Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2046324

EP2046324 - TREATMENT AND PREVENTION OF MUCOSITIS BY ANTHOCYANIDIN DERIVATIVES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2009/16]TREATMENT AND PREVENTION MUCOSITIS BY ANTHOCYANIDIN DERIVATIVES
[2017/13]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  09.02.2018
Database last updated on 20.11.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  03.03.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  21.02.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip11.10.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY
published on 13.11.2019  [2019/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Indena S.p.A.
Via Ortles, 12
20139 Milano / IT
[2009/16]
Inventor(s)01 / BOMBARDELLI, Ezio
Via Gabetta, 13
I-27027 Groppello Cairoli (PV) / IT
02 / MORAZZONI, Paolo
Viale Ortles, 12
I-20139 Milano / IT
 [2009/16]
Representative(s)Minoja, Fabrizio , et al
Bianchetti Bracco Minoja S.r.l.
Via Plinio, 63
20129 Milano / IT
[2017/14]
Former [2009/16]Minoja, Fabrizio , et al
Bianchetti Bracco Minoja S.r.l. Via Plinio, 63
20129 Milano / IT
Application number, filing date07804655.427.07.2007
[2009/16]
WO2007IB02147
Priority number, dateEP2006001573228.07.2006         Original published format: EP 06015732
[2009/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2008012666
Date:31.01.2008
Language:EN
[2008/05]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2046324
Date:15.04.2009
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.01.2008
[2009/16]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2046324
Date:05.04.2017
Language:EN
[2017/14]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP04.09.2008
ClassificationInternational:A61K31/352, A61K36/45, A61K36/87, A61P1/04, A61K31/7048, A61K36/66
[2009/16]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2017/14]
Former [2009/16]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:BEHANDLUNG UND PRÄVENTION VON MUKOSITIS MIT ANTHOCYANIDINDERIVATEN[2009/16]
English:TREATMENT AND PREVENTION OF MUCOSITIS BY ANTHOCYANIDIN DERIVATIVES[2017/13]
French:UTILISTATION D'ANTHOCYANOSIDES POUR LA PRÉPARATION DE FORMULATIONS POUR LE TRAITEMENT DE LA MUCOSITE INDUITE PAR LES MÉDICAMENTS ANTITUMORAUX[2009/16]
Former [2009/16]TREATMENT AND PREVENTION MUCOSITIS BY ANTHOCYANIDIN DERIVATIVES
Entry into regional phase14.01.2009National basic fee paid 
14.01.2009Designation fee(s) paid 
14.01.2009Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure14.01.2009Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
14.01.2009Examination requested  [2009/16]
04.06.2010Observations by third parties
14.07.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
18.11.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.05.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
17.11.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.02.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
17.06.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.10.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
17.02.2017Fee for grant paid
17.02.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
17.02.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)EP12177483.0  / EP2522345
EP12177486.3  / EP2520295
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  14.07.2010
Opposition(s)08.01.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/11]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.07.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
28.07.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
25.07.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
25.07.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
24.07.2013Renewal fee patent year 07
15.07.2014Renewal fee patent year 08
