Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2078202

EP2078202 - PROTEIN [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  12.01.2018
Database last updated on 18.05.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  03.02.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  27.01.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip21.09.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MT
published on 24.10.2018  [2018/43]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Oxford BioTherapeutics Ltd
94A Innovation Drive
Milton Park
Abingdon
Oxfordshire OX14 4RZ / GB
[2016/01]
Former [2011/12]For all designated states
OXFORD BIOTHERAPEUTICS LTD
94a Milton Park Abingdon
Oxfordshire OX14 4RY / GB
Former [2009/29]For all designated states
Oxford Genome Sciences (UK) Limited
James & Cowper Buxton Court
Botley, Oxford OX2 0JB / GB
Inventor(s)01 / ROHLFF, Christian
Oxford Genome Sciences (UK) Ltd The Forum
86 Milton Park
Abingdon
Oxford Oxfordshire OX14 4RY / GB
 [2017/10]
Former [2009/29]01 / ROHLFF, Christian
Oxford Genome Sciences (UK) Ltd The Forum 86 Milton Park Abingdon
Oxford Oxfordshire OX14 4RY / GB
Representative(s)Webber, Philip Michael , et al
Dehns
St Bride's House
10 Salisbury Square
London
EC4Y 8JD / GB
[N/P]
Former [2011/46]Webber, Philip Michael , et al
Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London
EC4Y 8JD / GB
Former [2010/45]Blakey, Alison Jane
Oxford BioTherapeutics Ltd. 94a Milton Park Abingdon
Oxfordshire OX14 4RY / GB
Former [2010/45]Teuten, Andrew John , et al
Sagittarius IP Taylor House 39 High Street
Marlow, Bucks SL7 2AF / GB
Former [2009/29]Teuten, Andrew John , et al
Sagittarius Intellectual Property Consultants Ltd Taylor House 39 High Street
Marlow, Bucks. SL7 1AF / GB
Application number, filing date07804425.229.08.2007
[2009/29]
WO2007GB50513
Priority number, dateGB2006001697129.08.2006         Original published format: GB 0616971
US20060842431P06.09.2006         Original published format: US 842431 P
[2009/29]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2008026008
Date:06.03.2008
Language:EN
[2008/10]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2078202
Date:15.07.2009
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.03.2008
[2009/29]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2078202
Date:08.03.2017
Language:EN
[2017/10]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP06.03.2008
ClassificationInternational:G01N33/574, G01N33/68
[2009/29]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2017/10]
Former [2009/29]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:PROTEIN[2009/29]
English:PROTEIN[2009/29]
French:PROTÉINE[2009/29]
Entry into regional phase30.03.2009National basic fee paid 
30.03.2009Designation fee(s) paid 
30.03.2009Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure30.03.2009Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
30.03.2009Examination requested  [2009/29]
21.04.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
01.11.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.01.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
22.07.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.03.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
08.10.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.10.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.01.2017Fee for grant paid
25.01.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
25.01.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  21.04.2010
Opposition(s)11.12.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2018/07]
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.07.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
23.08.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
28.07.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
24.07.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
04.07.2013Renewal fee patent year 07
22.07.2014Renewal fee patent year 08
27.08.2015Renewal fee patent year 09
29.08.2016Renewal fee patent year 10
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT08.03.2017
CZ08.03.2017
DK08.03.2017
EE08.03.2017
ES08.03.2017
FI08.03.2017
IT08.03.2017
LT08.03.2017
LV08.03.2017
MC08.03.2017
NL08.03.2017
PL08.03.2017
RO08.03.2017
SE08.03.2017
SI08.03.2017
SK08.03.2017
BG08.06.2017
GR09.06.2017
