Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2060606

EP2060606 - POLYCARBONATE RESIN COMPOSITION COMPRISING PLANT-DERIVED COMPONENT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  13.03.2015
Database last updated on 22.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip15.07.2016Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): TR
published on 17.08.2016  [2016/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Teijin Limited
6-7, Minamihommachi 1-chome Chuo-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-0054 / JP
[2009/21]
Inventor(s)01 / ODA, Akimichi
c/o Teijin Limited Iwakuni Research Center, 2-1, H
inode-cho
Iwakuni-shi, Yamaguchi 740-0014 / JP
02 / MIYOSHI, Takanori
c/o Teijin Limited Iwakuni Research Center, 2-1, H
inode-cho
Iwakuni-shi, Yamaguchi 740-0014 / JP
 [2014/19]
Former [2009/21]01 / ODA, Akimichi
c/o Teijin Limited Iwakuni Research Center, 2-1, H inode-cho
Iwakuni-shi, Yamaguchi 740-0014 / JP
02 / MIYOSHI, Takanori
c/o Teijin Limited Iwakuni Research Center, 2-1, H inode-cho
Iwakuni-shi, Yamaguchi 740-0014 / JP
Representative(s)Hallybone, Huw George , et al
Carpmaels & Ransford LLP
One Southampton Row
London WC1B 5HA / GB
[2014/19]
Former [2009/21]Hallybone, Huw George , et al
Carpmaels & Ransford 43-45 Bloomsbury Square
London WC1A 2RA / GB
Application number, filing date07806552.127.08.2007
[2009/21]
WO2007JP67079
Priority number, dateJP2006023042828.08.2006         Original published format: JP 2006230428
[2009/21]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2008026744
Date:06.03.2008
Language:JA
[2008/10]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2060606
Date:20.05.2009
Language:EN
[2009/21]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2060606
Date:07.05.2014
Language:EN
[2014/19]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP06.03.2008
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP13.09.2012
ClassificationInternational:C08L69/00, C08G64/02, C08G64/34, C08L67/04
[2009/21]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/21]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:POLYCARBONATHARZZUSAMMENSETZUNG MIT EINER AUS PFLANZEN GEWONNENEN KOMPONENTE[2009/21]
English:POLYCARBONATE RESIN COMPOSITION COMPRISING PLANT-DERIVED COMPONENT[2009/21]
French:COMPOSITION DE RÉSINE POLYCARBONATE COMPRENANT UN COMPOSANT D'ORIGINE VÉGÉTALE[2009/21]
Entry into regional phase18.03.2009Translation filed 
18.03.2009National basic fee paid 
18.03.2009Search fee paid 
18.03.2009Designation fee(s) paid 
18.03.2009Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure18.03.2009Examination requested  [2009/21]
08.10.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
14.01.2014Fee for grant paid
14.01.2014Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  08.10.2013
Opposition(s)10.02.2015No opposition filed within time limit [2015/16]
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.03.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
