Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2081792

EP2081792 - CLADDING ELEMENT WITH AN INTEGRATED RECEPTION UNIT FOR THE CONTACTLESS TRANSFER OF ELECTRICAL ENERGY AND METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  06.09.2013
Database last updated on 24.08.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip17.07.2015Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): HU
published on 19.08.2015  [2015/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ThyssenKrupp Transrapid GmbH
Henschelplatz 1
34127 Kassel / DE
[2009/31]
Inventor(s)01 / HAHN, Wolfgang
Klenzestrasse 17
34125 Kassel / DE
02 / ZHENG, Qinghua
Sudetenstrasse 51
82024 Taufkirchen / DE
03 / DIEKMANN, Andreas
Merlinweg 8
85586 Poing / DE
 [2012/48]
Former [2009/31]01 / HAHN, Wolfgang
Klenzestrasse 17
34125 Kassel / DE
02 / ZHENG, Qinghua
Sudetenstrasse 51
82024 Taufkirchen / DE
03 / DIEKMANN, Andreas
Rablstrasse 44
81669 München / DE
Representative(s)Lorenz, Bernd Ingo Thaddeus , et al
Andrejewski - Honke
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
An der Reichsbank 8
45127 Essen / DE
[N/P]
Former [2012/44]Lorenz, Bernd Ingo Thaddeus , et al
Andrejewski - Honke Patent- und Rechtsanwälte An der Reichsbank 8
45127 Essen / DE
Former [2010/50]Lorenz, Bernd Ingo Thaddeus , et al
Andrejewski - Honke Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Theaterplatz 3
45127 Essen / DE
Former [2010/50]Dahlkamp, Heinrich-Leo
ThyssenKrupp AG ThyssenKrupp Allee 1
45143 Essen / DE
Former [2009/31]Dahlkamp, Heinrich-Leo
Thyssen Krupp Technologies AG VRP Patente Am Thyssenhaus 1
45128 Essen / DE
Former [2009/30]Dahlkamp, Heinrich-Leo
ThyssenKrupp Technologies AG VRP Patente Am Thyssenhaus 1
45128 Essen / DE
Application number, filing date07801313.305.09.2007
[2009/31]
WO2007DE01576
Priority number, dateDE2006104883111.10.2006         Original published format: DE102006048831
[2009/31]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2008043327
Date:17.04.2008
Language:DE
[2008/16]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2081792
Date:29.07.2009
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.04.2008
[2009/31]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2081792
Date:31.10.2012
Language:DE
[2012/44]
Type: B8 Corrected title page of specification 
No.:EP2081792
Date:12.12.2012
[2012/50]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP17.04.2008
ClassificationInternational:B60L13/03, B29B11/16
[2009/31]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/31]
TitleGerman:VERKLEIDUNGSELEMENT MIT INTEGRIERTER EMPFANGSEINHEIT ZUR BERÜHRUNGSLOSEN ÜBERTRAGUNG VON ELEKTRISCHER ENERGIE UND VERFAHREN ZU SEINER HERSTELLUNG[2009/31]
English:CLADDING ELEMENT WITH AN INTEGRATED RECEPTION UNIT FOR THE CONTACTLESS TRANSFER OF ELECTRICAL ENERGY AND METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION THEREOF[2009/31]
French:ÉLÉMENT D'HABILLAGE À UNITÉ DE RÉCEPTION INTÉGRÉE POUR TRANSFERT D'ÉNERGIE ÉLECTRIQUE SANS CONTACT ET PROCÉDÉ PERMETTANT DE LE PRODUIRE[2009/31]
Entry into regional phase11.05.2009National basic fee paid 
11.05.2009Designation fee(s) paid 
11.05.2009Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure11.05.2009Examination requested  [2009/31]
05.06.2009Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
