Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2065456

EP2065456 - RESIN COMPOSITION FOR DAMPING MATERIAL AND DAMPING MATERIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  28.02.2014
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip05.09.2019New entry: Date of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Koatsu Gas Kogyo Co., Ltd.
1-5 Doyama-cho Kita-ku Osaka-shi Osaka
5308411 / JP
[2009/23]
Inventor(s)01 / SUGIMAE, Toshio
c/o Koatsu Gas Kogyo Co., Ltd., Tokyo Laboratory
620-1, Ishikawa
Sakura-shi, Chiba 2850813 / JP
02 / INOUE, Kiyohiro
c/o Koatsu Gas Kogyo Co., Ltd., Tokyo Laboratory
620-1, Ishikawa
Sakura-shi, Chiba 2850813 / JP
03 / TAGUCHI, Yasushi
c/o Koatsu Gas Kogyo Co., Ltd., Tokyo Laboratory
620-1, Ishikawa
Sakura-shi, Chiba 2850813 / JP
 [2014/14]
Former [2009/23]01 / SUGIMAE, Toshio
c/o Koatsu Gas Kogyo Co., Ltd., Tokyo Laboratory, 620-1, Ishikawa
Sakura-shi, Chiba 2850813 / JP
02 / INOUE, Kiyohiro
c/o Koatsu Gas Kogyo Co., Ltd., Tokyo Laboratory, 620-1, Ishikawa
Sakura-shi, Chiba 2850813 / JP
03 / TAGUCHI, Yasushi
c/o Koatsu Gas Kogyo Co., Ltd., Tokyo Laboratory, 620-1, Ishikawa
Sakura-shi, Chiba 2850813 / JP
Representative(s)Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/14]Vossius & Partner
Siebertstrasse 4
81675 München / DE
Former [2009/23]Vossius & Partner
Siebertstrasse 4
81675 München / DE
Application number, filing date07806259.329.08.2007
[2009/23]
WO2007JP66782
Priority number, dateJP2006023377430.08.2006         Original published format: JP 2006233774
[2009/23]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2008026645
Date:06.03.2008
Language:JA
[2008/10]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2065456
Date:03.06.2009
Language:EN
[2009/23]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2065456
Date:02.04.2014
Language:EN
[2014/14]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP06.03.2008
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP13.10.2010
ClassificationInternational:C08L23/28, C08L23/02, C08L23/08, C08L101/00, // C08L33/04
[2013/40]
Former International [2010/45]C08L33/04, C08L23/28, C09D133/04, C09D123/28, // C08L101/02
Former International [2009/23]C09K3/00, C08J9/30, C08K7/02, C08L101/02
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/23]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:HARZZUSAMMENSETZUNG FÜR DÄMPFUNGSMATERIAL SOWIE DÄMPFUNGSMATERIAL[2009/23]
English:RESIN COMPOSITION FOR DAMPING MATERIAL AND DAMPING MATERIAL[2009/23]
French:COMPOSITION DE RÉSINE POUR UN MATÉRIAU AMORTISSEUR ET MATÉRIAU AMORTISSEUR[2009/23]
Entry into regional phase26.03.2009Translation filed 
26.03.2009National basic fee paid 
26.03.2009Search fee paid 
26.03.2009Designation fee(s) paid 
26.03.2009Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure26.03.2009Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
26.03.2009Examination requested  [2009/23]
09.08.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
14.02.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.06.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
