Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2061819

EP2061819 - AQUEOUS DISPERSIONS OF CROSS-LINKED, TERTIARY ESTER GROUPS CONTAINING EMULSION POLYMERISATES AND WATER-ABSORBENT MATERIALS ON A CARRIER MATERIAL MADE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  07.05.2010
Database last updated on 27.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip07.05.2010Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 09.06.2010  [2010/23]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BASF SE
Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38
67056 Ludwigshafen am Rhein / DE
[N/P]
Former [2009/22]For all designated states
BASF SE
67056 Ludwigshafen / DE
Former [2008/31]For all designated states
BASF Aktiengesellschaft
67056 Ludwigshafen / DE
Inventor(s)01 / BOTHE, Marc
Mainstr. 6
67117 Limburgerhof / DE
02 / SEYFFER, Hermann
Maass-Str.4
69123 Heidelberg / DE
03 / HERRLICH-LOOS, Mirjam
Werderstrasse 1
68165 Mannheim / DE
04 / HEGER, Robert
Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38
67056 Ludwigshafen / DE
05 / WEISMANTEL, Matthias
Deutelbacher Str.2
63637 Jossgrund / DE
 [2009/22]
Application number, filing date07802498.106.08.2007
[2009/22]
WO2007EP58104
Priority number, dateEP2006011908417.08.2006         Original published format: EP 06119084
[2009/22]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2008019966
Date:21.02.2008
Language:DE
[2008/08]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2061819
Date:27.05.2009
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.02.2008
[2009/22]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP21.02.2008
ClassificationInternational:C08F220/18
[2009/22]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/22]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:WÄSSRIGE DISPERSIONEN VON VERNETZTEN, TERTIÄRE ESTERGRUPPEN ENTHALTENDEN EMULSIONSPOLYMERISATEN UND DARAUS HERGESTELLTE WASSERABSORBIERENDE MATERIALIEN AUF EINEM TRÄGERMATERIAL[2009/22]
English:AQUEOUS DISPERSIONS OF CROSS-LINKED, TERTIARY ESTER GROUPS CONTAINING EMULSION POLYMERISATES AND WATER-ABSORBENT MATERIALS ON A CARRIER MATERIAL MADE THEREOF[2009/22]
French:DISPERSIONS AQUEUSES DE POLYMÈRES EN ÉMULSION CONTENANT DES GROUPES ESTER TERTIAIRES, RÉTICULÉS, ET MATIÈRES ABSORBANT L'EAU FABRIQUÉS À PARTIR DE CELLES-CI SUR UN MATÉRIAU SUPPORT.[2009/23]
Former [2009/22]DISPERSIONS AQUEUSES DE POLYMèreS en ÉMULSION CONTENANT DES GROUPES ESTER TERTIAIRES, réticulÉS, ET MATières ABSORBANT L'EAU FABRIQUÉS À PARTIR DE CELLES-CI SUR UN MATéRiau SUPPORT.
Entry into regional phase17.03.2009National basic fee paid 
17.03.2009Designation fee(s) paid 
17.03.2009Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure17.03.2009Examination requested  [2009/22]
12.08.2009Communication of intention to grant the patent
23.12.2009Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2010/23]
26.01.2010Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2010/23]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.08.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[A]EP0288012  (KAO CORP [JP]) [A] 1-18 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO2005058989  (BASF AG [DE]; NGUYEN-KIM SON [DE]; WOOD CLAUDIA [DE]) [A] 1-18 * the whole document *;
 [A]DE19806745  (BAYER AG [DE]) [A] 1-18 * the whole document *;
 [A]DE4314305  (BASF AG [DE]) [A] 1-18 * the whole document *