17.08.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
11.08.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
10.08.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
19.08.2013Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU27.08.2007
AT07.05.2014
BE07.05.2014
BG07.05.2014
CY07.05.2014
CZ07.05.2014
DK07.05.2014
EE07.05.2014
ES07.05.2014
FI07.05.2014
IT07.05.2014
LT07.05.2014
LV07.05.2014
MC07.05.2014
MT07.05.2014
NL07.05.2014
PL07.05.2014
RO07.05.2014
SE07.05.2014
SI07.05.2014
SK07.05.2014
TR07.05.2014
GR08.08.2014
IE27.08.2014
LU27.08.2014
CH31.08.2014
LI31.08.2014
IS07.09.2014
PT08.09.2014
[2016/33]
Former [2016/32]HU27.08.2007
AT07.05.2014
BE07.05.2014
BG07.05.2014
CY07.05.2014
CZ07.05.2014
DK07.05.2014
EE07.05.2014
ES07.05.2014
FI07.05.2014
IT07.05.2014
LT07.05.2014
LV07.05.2014
MC07.05.2014
MT07.05.2014
NL07.05.2014
PL07.05.2014
RO07.05.2014
SE07.05.2014
SI07.05.2014
SK07.05.2014
GR08.08.2014
IE27.08.2014
LU27.08.2014
CH31.08.2014
LI31.08.2014
IS07.09.2014
PT08.09.2014
Former [2016/28]AT07.05.2014
BE07.05.2014
BG07.05.2014
CY07.05.2014
CZ07.05.2014
DK07.05.2014
EE07.05.2014
ES07.05.2014
FI07.05.2014
IT07.05.2014
LT07.05.2014
LV07.05.2014
MC07.05.2014
MT07.05.2014
NL07.05.2014
PL07.05.2014
RO07.05.2014
SE07.05.2014
SI07.05.2014
SK07.05.2014
GR08.08.2014
IE27.08.2014
LU27.08.2014
CH31.08.2014
LI31.08.2014
IS07.09.2014
PT08.09.2014
Former [2016/25]AT07.05.2014
BE07.05.2014
BG07.05.2014
CY07.05.2014
CZ07.05.2014
DK07.05.2014
EE07.05.2014
ES07.05.2014
FI07.05.2014
IT07.05.2014
LT07.05.2014
LV07.05.2014
MC07.05.2014
NL07.05.2014
PL07.05.2014
RO07.05.2014
SE07.05.2014
SI07.05.2014
SK07.05.2014
GR08.08.2014
IE27.08.2014
LU27.08.2014
CH31.08.2014
LI31.08.2014
IS07.09.2014
PT08.09.2014
Former [2015/37]AT07.05.2014
BE07.05.2014
CY07.05.2014
CZ07.05.2014
DK07.05.2014
EE07.05.2014
ES07.05.2014
FI07.05.2014
IT07.05.2014
LT07.05.2014
LV07.05.2014
MC07.05.2014
NL07.05.2014
PL07.05.2014
RO07.05.2014
SE07.05.2014
SI07.05.2014
SK07.05.2014
GR08.08.2014
IE27.08.2014
LU27.08.2014
CH31.08.2014
LI31.08.2014
IS07.09.2014
PT08.09.2014
Former [2015/36]AT07.05.2014
BE07.05.2014
CY07.05.2014
CZ07.05.2014
DK07.05.2014
EE07.05.2014
ES07.05.2014
FI07.05.2014
IT07.05.2014
LT07.05.2014
LV07.05.2014
MC07.05.2014
NL07.05.2014
PL07.05.2014
RO07.05.2014
SE07.05.2014
SI07.05.2014
SK07.05.2014
GR08.08.2014
LU27.08.2014
CH31.08.2014
LI31.08.2014
IS07.09.2014
PT08.09.2014
Former [2015/30]AT07.05.2014
BE07.05.2014
CY07.05.2014
CZ07.05.2014
DK07.05.2014
EE07.05.2014
ES07.05.2014
FI07.05.2014
IT07.05.2014
LT07.05.2014
LV07.05.2014
MC07.05.2014
NL07.05.2014
PL07.05.2014
RO07.05.2014
SE07.05.2014
SK07.05.2014
GR08.08.2014
LU27.08.2014
CH31.08.2014
LI31.08.2014
IS07.09.2014
PT08.09.2014
Former [2015/22]AT07.05.2014
CY07.05.2014
CZ07.05.2014
DK07.05.2014
EE07.05.2014
ES07.05.2014
FI07.05.2014
IT07.05.2014
LT07.05.2014
LV07.05.2014
MC07.05.2014
NL07.05.2014
PL07.05.2014
RO07.05.2014
SE07.05.2014
