Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2152284

EP2152284 - A SYNERGISTIC AYURVEDIC / FUNCTIONAL FOOD BIOACTIVE COMPOSITION [CINCATA] [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  06.01.2012
Database last updated on 24.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip06.01.2012Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 08.02.2012  [2012/06]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Avesthagen Limited
'Discoverer' 9th Floor International Tech Park Whitefield Road Bangalore
Karnataka 560 066 / IN
[2010/07]
Inventor(s)01 / MORAWALA-PATELL, Villoo
c/o Avesthagen Limited 'Discoverer' 9th Floor International Tech Park Whitefield Road
Bangalore, Karnataka 560 066 / IN
02 / ULLANAT, Rajesh
c/o Avesthagen Limited 'Discoverer' 9th Floor International Tech Park Whitefield Road
Bangalore, Karnataka 560 066 / IN
03 / MUNDRIGI, Ashok
c/o Avesthagen Limited 'Discoverer' 9th Floor International Tech Park Whitefield Road
Bangalore, Karnataka 560 066 / IN
04 / HENJARAPPA, Jagadeesh, Badamaranahalli
c/o Avesthagen Limited 'Discoverer' 9th Floor International Tech Park Whitefield Road
Bangalore, Karnataka 560 066 / IN
05 / SIDDAIAH, Chandramohan, Bangalore
c/o Avesthagen Limited 'Discoverer' 9th Floor International Tech Park Whitefield Road
Bangalore, Karnataka 560 066 / IN
 [2010/07]
Representative(s)Ehnis, Tobias , et al
Dr. Gassner & Partner mbB
Patentanwälte
Marie-Curie-Strasse 1
91052 Erlangen / DE
[N/P]
Former [2010/08]Ehnis, Tobias , et al
Patentanwälte Dr. Gassner & Partner Marie-Curie-Strasse 1
91052 Erlangen / DE
Former [2010/07]Ehnis, Tobias , et al
Dr. Gassner & Partner Nägelsbachstrasse 49A
91052 Erlangen / DE
Application number, filing date07805634.829.06.2007
[2010/07]
WO2007IN00264
Priority number, dateINCH1076200723.05.2007         Original published format: IN CH10762007
[2010/07]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2008142702
Date:27.11.2008
Language:EN
[2008/48]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2152284
Date:17.02.2010
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.11.2008
[2010/07]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:AU27.11.2008
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.01.2011
ClassificationInternational:A61K36/37, A61K36/54, A61K36/61, A61P3/10
[2010/07]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2010/07]
TitleGerman:SYNERGISTISCHES AYURVEDISCHES/FUNKTIONALES NAHRUNGSMITTEL ALS BIOAKTIVE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG (CINCATA)[2010/07]
English:A SYNERGISTIC AYURVEDIC / FUNCTIONAL FOOD BIOACTIVE COMPOSITION [CINCATA][2010/07]
French:COMPOSITION BIOACTIVE ALIMENTAIRE AYURVÉDIQUE / FONCTIONNELLE SYNERGIQUE [CINCATA][2010/07]
Entry into regional phase02.12.2009National basic fee paid 
02.12.2009Search fee paid 
02.12.2009Designation fee(s) paid 
02.12.2009Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure02.12.2009Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
02.12.2009Examination requested  [2010/07]
17.06.2010Observations by third parties
23.09.2011Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2012/06]
06.12.2011Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2012/06]
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.12.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
23.12.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.06.201004   M06   Fee paid on   23.12.2010
30.06.201105   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[E]WO2009001362  (ASCARIT LTD [IL]; FOGEL DOV [IL]) [E] 1-17 * the whole document *;
 [X]US5886029  (DHALIWAL KIRPAL S [US]) [X] 1-17 * abstract * * column 2, line 49 - line 65 * * column 3, line 40 - line 55; claims 1-3, 14 *;
 [Y]  - MANG B ET AL, "Effects of a cinnamon extract on plasma glucose, HbA1c, and serum lipids in diabetes mellitus type 2", EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF CLINICAL INVESTIGATION, WILEY-BLACKWELL PUBLISHING LTD, GB, (20060501), vol. 36, no. 5, doi:DOI:10.1111/J.1365-2362.2006.01629.X, ISSN 0014-2972, pages 340 - 344, XP002442211 [Y] 1-17 * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1365-2362.2006.01629.x
 [Y]  - VERSPOHL E J ET AL, "Antidiabetic effect of Cinnamomum cassia and Cinnamomum zeylanicum in vivo and in vitro", PHYTOTHERAPY RESEARCH, JOHN WILEY & SONS LTD. CHICHESTER, GB, (20050101), vol. 19, no. 3, doi:DOI:10.1002/PTR.1643, ISSN 0951-418X, pages 203 - 206, XP002442209 [Y] 1-17 * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/ptr.1643
 [Y]  - KAR A ET AL, "Comparative evaluation of hypoglycaemic activity of some Indian medicinal plants in alloxan diabetic rats", JOURNAL OF ETHNOPHARMACOLOGY, ELSEVIER SCIENTIFIC PUBLISHERS LTD, IE, (20030101), vol. 84, no. 1, doi:DOI:10.1016/S0378-8741(02)00144-7, ISSN 0378-8741, pages 105 - 108, XP002442210 [Y] 1-17 * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0378-8741(02)00144-7
 [X]  - Mega Noikku Legyam, TKDL, GP02/658, (1800), TKDL, URL: http://www.tkdl.res.in/tkdl/LangDefault/common/TKDL_AdvanceQueryData.asp?GL=Eng, (20101222), XP002615047 [X] 1-17 * the whole document *
 [X]  - Meganoikku Kudineer, TKDL, GP02/666, (1800), TKDL, URL: http://www.tkdl.res.in/tkdl/LangDefault/common/TKDL_AdvanceQueryData.asp?GL=Eng, (20101222), XP002615048 [X] 1-17 * the whole document *
 [X]  - Neerizhiuvu Noikku Kudineer, TDKL, AM05/1644, (1800), URL: http://www.tkdl.res.in/tkdl/LangDefault/common/TKDL_AdvanceQueryData.asp?GL=Eng, (20101222), XP002615049 [X] 1-17 * the whole document *
International search[A]WO0172316  ;
 [A]US6376682  ;
 [A]US5691386  ;
 [A]US2006286182  ;
 [A]WO0074698  ;
 [A]  - VENKATESWARLU V. ET AL., "Antidiabetic activity of roots of Salacia macrosperm", PLANTA MED., (1993), vol. 59, pages 391 - 393, XP008123673

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1055/s-2006-959715
 [A]  - KIM S.H. ET AL., "Anti-Diabetic effect of cinnamon extract on blood glucose in db/db mice", JOURNAL OF ETHANOPHARMACOLOGY, (2006), vol. 104, pages 119 - 123, XP022306868

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jep.2005.08.059
 [A]  - RAVI K. ET AL., "Protective effect of Eugenia Jambolana Seed Kernel on Tissue Antioxidants in Streptozotocin-Induced Diabetic Rats", BIOL. PHARM. BULL., (2004), vol. 27, no. 8, pages 1212 - 1217, XP008123656

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1248/bpb.27.1212