20.07.2015Renewal fee patent year 09
11.07.2016Renewal fee patent year 10
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY05.04.2017
EE05.04.2017
LT05.04.2017
LV05.04.2017
MC05.04.2017
BG05.07.2017
LU27.07.2017
MT27.07.2017
IS05.08.2017
[2019/46]
Former [2019/30]EE05.04.2017
LT05.04.2017
LV05.04.2017
MC05.04.2017
BG05.07.2017
LU27.07.2017
MT27.07.2017
IS05.08.2017
Former [2018/43]EE05.04.2017
LT05.04.2017
LV05.04.2017
BG05.07.2017
LU27.07.2017
MT27.07.2017
IS05.08.2017
Former [2018/34]EE05.04.2017
LT05.04.2017
LV05.04.2017
BG05.07.2017
LU27.07.2017
IS05.08.2017
Former [2018/09]EE05.04.2017
LT05.04.2017
LV05.04.2017
BG05.07.2017
IS05.08.2017
Former [2017/51]LT05.04.2017
LV05.04.2017
BG05.07.2017
IS05.08.2017
Former [2017/49]LT05.04.2017
IS05.08.2017
Cited inInternational search[X]WO03039452  (QUIGLEY CORP [US]; ROSENBLOOM RICHARD A [US]) [X] 1 * abstract * * page 7, lines 14-19 * * page 10, line 17 - page 11, line 12 * * page 17, lines 12-16; examples 1,2 *;
 [X]WO2006071342  (DRUGTECH CORP [US]; BORTZ JONATHAN DAVID [US]; KIRSCHNER MITCHELL I [U) [X] 1 * abstract * * page 22, lines 20-23 *;
 [X]WO03013428  (QUIGLEY CORP [US]; ROSENBLOOM RICHARD A [US]) [X] 1 * abstract * * page 3, line 33 - page 4, line 10 * * page 4, line 34 - page 5, line 6 * * page 9, lines 21-31; claims 1,4 *;
 [X]WO2006024545  (STICHTING TECH WETENSCHAPP [NL]; HAGEMAN GERRIGJE JOHANNA [NL]; MOONEN) [X] 1-3,7,9,10,13-22,24,25,67-69,73-75,79-86 * abstract * * page 8, lines 5-32 *;
 [X]WO0115553  (UNIV MICHIGAN [US]; AMWAY CORP [US]; NAIR MURALEEDHARAN G [US]; WANG H) [X] 1-3,7,9,10,13-22,24,25,67-69,73-75,79-86 * abstract * * page 3, lines 11-20 * * page 4, lines 32-34 * * page 30, lines 11-19 *;
 [XP]WO2007073518  (NAT JEWISH MED & RES CENTER [US]; DAY BRIAN J [US]; KACHADOURIAN REMY) [XP] 1-3,7,13-16,19-21,24,25,34-36,40,46-54,57,58,67-69,73,79-86 * abstract * * paragraphs [0137] , [0318] *;
 [XP]WO2007038421  (UNIV KENTUCKY RES FOUND [US]; MUMPER RUSSELL J [US]; DAI JIN [US]; GAL) [XP] 1-3,7,13-16,19-21,24,25,34-36,40,46-54,57,58,67-69,73,79-86 * abstract *;
 [A]WO9741137  (UNIFOB [NO]; ANDERSEN OEYVIND MOKSHEIM [NO]; HELLAND DAG EMIL [NO]; AN) [A] 67 * abstract * * tables 1,2 * * page 38, lines 5-15 *;
 [A]WO9611692  (UNIFOB STIFTELSEN UNIVERSITETS [NO]; ANDERSEN OEYVIND M [NO]; HELLAND) [A] 67 * abstract * * page 21, lines 8-19 *;
 [A]WO03088986  (ISIS INNOVATION [GB]; REZVANI MOHIADDIN [GB]) [A] 1 * the whole document *;
 [X]WO2006063716  (INDENA SPA [IT]; BOMBARDELLI EZIO [IT]; RONCHI MASSIMO [IT]; DI NICOLO) [X] 1,6-34,39-67,72-87 * the whole document *;
 [X]WO02094300  (HERBAL SYNTHESIS CORP [IL]; LEVINE WILLIAM Z [IL]; SAFFER ARON J [IL];) [X] 1,6-11,13-22,24-26,39-44,46-55,57-59,67,72,73,75,79-84,86 * claims 1-67 *;
 [X]WO2005053719  (INDENA SPA [IT]; BOMBARDELLI EZIO [IT]) [X] 1,6,13-26,34,39,46-54,57-59,67,68,72,79-85 * the whole document *;
 [X]FR2856304  (NATURAL PRODUCT CONSULTING [FR]) [X] 1,6-10,13-22,24,25,34,39,40,42,43,46-55,57,58,67,72,73,75,76,79-86 * the whole document * * page 4, lines 13-19 *
 [X]  - MATSUMOTO MEGUMI ET AL, "Gastroprotective effect of red pigments in black chokeberry fruit (Aronia melanocarpa Elliot) on acute gastric hemorrhagic lesions in rats.", JOURNAL OF AGRICULTURAL AND FOOD CHEMISTRY. 21 APR 2004, (20040421), vol. 52, no. 8, ISSN 0021-8561, pages 2226 - 2229, XP018001799 [X] 1-3,7,9,10,13-22,24,25,67-69,73-75,79-86 * abstract *
 [A]  - HOU D X ET AL, "Anthocyanidins inhibit cyclooxygenase-2 expression in LPS-evoked macrophages: Structure-activity relationship and molecular mechanisms involved", BIOCHEMICAL PHARMACOLOGY, PERGAMON, OXFORD, GB, (20050801), vol. 70, no. 3, ISSN 0006-2952, pages 417 - 425, XP004962723 [A] 67 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.bcp.2005.05.003