24.05.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.09.2012Fee for grant paid
20.09.2012Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  24.05.2012
Opposition(s)01.08.2013No opposition filed within time limit [2013/41]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.09.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
27.09.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
22.09.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
20.09.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU05.09.2007
CY31.10.2012
CZ31.10.2012
DK31.10.2012
EE31.10.2012
FI31.10.2012
IT31.10.2012
LT31.10.2012
LV31.10.2012
MC31.10.2012
MT31.10.2012
NL31.10.2012
PL31.10.2012
RO31.10.2012
SE31.10.2012
SI31.10.2012
SK31.10.2012
TR31.10.2012
BG31.01.2013
GR01.02.2013
ES11.02.2013
IS28.02.2013
PT28.02.2013
[2015/34]
Former [2015/32]CY31.10.2012
CZ31.10.2012
DK31.10.2012
EE31.10.2012
FI31.10.2012
IT31.10.2012
LT31.10.2012
LV31.10.2012
MC31.10.2012
MT31.10.2012
NL31.10.2012
PL31.10.2012
RO31.10.2012
SE31.10.2012
SI31.10.2012
SK31.10.2012
TR31.10.2012
BG31.01.2013
GR01.02.2013
ES11.02.2013
IS28.02.2013
PT28.02.2013
Former [2014/20]CY31.10.2012
CZ31.10.2012
DK31.10.2012
EE31.10.2012
FI31.10.2012
IT31.10.2012
LT31.10.2012
LV31.10.2012
MC31.10.2012
NL31.10.2012
PL31.10.2012
RO31.10.2012
SE31.10.2012
SI31.10.2012
SK31.10.2012
BG31.01.2013
GR01.02.2013
ES11.02.2013
IS28.02.2013
PT28.02.2013
Former [2013/37]CY31.10.2012
CZ31.10.2012
DK31.10.2012
EE31.10.2012
FI31.10.2012
IT31.10.2012
LT31.10.2012
LV31.10.2012
NL31.10.2012
PL31.10.2012
RO31.10.2012
SE31.10.2012
SI31.10.2012
SK31.10.2012
BG31.01.2013
GR01.02.2013
ES11.02.2013
IS28.02.2013
PT28.02.2013
Former [2013/35]CY31.10.2012
CZ31.10.2012
DK31.10.2012
EE31.10.2012
FI31.10.2012
LT31.10.2012
LV31.10.2012
NL31.10.2012
PL31.10.2012
SE31.10.2012
SI31.10.2012
SK31.10.2012
BG31.01.2013
GR01.02.2013
ES11.02.2013
IS28.02.2013
PT28.02.2013
Former [2013/34]CY31.10.2012
DK31.10.2012
FI31.10.2012
LT31.10.2012
LV31.10.2012
NL31.10.2012
PL31.10.2012
SE31.10.2012
SI31.10.2012
BG31.01.2013
GR01.02.2013
ES11.02.2013
IS28.02.2013
PT28.02.2013
Former [2013/28]CY31.10.2012
FI31.10.2012
LT31.10.2012
LV31.10.2012
NL31.10.2012
PL31.10.2012
SE31.10.2012
SI31.10.2012
GR01.02.2013
ES11.02.2013
IS28.02.2013
PT28.02.2013
Former [2013/26]CY31.10.2012
FI31.10.2012
LT31.10.2012
LV31.10.2012
NL31.10.2012
PL31.10.2012
SE31.10.2012
SI31.10.2012
GR01.02.2013
ES11.02.2013
IS28.02.2013
Former [2013/24]CY31.10.2012
FI31.10.2012
LT31.10.2012
LV31.10.2012
NL31.10.2012
PL31.10.2012
SE31.10.2012
GR01.02.2013
ES11.02.2013
IS28.02.2013
Former [2013/23]CY31.10.2012
FI31.10.2012
LT31.10.2012
LV31.10.2012
NL31.10.2012
PL31.10.2012
SE31.10.2012
ES11.02.2013
IS28.02.2013
Former [2013/22]FI31.10.2012
LT31.10.2012
NL31.10.2012
SE31.10.2012
ES11.02.2013
IS28.02.2013
Former [2013/21]LT31.10.2012
SE31.10.2012
Former [2013/20]LT31.10.2012
Cited inInternational search[A]WO2005090112  (THYSSENKRUPP TRANSRAPID GMBH [DE]; BECKER PETER [DE]; HAHN WOLFGANG [D) [A] 1-29 * page 15, line 11 - page 18, line 24; figures 1,14-19 * * abstract *;
 [A]EP0549110  (FORD MOTOR CO [GB]; FORD WERKE AG [DE]; FORD FRANCE [FR]) [A] 1-29 * column 3, line 25 - column 5, line 10; figures 1,2 * * abstract *;
 [A]JPH03178505  (TOKYO SHIBAURA ELECTRIC CO) [A] 1-29 * abstract *;
 [A]JPS58135619  (SUMITOMO SPEC METALS) [A] 1-29 * abstract *