Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2087472

EP2087472 - ELECTRONIC ONLINE VOTING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  26.03.2019
Database last updated on 18.05.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  09.12.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip26.03.2019New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Deutsche Telekom AG
Friedrich-Ebert-Allee 140
53113 Bonn / DE
[2009/33]
Inventor(s)01 / AHRENS, Andreas
Lorbeerweg 25
52134 Herzogenrath / DE
02 / BUCHMANN, Johannes
Heinrich-Delp-Strassse 142A
64297 Darmstadt / DE
03 / HEINOLD, Frank
Eichenstrasse 9
52159 Roetgen / DE
04 / MUES, Engelbert
Nieuwe Hertogenweg 50
NL-6291 BP Vaals / NL
05 / VOSSEL, Anton
Fenchelweg 4
52477 Alsdorf / DE
06 / Dos Santos Araujo, Roberto Samarone
Br.316-km03-Res.Maria Mendes
1835 Guanabara
Cep: 67010-000 Ananindeua/Para / BR
07 / Wiesmaier, Alexander
Fabrikweg 5
63924 Kleinheubach / DE
 [2012/11]
Former [2009/33]01 / AHRENS, Andreas
Mühlenbachstrasse 1
52134 Herzogenrath / DE
02 / BUCHMANN, Johannes
Heinrich-Delp-Strassse 142A
64297 Darmstadt / DE
03 / HEINOLD, Frank
Eichenstrasse 9
52159 Roetgen / DE
04 / MUES, Engelbert
Nieuwe Hertogenweg 50
NL-6291 BP Vaals / NL
05 / VOSSEL, Anton
Fenchelweg 4
52477 Alsdorf / DE
Representative(s)2K Patentanwälte Blasberg Kewitz & Reichel
Partnerschaft mbB
Schumannstrasse 27
60325 Frankfurt am Main / DE
[N/P]
Application number, filing date07801248.117.08.2007
[2009/33]
WO2007DE01458
Priority number, dateDE2006103966224.08.2006         Original published format: DE102006039662
[2009/33]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2008022624
Date:28.02.2008
Language:DE
[2008/09]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2087472
Date:12.08.2009
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.02.2008
[2009/33]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP28.02.2008
ClassificationInternational:G07C13/00, H04L9/32
[2009/33]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/33]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:ELEKTRONISCHES ONLINEWAHLEN-SYSTEM[2009/33]
English:ELECTRONIC ONLINE VOTING SYSTEM[2009/33]
French:SYSTÈME ÉLECTRONIQUE DE VOTE EN LIGNE[2009/33]
Entry into regional phase24.03.2009National basic fee paid 
24.03.2009Search fee paid 
24.03.2009Designation fee(s) paid 
24.03.2009Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure24.03.2009Examination requested  [2009/33]
07.12.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
29.03.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.06.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
25.10.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.01.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
01.06.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.02.2019Date of oral proceedings
25.03.2019Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
27.03.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  07.12.2016
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.08.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
31.08.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
31.08.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
31.08.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
02.09.2013Renewal fee patent year 07
01.09.2014Renewal fee patent year 08
31.08.2015Renewal fee patent year 09
31.08.2016Renewal fee patent year 10
31.08.2017Renewal fee patent year 11
31.08.2018Renewal fee patent year 12
Cited inInternational search[X]EP1571777  (FRANCE TELECOM [FR]) [X] 1-40 * abstract * * the whole document *;
 [A]  - WEN-SHENQ JUANG, CHIN-LAUNG LEI, PEI-LING YU, "A Verifiable Multi-Authorities Secret Election Allowing Abstaining from Voting", INTERNATIONAL COMPUTER SYMPOSIUM, Tainan, Taiwan, (199812), pages 1 - 21, URL: http://citeseer.ist.psu.edu/cs, (20040611), XP002284452 [A] 1-40 * page 1 - page 10 * * page 16 * * page 19 - page 20 *
 [A]  - JUANG W-S ET AL, "Fair blind threshold signatures based on discrete logarithm", COMPUTER SYSTEMS SCIENCE & ENGINEERING, SURREY, GB, (200111), vol. 16, pages 1 - 21, XP002284453 [A] 1-40