blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2087472 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2087472



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 563
22.07.2019 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
14.06.2019 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
27.05.2019 Cover sheet for fax transmission Search / examination 1
27.05.2019 English translation of the claims Search / examination 3
27.05.2019 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
27.05.2019 French translation of claims Search / examination 5
27.03.2019 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
27.03.2019 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
27.03.2019 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
27.03.2019 Text intended for grant Search / examination 32
27.03.2019 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 32
25.03.2019 Annex to a communication Search / examination 11
25.03.2019 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
25.03.2019 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
25.03.2019 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
25.03.2019 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
25.03.2019 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Search / examination 1
12.02.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
12.02.2019 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 7
12.02.2019 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 24
12.02.2019 Claims Search / examination 6
12.02.2019 Description Search / examination 24
12.02.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
01.02.2019 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
28.01.2019 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
28.01.2019 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Search / examination 2
31.12.2018 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 5
31.12.2018 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 1
31.12.2018 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 2
31.12.2018 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 7
31.12.2018 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 6
31.12.2018 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 5
31.12.2018 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
31.12.2018 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 22
31.12.2018 Claims Search / examination 5
31.12.2018 Claims Search / examination 5
31.12.2018 Claims Search / examination 1
31.12.2018 Claims Search / examination 5
31.12.2018 Claims Search / examination 5
31.12.2018 Claims Search / examination 5
31.12.2018 Description Search / examination 22
31.12.2018 Description Search / examination 2
31.12.2018 Description Search / examination 2
31.12.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 1
31.12.2018 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Search / examination 6
10.10.2018 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
09.10.2018 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
05.10.2018 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Search / examination 1
01.10.2018 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
01.10.2018 Annex to the communication Search / examination 12
01.10.2018 Summons to attend oral proceedings Search / examination 2
26.09.2018 Preparation for oral proceedings Search / examination 2
01.06.2018 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 6
01.06.2018 Claims Search / examination 5
01.06.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
01.06.2018 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
29.01.2018 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
29.01.2018 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
25.10.2017 Claims Search / examination 6
25.10.2017 Letter filed before dispatch of the 1st communication from the Examining Division(examination procedure) Search / examination 1
25.10.2017 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
28.08.2017 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
17.07.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
17.07.2017 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 1
29.06.2017 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
29.06.2017 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
29.03.2017 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 14
29.03.2017 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 3
29.03.2017 Claims Search / examination 7
29.03.2017 Description Search / examination 24
29.03.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
29.03.2017 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
07.12.2016 Annex to the communication Search / examination 5
07.12.2016 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
17.11.2016 Examination started Search / examination 1
30.08.2016 Notification regarding date of start of examination with possibility to withdraw Search / examination 1
07.12.2011 Designation of inventor Search / examination 2
07.12.2011 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 1
07.12.2011 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 1
04.11.2009 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
31.08.2009 Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor Search / examination 1
28.07.2009 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
16.07.2009 Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees Search / examination 2
16.07.2009 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
15.07.2009 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
10.03.2009 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 6
24.02.2009 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
18.03.2008 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 43
28.02.2008 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 3
28.02.2008 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 3
28.02.2008 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 42
18.10.2007 Request for correction of obvious error International Searching Authority 10
26.09.2007 Abstract International Searching Authority 1
26.09.2007 Claims International Searching Authority 13
26.09.2007 Description International Searching Authority 24
26.09.2007 Drawings International Searching Authority 3