Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2059377

EP2059377 - NERVE CUFF INJECTION MOLD AND METHOD OF MAKING A NERVE CUFF [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  02.03.2012
Database last updated on 11.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip02.03.2012Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 04.04.2012  [2012/14]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Neurostream Technologies General Partnership
4780 rue Saint-Felix Suite 105 Saint-Augustin-de- Desmaures
Quebec QC G3A 2J9 / CA
[2009/52]
Former [2009/21]For all designated states
Victhom Human Bionics Inc.
4780, rue Saint-Félix, Bureau 105 Saint-Augustin-de-Desmaures
Québec G3A 2J9 / CA
Inventor(s)01 / IMBEAU, Marc-Olivier
106 rue de la Terrine
St-Augustin-de-Desmaures Québec G3A 1W8 / CA
02 / RICHARD, Martin
4089 rue de l' Eglise Thetford Mines
Québec, G6H 3B1 / CA
03 / VALLIERES, Jean-Martin
4035 de la Scie
Québec, Québec G1Y 3T4 / CA
 [2009/52]
Former [2009/21]01 / IMBEAU, Marc-Olivier
106 rue de la Terrine
St-Augustin-de-Desmaures Québec G3A 1W8 / CA
02 / RICHARD, Martin
4105, St-Dominique
Montréal, Québec H2W 2A6 / CA
03 / VALLIERES, Jean-Martin
4035 de la Scie
Québec, Québec G1Y 3T4 / CA
Representative(s)Modiano, Micaela Nadia , et al
Modiano Josif Pisanty & Staub Ltd
Thierschstrasse 11
80538 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2009/36]Modiano, Micaela Nadia , et al
Modiano Josif Pisanty & Staub Ltd Thierschstrasse 11
80538 München / DE
Former [2009/21]Modiano, Micaela Nadia , et al
Modiano Josif Pisanty & Staub Ltd Thierschstrasse 11
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date07800550.129.08.2007
[2009/21]
WO2007CA01526
Priority number, dateUS20060840698P29.08.2006         Original published format: US 840698 P
[2009/21]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2008025155
Date:06.03.2008
Language:EN
[2008/10]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2059377
Date:20.05.2009
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.03.2008
[2009/21]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CA06.03.2008
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.03.2011
ClassificationInternational:B29C45/26, A61N1/375, B29C33/12, B29C45/14, B29C45/40
[2009/21]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/21]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:SPRITZGIESSFORM FÜR NERVENMANSCHETTE UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER NERVENMANSCHETTE[2009/21]
English:NERVE CUFF INJECTION MOLD AND METHOD OF MAKING A NERVE CUFF[2009/21]
French:MOULE D'INJECTION DE MANCHON, ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DE MANCHON[2009/21]
Entry into regional phase23.03.2009National basic fee paid 
23.03.2009Search fee paid 
23.03.2009Designation fee(s) paid 
23.03.2009Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure23.03.2009Examination requested  [2009/21]
12.05.2009Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
10.06.2011Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2012/14]
15.11.2011Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2012/14]
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.08.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
27.08.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.08.201105   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[Y]CA2266999  (NEUROSTREAM TECHNOLOGIES INC [CA]) [Y] 1-20,24,25 * page 8, line 3 - line 14 * * page 16, line 11 - line 23; figures 1-11 *;
 [Y]US2006004417  (ROSSING MARTIN A [US] ET AL) [Y] 1-7,11-20,24,25 * paragraphs [0162] - [0164]; figures 22-30 *;
 [Y]US4314960  (HASS ALAN R) [Y] 8-10 * column 2, line 48 - column 3, line 54; figures 1-5 *
International search[X]CA2266999  ;
 [X]CA2139097  ;
 [X]US2006030919  ;
 [X]US5282468  ;
 [X]US5824027