Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2054008

EP2054008 - METHODS AND DEVICES FOR DELIVERING FLUID TO A RESERVOIR OF A FLUID DELIVERY DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  16.11.2012
Database last updated on 15.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip18.07.2014Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): HU
published on 20.08.2014  [2014/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Medingo Ltd.
P.O. Box 261
20692 Yokneam Illit / IL
[2009/19]
Inventor(s)01 / YODFAT, Ofer
72 Galil St.
71908 Maccabim-Reut / IL
 [2009/19]
Representative(s)Evens, Paul Jonathan , et al
Maguire Boss
24 East Street
St. Ives, Cambridgeshire PE27 5PD / GB
[N/P]
Former [2009/19]Evens, Paul Jonathan , et al
Maguire Boss 24 East Street St. Ives
Cambridgeshire PE27 5PD / GB
Application number, filing date07805487.116.08.2007
[2009/19]
WO2007IL01027
Priority number, dateUS20060838660P18.08.2006         Original published format: US 838660 P
[2009/19]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2008020447
Date:21.02.2008
Language:EN
[2008/08]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2054008
Date:06.05.2009
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.02.2008
[2009/19]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2054008
Date:11.01.2012
Language:EN
[2012/02]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP21.02.2008
ClassificationInternational:A61J1/20
[2009/19]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/19]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNGEN ZUR ABGABE EINER FLÜSSIGKEIT AN EIN RESERVOIR EINER FLÜSSIGKEITSABGABEVORRICHTUNG[2009/19]
English:METHODS AND DEVICES FOR DELIVERING FLUID TO A RESERVOIR OF A FLUID DELIVERY DEVICE[2009/19]
French:PROCÉDÉS ET DISPOSITIFS D'INTRODUCTION DE FLUIDE DANS UN RÉSERVOIR D'UN DISPOSITIF D'ADMINISTRATION DE FLUIDE[2009/19]
Entry into regional phase13.03.2009National basic fee paid 
13.03.2009Designation fee(s) paid 
13.03.2009Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure11.03.2009Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
13.03.2009Examination requested  [2009/19]
03.11.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
28.04.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.11.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.02.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.07.2011Communication of intention to grant the patent
31.10.2011Fee for grant paid
31.10.2011Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  03.11.2009
Opposition(s)12.10.2012No opposition filed within time limit [2012/51]
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.08.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
16.08.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
08.08.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU16.08.2007
AT11.01.2012
BE11.01.2012
CY11.01.2012
CZ11.01.2012
DK11.01.2012
EE11.01.2012
FI11.01.2012
IT11.01.2012
LT11.01.2012
LV11.01.2012
MT11.01.2012
PL11.01.2012
RO11.01.2012
SE11.01.2012
SI11.01.2012
SK11.01.2012
TR11.01.2012
BG11.04.2012
GR12.04.2012
ES22.04.2012
IS11.05.2012
PT11.05.2012
IE16.08.2012
LU16.08.2012
CH31.08.2012
LI31.08.2012
MC31.08.2012
[2014/34]
Former [2014/27]AT11.01.2012
BE11.01.2012
CY11.01.2012
CZ11.01.2012
DK11.01.2012
EE11.01.2012
FI11.01.2012
IT11.01.2012
LT11.01.2012
LV11.01.2012
MT11.01.2012
PL11.01.2012
RO11.01.2012
SE11.01.2012
SI11.01.2012
SK11.01.2012
TR11.01.2012
BG11.04.2012
GR12.04.2012
ES22.04.2012
IS11.05.2012
PT11.05.2012
IE16.08.2012
LU16.08.2012
CH31.08.2012
LI31.08.2012
MC31.08.2012
Former [2014/21]AT11.01.2012
BE11.01.2012
CY11.01.2012
CZ11.01.2012
DK11.01.2012
EE11.01.2012
FI11.01.2012
IT11.01.2012
LT11.01.2012
LV11.01.2012
MT11.01.2012
PL11.01.2012
RO11.01.2012
SE11.01.2012
SI11.01.2012
SK11.01.2012
TR11.01.2012
BG11.04.2012
GR12.04.2012
ES22.04.2012
IS11.05.2012
PT11.05.2012
IE16.08.2012
CH31.08.2012
LI31.08.2012
MC31.08.2012
