blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2087472


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
07.06.2019 (Expected) grant published on  10.07.2019  [2019/28]
05.06.2019 New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
29.05.2019 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
29.05.2019 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
26.03.2019 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
24.03.2019 New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
30.09.2018 New entry: Date of oral proceedings
04.09.2018 New entry: Renewal fee paid
04.06.2018 New entry: Reply to examination report
07.02.2018 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
24.11.2017 New entry: Reply to examination report
04.09.2017 New entry: Renewal fee paid
23.08.2017 Change - representative
11.07.2017 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
31.03.2017 New entry: Reply to examination report
16.12.2016 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
09.12.2016 First examination report
02.09.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
04.09.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
04.09.2014 New entry: Renewal fee paid
06.09.2013 New entry: Renewal fee paid
05.09.2012 New entry: Renewal fee paid
10.02.2012 Change - inventor published on  14.03.2012  [2012/11]
10.02.2012 Change - inventor published on  14.03.2012  [2012/11]
06.09.2011 New entry: Renewal fee paid
03.09.2010 New entry: Renewal fee paid
30.10.2009 Change - extension states published on  02.12.2009  [2009/49]
04.09.2009 New entry: Renewal fee paid
10.07.2009 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  12.08.2009  [2009/33]
10.07.2009 Request for examination filed published on  12.08.2009  [2009/33]
07.07.2009 PCT data prior to European publication
01.07.2009 PCT data prior to European publication
08.05.2009 PCT data prior to European publication
04.03.2009 PCT data prior to European publication
23.10.2007 PCT data prior to European publication