Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2059243

EP2059243 - BUPRENORPHINE WAFER FOR DRUG SUBSTITUTION THERAPY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2009/21]BUPRENOPHINE-WAFER FOR DRUG SUBSTITUTION THERAPY
[2012/42]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  22.02.2013
Database last updated on 13.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip10.12.2019New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
EURO-CELTIQUE S.A.
1, rue Jean Piret
2350 Luxembourg / LU
[2016/26]
Former [2009/21]For all designated states
EURO-CELTIQUE S.A.
2, avenue Charles de Gaulle
1653 Luxembourg / LU
Inventor(s)01 / OKSCHE, Alexander
Birkenstr. 22
65550 Limburg / DE
02 / HEATH, William
Napp Pharmaceuticals Limited
Cambridge Science Park
Milton Road
Cambridge CB4 0GW / GB
03 / HOLDEN, Timothy
Napp Pharmaceuticals Limited
Cambridge Science Park
Milton Road
Cambridge CB4 0GW / GB
04 / PRATER, Derek A.
Mundipharma Research Limited
Cambridge Science Park
Milton Road
Cambridge CB4 0GW / GB
05 / SACKLER, Richard S.
25 Windrose Way
Greenwich, CT 06830 / US
06 / WALDEN, Malcolm
Mundipharma Research Limited
Cambridge Science Park
Milton Road
Cambridge CB4 0GW / GB
 [2013/13]
Former [2009/21]01 / OKSCHE, Alexander
Birkenstr. 22
65550 Limburg / DE
02 / HEATH, William
Napp Pharmaceuticals Limited Cambridge Science Park Milton Road
Cambridge CB4 0GW / GB
03 / HOLDEN, Timothy
Napp Pharmaceuticals Limited Cambridge Science Park Milton Road
Cambridge CB4 0GW / GB
04 / PRATER, Derek A.
Mundipharma Research Limited Cambridge Science Park Milton Road
Cambridge CB4 0GW / GB
05 / SACKLER, Richard S.
25 Windrose Way
Greenwich, CT 06830 / US
06 / WALDEN, Malcolm
Mundipharma Research Limited Cambridge Science Park Milton Road
Cambridge CB4 0GW / GB
Representative(s)Bühler, Dirk
Maiwald Patentanwalts- und
Rechtsanwaltsgesellschaft mbH
Elisenhof
Elisenstraße 3
80335 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2013/13]Bühler, Dirk
Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH
Elisenhof
Elisenstraße 3
80335 München / DE
Former [2009/21]Bühler, Dirk
Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3
80335 München / DE
Application number, filing date07802995.629.08.2007
[2009/21]
WO2007EP58978
Priority number, dateEP2006011983930.08.2006         Original published format: EP 06119839
[2009/21]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2008025791
Date:06.03.2008
Language:EN
[2008/10]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2059243
Date:20.05.2009
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.03.2008
[2009/21]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2059243
Date:27.03.2013
Language:EN
[2013/13]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP06.03.2008
ClassificationInternational:A61K31/485, A61P25/04, A61K9/20, A61K9/70
[2009/21]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/21]
Extension statesAL05.03.2009
BA05.03.2009
HR05.03.2009
MK05.03.2009
RS05.03.2009
TitleGerman:BUPRENORPHINE-WAFER ZUR SUBSTITUTIONSTHERAPIE[2013/13]
English:BUPRENORPHINE WAFER FOR DRUG SUBSTITUTION THERAPY[2012/42]
French:TRANCHE DE BUPRÉNORPHINE POUR LA THÉRAPIE DE SUBSTITUTION[2013/13]
Former [2009/21]BUPRENOPHIN-WAFER FÜR DIE ARZNEIMITTEL-SUBSTITUTIONSTHERAPIE
Former [2009/21]BUPRENOPHINE-WAFER FOR DRUG SUBSTITUTION THERAPY
Former [2009/21]CACHET DE BUPRÉNOPHINE COMME TRAITEMENT DE SUBSTITUTION LIÉ À LA TOXICOMANIE
Entry into regional phase05.03.2009National basic fee paid 
05.03.2009Designation fee(s) paid 
05.03.2009Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure05.03.2009Examination requested  [2009/21]
29.09.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
09.04.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.10.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.02.2013Fee for grant paid
15.02.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  29.09.2009
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  17.12.2013  07.01.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Hexal AG
Industriestrasse 25
83607 Holzkirchen / DE
Opponent's representative
Best, Michael
Lederer & Keller
Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Unsöldstrasse 2
80538 München / DE