Former [2013/51]AT11.01.2012
BE11.01.2012
CY11.01.2012
CZ11.01.2012
DK11.01.2012
EE11.01.2012
FI11.01.2012
IT11.01.2012
LT11.01.2012
LV11.01.2012
MT11.01.2012
PL11.01.2012
RO11.01.2012
SE11.01.2012
SI11.01.2012
SK11.01.2012
BG11.04.2012
GR12.04.2012
ES22.04.2012
IS11.05.2012
PT11.05.2012
IE16.08.2012
CH31.08.2012
LI31.08.2012
MC31.08.2012
Former [2013/33]AT11.01.2012
BE11.01.2012
CY11.01.2012
CZ11.01.2012
DK11.01.2012
EE11.01.2012
FI11.01.2012
IT11.01.2012
LT11.01.2012
LV11.01.2012
PL11.01.2012
RO11.01.2012
SE11.01.2012
SI11.01.2012
SK11.01.2012
BG11.04.2012
GR12.04.2012
ES22.04.2012
IS11.05.2012
PT11.05.2012
IE16.08.2012
CH31.08.2012
LI31.08.2012
MC31.08.2012
Former [2013/22]AT11.01.2012
BE11.01.2012
CY11.01.2012
CZ11.01.2012
DK11.01.2012
EE11.01.2012
FI11.01.2012
IT11.01.2012
LT11.01.2012
LV11.01.2012
PL11.01.2012
RO11.01.2012
SE11.01.2012
SI11.01.2012
SK11.01.2012
BG11.04.2012
GR12.04.2012
ES22.04.2012
IS11.05.2012
PT11.05.2012
CH31.08.2012
LI31.08.2012
MC31.08.2012
Former [2013/20]AT11.01.2012
BE11.01.2012
CY11.01.2012
CZ11.01.2012
DK11.01.2012
EE11.01.2012
FI11.01.2012
IT11.01.2012
LT11.01.2012
LV11.01.2012
PL11.01.2012
RO11.01.2012
SE11.01.2012
SI11.01.2012
SK11.01.2012
BG11.04.2012
GR12.04.2012
IS11.05.2012
PT11.05.2012
CH31.08.2012
LI31.08.2012
MC31.08.2012
Former [2013/16]AT11.01.2012
BE11.01.2012
CY11.01.2012
CZ11.01.2012
DK11.01.2012
EE11.01.2012
FI11.01.2012
IT11.01.2012
LT11.01.2012
LV11.01.2012
PL11.01.2012
RO11.01.2012
SE11.01.2012
SI11.01.2012
SK11.01.2012
BG11.04.2012
GR12.04.2012
IS11.05.2012
PT11.05.2012
MC31.08.2012
Former [2013/07]AT11.01.2012
BE11.01.2012
CY11.01.2012
CZ11.01.2012
DK11.01.2012
EE11.01.2012
FI11.01.2012
IT11.01.2012
LT11.01.2012
LV11.01.2012
PL11.01.2012
RO11.01.2012
SE11.01.2012
SI11.01.2012
SK11.01.2012
BG11.04.2012
GR12.04.2012
IS11.05.2012
PT11.05.2012
Former [2012/50]BE11.01.2012
CY11.01.2012
CZ11.01.2012
DK11.01.2012
EE11.01.2012
FI11.01.2012
IT11.01.2012
LT11.01.2012
LV11.01.2012
PL11.01.2012
RO11.01.2012
SE11.01.2012
SI11.01.2012
SK11.01.2012
BG11.04.2012
GR12.04.2012
IS11.05.2012
PT11.05.2012
Former [2012/49]BE11.01.2012
CY11.01.2012
CZ11.01.2012
DK11.01.2012
EE11.01.2012
FI11.01.2012
LT11.01.2012
LV11.01.2012
PL11.01.2012
RO11.01.2012
SE11.01.2012
SI11.01.2012
BG11.04.2012
GR12.04.2012
IS11.05.2012
PT11.05.2012
Former [2012/48]BE11.01.2012
CY11.01.2012
EE11.01.2012
FI11.01.2012
LT11.01.2012
LV11.01.2012
PL11.01.2012
SE11.01.2012
SI11.01.2012
BG11.04.2012
GR12.04.2012
IS11.05.2012
PT11.05.2012
Former [2012/41]BE11.01.2012
CY11.01.2012
FI11.01.2012
LT11.01.2012
LV11.01.2012
PL11.01.2012
SI11.01.2012
BG11.04.2012
GR12.04.2012
IS11.05.2012
PT11.05.2012
Former [2012/39]BE11.01.2012
FI11.01.2012
LT11.01.2012
LV11.01.2012
PL11.01.2012
SI11.01.2012
BG11.04.2012
GR12.04.2012
IS11.05.2012
PT11.05.2012
Former [2012/37]BE11.01.2012
FI11.01.2012
LT11.01.2012
PL11.01.2012
SI11.01.2012
BG11.04.2012
GR12.04.2012
IS11.05.2012
PT11.05.2012
Former [2012/36]BE11.01.2012
LT11.01.2012
SI11.01.2012
BG11.04.2012
GR12.04.2012
IS11.05.2012
Former [2012/35]BE11.01.2012
LT11.01.2012
SI11.01.2012
BG11.04.2012
IS11.05.2012
Former [2012/34]BE11.01.2012
LT11.01.2012
SI11.01.2012
IS11.05.2012
Former [2012/33]BE11.01.2012
LT11.01.2012
SI11.01.2012
Former [2012/25]SI11.01.2012
Cited inInternational search[XAY]CA2170237  (ST PAUL MEDICAL INC [US]) [X] 1-7,14,15 * pages 10-12, line 11; figure 8 * [A] 8-13 [Y] 16-18;
 [XY]WO0035517  (CARMEL PHARMA AB [SE]; WESSMAN GOERAN [SE]) [X] 1-4 * figures 1,2A,2B2C,2D,2E,2F,2G,2H,2I,2J,3 * [Y] 16-18;
 [PX]WO2007015233  (MEDIMOP MEDICAL PROJECTS LTD [IL]; ZINGER FREDDY [IL]; DENENBURG IGOR) [PX] 1,3-6,14-18 * the whole document *;
 [PA]EP1731128  (ARIES S R L [IT]) [PA] 1,14-18 * paragraphs [0047] - [0057]; figures 1-11 *;
 [A]US2003032935  (DAMIANO LOUIS F [US] ET AL) [A] 1 * paragraphs [0026] - [0029]; figures 1a,1b,1c *;
 [A]WO2005074860  (HAINDL HANS [DE]) [A] 1-11,14 * the whole document *
ExaminationUS2002127150