06.09.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.10.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
14.02.2014Fee for grant paid
14.02.2014Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  09.08.2011
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  02.01.2015   
Henkel AG & Co. KGaA
Henkelstrasse 67
40589 Düsseldorf / DE
 [2015/07]
06.02.2015Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
11.08.2015Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
08.02.2017Date of oral proceedings
27.02.2017Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
27.02.2017Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
Appeal following opposition26.04.2017Appeal received No.  T1013/17
27.06.2017Statement of grounds filed
10.09.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.08.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
24.08.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
25.08.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
24.08.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
26.08.2013Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU29.08.2007
AT02.04.2014
BE02.04.2014
CY02.04.2014
CZ02.04.2014
DK02.04.2014
EE02.04.2014
ES02.04.2014
FI02.04.2014
IT02.04.2014
LT02.04.2014
LV02.04.2014
MC02.04.2014
MT02.04.2014
NL02.04.2014
PL02.04.2014
RO02.04.2014
SE02.04.2014
SI02.04.2014
SK02.04.2014
TR02.04.2014
BG02.07.2014
GR03.07.2014
IS02.08.2014
PT04.08.2014
GB29.08.2014
IE29.08.2014
LU29.08.2014
CH31.08.2014
LI31.08.2014
[2016/33]
Former [2016/32]HU29.08.2007
AT02.04.2014
BE02.04.2014
CY02.04.2014
CZ02.04.2014
DK02.04.2014
EE02.04.2014
ES02.04.2014
FI02.04.2014
IT02.04.2014
LT02.04.2014
LV02.04.2014
MC02.04.2014
MT02.04.2014
NL02.04.2014
PL02.04.2014
RO02.04.2014
SE02.04.2014
SI02.04.2014
SK02.04.2014
BG02.07.2014
GR03.07.2014
IS02.08.2014
PT04.08.2014
GB29.08.2014
IE29.08.2014
LU29.08.2014
CH31.08.2014
LI31.08.2014
Former [2016/28]AT02.04.2014
BE02.04.2014
CY02.04.2014
CZ02.04.2014
DK02.04.2014
EE02.04.2014
ES02.04.2014
FI02.04.2014
IT02.04.2014
LT02.04.2014
LV02.04.2014
MC02.04.2014
MT02.04.2014
NL02.04.2014
PL02.04.2014
RO02.04.2014
SE02.04.2014
SI02.04.2014
SK02.04.2014
BG02.07.2014
GR03.07.2014
IS02.08.2014
PT04.08.2014
GB29.08.2014
IE29.08.2014
LU29.08.2014
CH31.08.2014
LI31.08.2014
Former [2015/37]AT02.04.2014
BE02.04.2014
CY02.04.2014
CZ02.04.2014
DK02.04.2014
EE02.04.2014
ES02.04.2014
FI02.04.2014
IT02.04.2014
LT02.04.2014
LV02.04.2014
MC02.04.2014
NL02.04.2014
PL02.04.2014
RO02.04.2014
SE02.04.2014
SI02.04.2014
SK02.04.2014
BG02.07.2014
GR03.07.2014
IS02.08.2014
PT04.08.2014
GB29.08.2014
IE29.08.2014
LU29.08.2014
CH31.08.2014
LI31.08.2014
Former [2015/36]AT02.04.2014
BE02.04.2014
CY02.04.2014
CZ02.04.2014
DK02.04.2014
EE02.04.2014
ES02.04.2014
FI02.04.2014
IT02.04.2014
LT02.04.2014
LV02.04.2014
MC02.04.2014
NL02.04.2014
PL02.04.2014
RO02.04.2014
SE02.04.2014
SI02.04.2014
SK02.04.2014
BG02.07.2014
GR03.07.2014
IS02.08.2014
PT04.08.2014
GB29.08.2014
LU29.08.2014
CH31.08.2014
LI31.08.2014
Former [2015/20]AT02.04.2014
BE02.04.2014