 [A]  - WANG H ET AL, "ANTIOXIDANT AND ANTIINFLAMMATORY ACTIVITIES OF ANTHOCYANINS AND THEIR AGLYCON, CYANIDIN, FROM TART CHERRIES", JOURNAL OF NATURAL PRODUCTS, (199902), vol. 62, no. 2, ISSN 0163-3864, pages 294 - 296, XP001079463 [A] 67 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/np980501m
 [A]  - BARASCH ANDREI ET AL, "Antimicrobials, mucosal coating agents, anesthetics, analgesics, and nutritional supplements for alimentary tract mucositis.", SUPPORTIVE CARE IN CANCER : OFFICIAL JOURNAL OF THE MULTINATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF SUPPORTIVE CARE IN CANCER. JUN 2006, (200606), vol. 14, no. 6, ISSN 0941-4355, pages 528 - 532, XP002409401 [A] 1 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s00520-006-0066-1
 [A]  - DONNELLY ET AL, "Antimicrobial therapy to prevent or treat oral mucositis", LANCET INFECTIOUS DISEASES, XX, US, (200307), vol. 3, no. 7, ISSN 1473-3099, pages 405 - 412, XP005063089 [A] 1 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S1473-3099(03)00668-6
 [X]  - MAGISTRETTI M J ET AL, "Antiulcer activity of an anthocyanidin from Vaccinium myrtillus.", ARZNEIMITTEL-FORSCHUNG MAY 1988, (198805), vol. 38, no. 5, ISSN 0004-4172, pages 686 - 690, XP002484925 [X] 1,6,13-26,34,39,46-54,57-59,67,68,72,79-85 * abstract *
 [XY]  - BLUMENTHAL M., The Complete German Commission E Monographs: Therapeutic Guide to Herbal Medicines, AUSTIN TEXAS US, AMERICAN BOTANICAL COUNCIL, (1998), XP008093364 [X] 1,6,13-26,34,39,46-54,57-59,67,68,72,79-85 * page 88 * [Y] 7,12,17,18,20,23-26,33,39,40,42,44,51,55-59,73,77,78,81-87
 [Y]  - GODOWSKI K C, "Antimicrobial action of sanguinarine.", THE JOURNAL OF CLINICAL DENTISTRY SPRING 1989, (198904), vol. 1, no. 4, ISSN 0895-8831, pages 96 - 101, XP002484926 [Y] 7,12,17,18,20,23-26,33,39,40,42,44,51,55-59,73,77,78,81-87 * abstract *
 [PX]  - CHOI EUN HYE ET AL, "Protective effect of anthocyanin-rich extract from bilberry (Vaccinium myrtillus L.) against myelotoxicity induced by 5-fluorouracil.", BIOFACTORS (OXFORD, ENGLAND) 2007, (2007), vol. 29, no. 1, ISSN 0951-6433, pages 55 - 65, XP008093228 [PX] 1,6,7,13-16,20,21,24-34,39,46-49,52-54,57-65,67,72,79-86 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/biof.5520290106
other   - "Sharbat-e-Rummaan Sheerin", TKDL, Database accession no. MA2/751, XP003029501
    - AMINUDDAULAH ABUL FARJ IBN AL-QUFF MASECHI, Kitaab-al-Umdah-fil-Jeraahat, (1937), vol. II, page 263
    - "Julnaar", TKDL, Database accession no. WA1/284G, XP003029502
    - ZIYA AL-ABDULLAH IBN AL-BAITAR, Din-Al-Jaame-li-Mufradaat-al-Advia-wal-Aghzia, (1874), vol. I, page 164
    - "Zaroor Bara-e-Qula-e-Haar Multaheb", TKDL, Database accession no. AA3/1474, XP003029503
    - ABU MOHAMMAD BIN ZAKARIYYA AL RAZI, Bakr Kitaab-al-Haawi-fil-Tibb, (1977), vol. III, page 317
    - "Zimaad Bara.e. Warm-e-Sulb", TKDL, Database accession no. MH5/2832, XP003029504
    - MOHAMMAD AKBAR ARZANI, Qaraabaadeen Qaadri, (1968), page 392
    - "Sharbat Kadi Deegar", TKDL, Database accession no. MH5/2695, XP003029505
    - MOHAMMAD AKBAR ARZANI, Qaraabaadeen Qaadri, (1968), page 367
    - "Rubb Bara-e-Ghashi", TKDL, Database accession no. AA16/165, XP003029506
    - ABU MOHAMMAD.BIN ZAKARIYYA AL-RAZI, Bakr Kitaab-al-Haawi-fil-Tibb, (1963), vol. I, page 222
    - "Dawa Bara-e-Waram-e-Batn", TKDL, Database accession no. JA6/651D, XP003029507
    - MOHAMMAD NAJMUL KAHN, Khazaain-al-Advia, (1926), vol. III, page 664
    - "Thetran Nagam", TKDL, Database accession no. KS01/178, XP003029508
    - ABDULLA SAHIH, Anuboga Vaithiya Navaneetham, (1975), pages 142 - 143
    - "Zimaad-e-paneer Barae Waram", TKDL, Database accession no. MH3/533F, XP003029509
    - MOHAMMAD AZAM KHAN, Muheet-e-Azam, (1896), vol. I, page 358