.01.2012
PL11.01.2012
RO11.01.2012
SE11.01.2012
SI11.01.2012
SK11.01.2012
TR11.01.2012
BG11.04.2012
GR12.04.2012
ES22.04.2012
IS11.05.2012
PT11.05.2012
GB24.07.2012
IE24.07.2012
LU24.07.2012
FR31.07.2012
MC31.07.2012
[2014/34]
Former [2014/27]AT11.01.2012
BE11.01.2012
CY11.01.2012
CZ11.01.2012
DK11.01.2012
EE11.01.2012
FI11.01.2012
IT11.01.2012
LT11.01.2012
LV11.01.2012
MT11.01.2012
NL11.01.2012
PL11.01.2012
RO11.01.2012
SE11.01.2012
SI11.01.2012
SK11.01.2012
TR11.01.2012
BG11.04.2012
GR12.04.2012
ES22.04.2012
IS11.05.2012
PT11.05.2012
GB24.07.2012
IE24.07.2012
LU24.07.2012
FR31.07.2012
MC31.07.2012
Former [2014/21]AT11.01.2012
BE11.01.2012
CY11.01.2012
CZ11.01.2012
DK11.01.2012
EE11.01.2012
FI11.01.2012
IT11.01.2012
LT11.01.2012
LV11.01.2012
MT11.01.2012
NL11.01.2012
PL11.01.2012
RO11.01.2012
SE11.01.2012
SI11.01.2012
SK11.01.2012
TR11.01.2012
BG11.04.2012
GR12.04.2012
ES22.04.2012
IS11.05.2012
PT11.05.2012
GB24.07.2012
IE24.07.2012
FR31.07.2012
MC31.07.2012
Former [2013/35]AT11.01.2012
BE11.01.2012
CY11.01.2012
CZ11.01.2012
DK11.01.2012
EE11.01.2012
FI11.01.2012
IT11.01.2012
LT11.01.2012
LV11.01.2012
MT11.01.2012
NL11.01.2012
PL11.01.2012
RO11.01.2012
SE11.01.2012
SI11.01.2012
SK11.01.2012
BG11.04.2012
GR12.04.2012
ES22.04.2012
IS11.05.2012
PT11.05.2012
GB24.07.2012
IE24.07.2012
FR31.07.2012
MC31.07.2012
Former [2013/33]AT11.01.2012
BE11.01.2012
CY11.01.2012
CZ11.01.2012
DK11.01.2012
EE11.01.2012
FI11.01.2012
IT11.01.2012
LT11.01.2012
LV11.01.2012
NL11.01.2012
PL11.01.2012
RO11.01.2012
SE11.01.2012
SI11.01.2012
SK11.01.2012
BG11.04.2012
GR12.04.2012
ES22.04.2012
IS11.05.2012
PT11.05.2012
GB24.07.2012
IE24.07.2012
FR31.07.2012
MC31.07.2012
Former [2012/41]BE11.01.2012
CY11.01.2012
FI11.01.2012
LT11.01.2012
LV11.01.2012
NL11.01.2012
PL11.01.2012
SI11.01.2012
BG11.04.2012
GR12.04.2012
IS11.05.2012
PT11.05.2012
Former [2012/39]BE11.01.2012
FI11.01.2012
LT11.01.2012
LV11.01.2012
NL11.01.2012
PL11.01.2012
SI11.01.2012
BG11.04.2012
GR12.04.2012
IS11.05.2012
PT11.05.2012
Former [2012/37]BE11.01.2012
FI11.01.2012
LT11.01.2012
NL11.01.2012
PL11.01.2012
SI11.01.2012
BG11.04.2012
GR12.04.2012
IS11.05.2012
PT11.05.2012
Former [2012/36]BE11.01.2012
LT11.01.2012
NL11.01.2012
SI11.01.2012
BG11.04.2012
GR12.04.2012
IS11.05.2012
Former [2012/35]BE11.01.2012
LT11.01.2012
NL11.01.2012
SI11.01.2012
BG11.04.2012
IS11.05.2012
Former [2012/34]BE11.01.2012
LT11.01.2012
SI11.01.2012
IS11.05.2012
Former [2012/33]BE11.01.2012
LT11.01.2012
SI11.01.2012
Former [2012/25]SI11.01.2012
Cited inInternational search[X]US2003109596  (WANEK ERICH [DE], et al) [X] 1-17 * paragraph [0067] - paragraph [0072] * * tables 1,2 * * example - * * claim - *;
 [X]WO0243670  (3M ESPE AG [DE], et al) [X] 1-17 * page 10, line 23 - page 11, line 11 * * table 1 * * example - * * claim - *