 02  19.12.2013  08.01.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Orexo AB
Box 303
751 05 Uppsala / SE
Opponent's representative
Potter Clarkson
The Belgrave Centre
Talbot Street
Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB
 03  21.12.2013  07.02.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Gallafent, Alison
Alison Gallafent Ltd
21 Bridge St
Llandeilo SA19 6BN / GB
Opponent's representative
Gallafent, Alison
21 Bridge Street
Llandeilo, Carmarthenshire SA19 6BN / GB
 04  26.12.2013  09.01.2014  ADMISSIBLE
ETHYPHARM
194 Bureaux de la Colline Bâtiment D
92213 St Cloud Cedex / FR
Opponent's representative
Regimbeau, et al
20, rue de Chazelles
75847 Paris Cedex 17 / FR
 [2019/51]
Former [2015/41]
Opponent(s)01  17.12.2013  07.01.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Hexal AG
Industriestrasse 25
83607 Holzkirchen / DE
Opponent's representative
Best, Michael
Lederer & Keller
Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Unsöldstrasse 2
80538 München / DE
 02  19.12.2013  08.01.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Orexo AB
Box 303
751 05 Uppsala / SE
Opponent's representative
Potter Clarkson LLP
The Belgrave Centre
Talbot Street
Nottingham, NG1 5GG / GB
 03  21.12.2013  07.02.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Gallafent, Alison
Alison Gallafent Ltd
21 Bridge St
Llandeilo SA19 6BN / GB
Opponent's representative
Gallafent, Alison
Alison Gallafent Ltd
21 Bridge St
Llandeilo SA19 6BN / GB
 04  26.12.2013  09.01.2014  ADMISSIBLE
ETHYPHARM
194 Bureaux de la Colline Bâtiment D
92213 St Cloud Cedex / FR
Opponent's representative
Regimbeau, et al
20, rue de Chazelles
75847 Paris Cedex 17 / FR
Former [2014/07]
Opponent(s)01  17.12.2013  07.01.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Hexal AG
Industriestrasse 25
83607 Holzkirchen / DE
Opponent's representative
Best, Michael
Lederer & Keller Patentanwälte Unsöldstrasse 2
80538 München / DE
 02  19.12.2013  08.01.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Orexo AB
Box 303
751 05 Uppsala / SE
Opponent's representative
McNeeney, Stephen Phillip, et al
Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre
Talbot Street
Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB
 03  21.12.2013   
Gallafent, Alison
4 George Street
Llandeilo Dyfed
SA19 6AS / GB
Opponent's representative
Gallafent, Alison
Alison Gallafent Ltd 4 George Street
Llandeilo, South Wales SA19 6AS / GB
 04  26.12.2013  09.01.2014  ADMISSIBLE
ETHYPHARM
194 Bureaux de la Colline Bâtiment D
92213 St Cloud Cedex / FR
Opponent's representative
Regimbeau, et al
20, rue de Chazelles
75847 Paris Cedex 17 / FR
Former [2014/04]
Opponent(s)01  17.12.2013   
Hexal AG
Industriestrasse 25
83607 Holzkirchen / DE
Opponent's representative
Best, Michael
Lederer & Keller Patentanwälte Unsöldstrasse 2
80538 München / DE
 02  19.12.2013   
Orexo AB
Box 303
751 05 Uppsala / SE
Opponent's representative
McNeeney, Stephen Phillip, et al
Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre
Talbot Street
Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB
12.02.2014Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
22.08.2014Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
30.11.2015Date of oral proceedings
04.02.2016Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
04.02.2016Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition15.03.2016Appeal received No.  T0632/16
02.12.2019Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor was rejected
02.12.2019Date of oral proceedings
11.12.2019Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
05.03.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
25.08.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
19.08.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
20.08.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  Tooltipdeleted
[2014/09]
Former [2013/52]CY27.03.2013
Cited inInternational search[X]DE19652188  (LOHMANN THERAPIE SYST LTS [DE]) [X] 1-10 * column 3; claim - *;
 [X]WO0059423  (WATSON PHARMACEUTICALS INC [US]) [X] 1-10 * pages 14,15; example - *;
 [X]GB2328443  (RECKITT & COLMANN PROD LTD [GB]) [X] 1-10 * example 10 *;
 [X]US4673679  (AUNGST BRUCE J [US], et al) [X] 1-10 * column 9; example -; claim - *