Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2046441

EP2046441 - LEAD AND METHODS FOR BRAIN MONITORING AND MODULATION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  04.03.2011
Database last updated on 22.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip04.03.2011Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 06.04.2011  [2011/14]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Cranial Medical Systems, Inc.
4644 Geary Boulevard, Suite 152
San Francisco CA 94118 / US
[2009/16]
Inventor(s)01 / BEDENBAUGH, Purvis
4216 Dunhagan Road
Greenville, North Carolina 27858 / US
 [2009/16]
Representative(s)Clark, Jane Anne
Mathys & Squire LLP The Shard
32 London Bridge Street
London SE1 9SG / GB
[N/P]
Former [2009/16]Clark, Jane Anne
Mathys & Squire LLP 120 Holborn
London EC1N 2SQ / GB
Application number, filing date07799919.130.07.2007
[2009/16]
WO2007US74746
Priority number, dateUS20060820919P31.07.2006         Original published format: US 820919 P
US2007082854726.07.2007         Original published format: US 828547
[2009/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2008016881
Date:07.02.2008
Language:EN
[2008/06]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2046441
Date:15.04.2009
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.02.2008
[2009/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US23.10.2008
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP30.11.2009
ClassificationInternational:A61N1/05, A61N1/18, A61N1/08
[2009/16]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/16]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:ELEKTRODE UND VERFAHREN ZUR GEHIRNÜBERWACHUNG UND MODULATION[2009/16]
English:LEAD AND METHODS FOR BRAIN MONITORING AND MODULATION[2009/16]
French:DÉRIVATION ET PROCÉDÉS DE SURVEILLANCE ET DE MODULATION CÉRÉBRALE[2009/16]
Entry into regional phase16.02.2009National basic fee paid 
16.02.2009Search fee paid 
16.02.2009Designation fee(s) paid 
16.02.2009Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure16.02.2009Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
16.02.2009Examination requested  [2009/16]
01.04.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
12.10.2010Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2011/14]
15.11.2010Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2011/14]
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.07.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
08.07.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[XY]US5405375  (AYERS GREGORY M [US], et al) [X] 1-3,14,15 * the whole document * [Y] 4-8;
 [Y]US2003083724  (JOG MANDAR [CA], et al) [Y] 4,5 * paragraph [0107] *;
 [Y]US5891084  (LEE VINCENT W [US]) [Y] 6-8 * column 11, lines 6-62; figures 6,7 *;
 [X]US2005246004  (CAMERON TRACY L [CA], et al) [X] 1-3,14,15 * paragraph [0041]; figures 3a,3b,4a,4b *;
 [A]US2005015130  (GILL STEVEN STREATFIELD [GB]) [A] 1-8,14,15 * the whole document *
International search[X]US6227203  (RISE MARK T [US], et al);
 [X]US2003195602  (BOLING C LANCE [US]);
 [X]US2005222642  (PRZYBYSZEWSKI PIOTR [US], et al)