IS08.07.2017
PT10.07.2017
GB29.08.2017
IE29.08.2017
LU29.08.2017
MT29.08.2017
BE31.08.2017
CH31.08.2017
FR31.08.2017
LI31.08.2017
[2018/43]
Former [2018/37]AT08.03.2017
CZ08.03.2017
DK08.03.2017
EE08.03.2017
ES08.03.2017
FI08.03.2017
IT08.03.2017
LT08.03.2017
LV08.03.2017
MC08.03.2017
NL08.03.2017
PL08.03.2017
RO08.03.2017
SE08.03.2017
SI08.03.2017
SK08.03.2017
BG08.06.2017
GR09.06.2017
IS08.07.2017
PT10.07.2017
GB29.08.2017
IE29.08.2017
LU29.08.2017
BE31.08.2017
CH31.08.2017
FR31.08.2017
LI31.08.2017
Former [2018/35]AT08.03.2017
CZ08.03.2017
DK08.03.2017
EE08.03.2017
ES08.03.2017
FI08.03.2017
IT08.03.2017
LT08.03.2017
LV08.03.2017
MC08.03.2017
NL08.03.2017
PL08.03.2017
RO08.03.2017
SE08.03.2017
SI08.03.2017
SK08.03.2017
BG08.06.2017
GR09.06.2017
IS08.07.2017
PT10.07.2017
GB29.08.2017
IE29.08.2017
LU29.08.2017
CH31.08.2017
LI31.08.2017
Former [2018/34]AT08.03.2017
CZ08.03.2017
DK08.03.2017
EE08.03.2017
ES08.03.2017
FI08.03.2017
IT08.03.2017
LT08.03.2017
LV08.03.2017
MC08.03.2017
NL08.03.2017
PL08.03.2017
RO08.03.2017
SE08.03.2017
SI08.03.2017
SK08.03.2017
BG08.06.2017
GR09.06.2017
IS08.07.2017
PT10.07.2017
IE29.08.2017
LU29.08.2017
CH31.08.2017
LI31.08.2017
Former [2018/21]AT08.03.2017
CZ08.03.2017
DK08.03.2017
EE08.03.2017
ES08.03.2017
FI08.03.2017
IT08.03.2017
LT08.03.2017
LV08.03.2017
MC08.03.2017
NL08.03.2017
PL08.03.2017
RO08.03.2017
SE08.03.2017
SI08.03.2017
SK08.03.2017
BG08.06.2017
GR09.06.2017
IS08.07.2017
PT10.07.2017
CH31.08.2017
LI31.08.2017
Former [2018/18]AT08.03.2017
CZ08.03.2017
DK08.03.2017
EE08.03.2017
ES08.03.2017
FI08.03.2017
IT08.03.2017
LT08.03.2017
LV08.03.2017
MC08.03.2017
NL08.03.2017
PL08.03.2017
RO08.03.2017
SE08.03.2017
SI08.03.2017
SK08.03.2017
BG08.06.2017
GR09.06.2017
IS08.07.2017
PT10.07.2017
Former [2018/14]AT08.03.2017
CZ08.03.2017
DK08.03.2017
EE08.03.2017
ES08.03.2017
FI08.03.2017
IT08.03.2017
LT08.03.2017
LV08.03.2017
NL08.03.2017
PL08.03.2017
RO08.03.2017
SE08.03.2017
SI08.03.2017
SK08.03.2017
BG08.06.2017
GR09.06.2017
IS08.07.2017
PT10.07.2017
Former [2018/09]AT08.03.2017
CZ08.03.2017
DK08.03.2017
EE08.03.2017
ES08.03.2017
FI08.03.2017
IT08.03.2017
LT08.03.2017
LV08.03.2017
NL08.03.2017
PL08.03.2017
RO08.03.2017
SE08.03.2017
SK08.03.2017
BG08.06.2017
GR09.06.2017
IS08.07.2017
PT10.07.2017
Former [2017/51]AT08.03.2017
CZ08.03.2017
EE08.03.2017
ES08.03.2017
FI08.03.2017
IT08.03.2017
LT08.03.2017
LV08.03.2017
NL08.03.2017
PL08.03.2017
RO08.03.2017
SE08.03.2017
SK08.03.2017
BG08.06.2017
GR09.06.2017
IS08.07.2017
PT10.07.2017
Former [2017/50]AT08.03.2017
CZ08.03.2017
EE08.03.2017
ES08.03.2017
FI08.03.2017
IT08.03.2017
LT08.03.2017
LV08.03.2017
NL08.03.2017
PL08.03.2017
RO08.03.2017
SE08.03.2017
SK08.03.2017
BG08.06.2017
GR09.06.2017
IS08.07.2017
Former [2017/49]AT08.03.2017
CZ08.03.2017
EE08.03.2017
ES08.03.2017
FI08.03.2017
IT08.03.2017
LT08.03.2017
LV08.03.2017
NL08.03.2017
RO08.03.2017
SE08.03.2017
SK08.03.2017
BG08.06.2017
GR09.06.2017
IS08.07.2017
Former [2017/48]CZ08.03.2017
ES08.03.2017
FI08.03.2017
LT08.03.2017
LV08.03.2017
NL08.03.2017
SE08.03.2017
BG08.06.2017
GR09.06.2017
Former [2017/41]ES08.03.2017
FI08.03.2017
LT08.03.2017
LV08.03.2017
NL08.03.2017
SE08.03.2017
BG08.06.2017
GR09.06.2017
Cited inInternational search[X]WO0149716  (CORIXA CORP [US], et al) [X] 1-60 *Whole document, in particular: Abstract, examples, claims and SEQ ID NO: 1081*;
 [X]WO02083070  (CORIXA CORP [US], et al) [X] 1-60 *Whole document, in particular: Abstract, examples, claims and SEQ ID NO: 1081*;
 [X]WO03020934  (DIADEXUS INC [US], et al) [X] 1-60 *Whole document, in particular: Abstract, examples, claims and SEQ ID NO: 131*;
 [A]WO9842736  (PROTEOME SCIENCES PLC [GB], et al) [A] 1-60 *Whole document*
 [A]  REYMOND M A ET AL, "Expression and functional proteomics studies in colorectal cancer", PATHOLOGY RESEARCH AND PRACTICE, GUSTAV FISCHER, STUTTGART, DE, (20040430), vol. 200, no. 2, ISSN 0344-0338, pages 119 - 127, XP004959031 [A] 1-60 *Whole document*

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.prp.2004.02.001
 [A]  WARD D G ET AL, "Identification of serum biomarkers for colon cancer by proteomic analysis", BRITISH JOURNAL OF CANCER, (200606), vol. 94, no. 12, ISSN 0007-0920, pages 1898 - 1905, XP002461832 [A] 1-60 *Whole document*

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/sj.bjc.6603188