SK07.05.2014
GR08.08.2014
LU27.08.2014
BE31.08.2014
CH31.08.2014
LI31.08.2014
IS07.09.2014
PT08.09.2014
Former [2015/20]AT07.05.2014
CY07.05.2014
CZ07.05.2014
DK07.05.2014
EE07.05.2014
ES07.05.2014
FI07.05.2014
LT07.05.2014
LV07.05.2014
MC07.05.2014
NL07.05.2014
PL07.05.2014
RO07.05.2014
SE07.05.2014
SK07.05.2014
GR08.08.2014
LU27.08.2014
BE31.08.2014
CH31.08.2014
LI31.08.2014
IS07.09.2014
PT08.09.2014
Former [2015/19]AT07.05.2014
CY07.05.2014
CZ07.05.2014
DK07.05.2014
EE07.05.2014
ES07.05.2014
FI07.05.2014
LT07.05.2014
LV07.05.2014
MC07.05.2014
NL07.05.2014
PL07.05.2014
RO07.05.2014
SE07.05.2014
SK07.05.2014
GR08.08.2014
LU27.08.2014
BE31.08.2014
IS07.09.2014
PT08.09.2014
Former [2015/18]AT07.05.2014
BE07.05.2014
CY07.05.2014
CZ07.05.2014
DK07.05.2014
EE07.05.2014
ES07.05.2014
FI07.05.2014
LT07.05.2014
LV07.05.2014
MC07.05.2014
NL07.05.2014
PL07.05.2014
RO07.05.2014
SE07.05.2014
SK07.05.2014
GR08.08.2014
IS07.09.2014
PT08.09.2014
Former [2015/12]AT07.05.2014
BE07.05.2014
CY07.05.2014
CZ07.05.2014
DK07.05.2014
EE07.05.2014
ES07.05.2014
FI07.05.2014
LT07.05.2014
LV07.05.2014
NL07.05.2014
PL07.05.2014
RO07.05.2014
SE07.05.2014
SK07.05.2014
GR08.08.2014
IS07.09.2014
PT08.09.2014
Former [2015/11]AT07.05.2014
BE07.05.2014
CY07.05.2014
CZ07.05.2014
DK07.05.2014
EE07.05.2014
ES07.05.2014
FI07.05.2014
LT07.05.2014
LV07.05.2014
PL07.05.2014
RO07.05.2014
SE07.05.2014
SK07.05.2014
GR08.08.2014
IS07.09.2014
PT08.09.2014
Former [2015/10]AT07.05.2014
BE07.05.2014
CY07.05.2014
CZ07.05.2014
DK07.05.2014
EE07.05.2014
ES07.05.2014
FI07.05.2014
LT07.05.2014
LV07.05.2014
PL07.05.2014
SE07.05.2014
SK07.05.2014
GR08.08.2014
IS07.09.2014
PT08.09.2014
Former [2015/08]AT07.05.2014
BE07.05.2014
CY07.05.2014
DK07.05.2014
ES07.05.2014
FI07.05.2014
LT07.05.2014
LV07.05.2014
PL07.05.2014
SE07.05.2014
GR08.08.2014
IS07.09.2014
PT08.09.2014
Former [2015/02]AT07.05.2014
CY07.05.2014
ES07.05.2014
FI07.05.2014
LT07.05.2014
LV07.05.2014
PL07.05.2014
SE07.05.2014
GR08.08.2014
IS07.09.2014
PT08.09.2014
Former [2014/51]AT07.05.2014
CY07.05.2014
ES07.05.2014
FI07.05.2014
LT07.05.2014
LV07.05.2014
PL07.05.2014
SE07.05.2014
GR08.08.2014
IS07.09.2014
Former [2014/50]CY07.05.2014
ES07.05.2014
FI07.05.2014
LT07.05.2014
LV07.05.2014
PL07.05.2014
SE07.05.2014
GR08.08.2014
IS07.09.2014
Former [2014/49]CY07.05.2014
FI07.05.2014
LT07.05.2014
IS07.09.2014
Former [2014/48]CY07.05.2014
LT07.05.2014
Former [2014/47]CY07.05.2014
Documents cited:Search[AP]WO2007083820  (TEIJIN CHEMICALS LTD [JP], et al) [AP] 1-6 * examples 3-5, 6-9; table 1 *;
 [A]EP1264860  (MITSUI CHEMICALS INC [JP]) [A] 1-6 * example 4; table 1 *;
 [A]US2005143554  (DHARA DIBAKAR [IN], et al) [A] 1-6 * examples 1-2; table 2 *;
 [A]EP1640400  (TEIJIN LTD [JP]) [A] 1-6 * the whole document *
International search[AP]JP2007146019  (MITSUI CHEMICALS INC);
 [AP]JP2007070391  (TEIJIN LTD);
 [A]JP2006036954  (TEIJIN LTD)
by applicantJP2004111106
 JP2005048067
 JPH07109413
 JPH11140292
 JP2004250549