CY02.04.2014
CZ02.04.2014
DK02.04.2014
EE02.04.2014
ES02.04.2014
FI02.04.2014
IT02.04.2014
LT02.04.2014
LV02.04.2014
MC02.04.2014
NL02.04.2014
PL02.04.2014
RO02.04.2014
SE02.04.2014
SK02.04.2014
BG02.07.2014
GR03.07.2014
IS02.08.2014
PT04.08.2014
LU29.08.2014
CH31.08.2014
LI31.08.2014
Former [2015/19]AT02.04.2014
BE02.04.2014
CY02.04.2014
CZ02.04.2014
DK02.04.2014
EE02.04.2014
ES02.04.2014
FI02.04.2014
IT02.04.2014
LT02.04.2014
LV02.04.2014
MC02.04.2014
NL02.04.2014
PL02.04.2014
RO02.04.2014
SE02.04.2014
SK02.04.2014
BG02.07.2014
GR03.07.2014
IS02.08.2014
PT04.08.2014
LU29.08.2014
Former [2015/18]AT02.04.2014
BE02.04.2014
CY02.04.2014
CZ02.04.2014
DK02.04.2014
EE02.04.2014
ES02.04.2014
FI02.04.2014
IT02.04.2014
LT02.04.2014
LV02.04.2014
MC02.04.2014
NL02.04.2014
PL02.04.2014
RO02.04.2014
SE02.04.2014
SK02.04.2014
BG02.07.2014
GR03.07.2014
IS02.08.2014
PT04.08.2014
Former [2015/11]AT02.04.2014
BE02.04.2014
CY02.04.2014
CZ02.04.2014
DK02.04.2014
EE02.04.2014
ES02.04.2014
FI02.04.2014
LT02.04.2014
LV02.04.2014
NL02.04.2014
PL02.04.2014
RO02.04.2014
SE02.04.2014
SK02.04.2014
BG02.07.2014
GR03.07.2014
IS02.08.2014
PT04.08.2014
Former [2015/10]AT02.04.2014
BE02.04.2014
CY02.04.2014
CZ02.04.2014
DK02.04.2014
EE02.04.2014
ES02.04.2014
FI02.04.2014
LT02.04.2014
LV02.04.2014
NL02.04.2014
PL02.04.2014
SE02.04.2014
SK02.04.2014
BG02.07.2014
GR03.07.2014
IS02.08.2014
PT04.08.2014
Former [2015/08]AT02.04.2014
BE02.04.2014
CY02.04.2014
CZ02.04.2014
DK02.04.2014
ES02.04.2014
FI02.04.2014
LT02.04.2014
LV02.04.2014
NL02.04.2014
PL02.04.2014
SE02.04.2014
BG02.07.2014
GR03.07.2014
IS02.08.2014
PT04.08.2014
Former [2015/02]AT02.04.2014
CY02.04.2014
CZ02.04.2014
ES02.04.2014
FI02.04.2014
LT02.04.2014
LV02.04.2014
NL02.04.2014
PL02.04.2014
SE02.04.2014
BG02.07.2014
GR03.07.2014
IS02.08.2014
PT04.08.2014
Former [2014/51]AT02.04.2014
CY02.04.2014
CZ02.04.2014
ES02.04.2014
FI02.04.2014
LT02.04.2014
LV02.04.2014
NL02.04.2014
PL02.04.2014
SE02.04.2014
BG02.07.2014
GR03.07.2014
IS02.08.2014
Former [2014/50]CY02.04.2014
CZ02.04.2014
ES02.04.2014
FI02.04.2014
LT02.04.2014
LV02.04.2014
NL02.04.2014
PL02.04.2014
SE02.04.2014
BG02.07.2014
GR03.07.2014
IS02.08.2014
Former [2014/49]CY02.04.2014
CZ02.04.2014
FI02.04.2014
LT02.04.2014
BG02.07.2014
IS02.08.2014
Former [2014/48]CY02.04.2014
CZ02.04.2014
LT02.04.2014
BG02.07.2014
Former [2014/47]CY02.04.2014
Documents cited:Search[X]US2004087721  (BRUHN JEFFREY N [US] ET AL) [X] 1,2,7-9 * table 1 *;
 [X]US2004082721  (MIURA TADASHI [JP] ET AL) [X] 1-3,8,9 * examples 2,5,7,8,13,15,17 *;
 [X]DE10223047  (BASF AG [DE]) [X] 1,2,4,7-9 * Partikeldispersion (B)-2; page 16; example 2 * * page 17, line 15 *;
 [X]US4588774  (DEAN BARRY D [US]) [X] 1,2 * examples 2-4 *;
 [X]JPH06128492  (AISIN CHEM) [X] 1-11 * page 1; examples 1,4 *
International search[X]JPS6448951  (BRIDGESTONE CORP);
 [A]JP2005255800  (CCI CORP);
 [A]WO0132777  (SHISHIAI KK [JP]);
 [A]JP2006199759  (KOBE STEEL LTD, et al);
 [A]JPS5970559  (CENTRAL GLASS CO LTD)
by applicantJP2001152028
 JPH06158747
 JPH09302139
 JPH0726784
 JPH0861003