Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2024697

EP2024697 - REFRIGERATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  15.06.2018
Database last updated on 19.02.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  07.07.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  13.12.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip15.06.2018No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 18.07.2018  [2018/29]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
LG Electronics, Inc.
20, Yoido-dong, Yongdungpo-ku
Seoul 105-875 / KR
[2009/08]
Inventor(s)01 / KIM, Hyeong-Il
LG Electronics Inc. IP Group
391-2 Geaumjeong-dong
Changwon City, Gyeongsangnam-do 541-711 / KR
 [2017/32]
Former [2009/15]01 / KIM, Hyeong-Il
LG Electronics Inc. IP Group 391-2 Geaumjeong-dong
Changwon City, Gyeongsangnam-do 541-711 / KR
Former [2009/08]01 / KIM, Hyeong-Il
Daewoo Prugio Apt. 13 Danji Wolsan-maoel, 806-6, Bugok-ri, Jangyu-myeon
Gimhae-si, Gyeongsangnam-do 621-833 / KR
Representative(s)Boult Wade Tennant LLP
Verulam Gardens
70 Gray's Inn Road
London WC1X 8BT / GB
[N/P]
Former [2013/51]Boult Wade Tennant
Verulam Gardens
70 Gray's Inn Road
London WC1X 8BT / GB
Former [2009/08]Palmer, Jonathan R.
Boult Wade Tennant, Verulam Gardens, 70 Gray's Inn Road
London WC1X 8BT / GB
Application number, filing date07807923.304.06.2007
[2009/08]
WO2007KR02707
Priority number, dateKR2006005055605.06.2006         Original published format: KR 20060050556
[2009/08]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2007142446
Date:13.12.2007
Language:EN
[2007/50]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2024697
Date:18.02.2009
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.12.2007
[2009/08]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2024697
Date:09.08.2017
Language:EN
[2017/32]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR13.12.2007
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.11.2013
ClassificationInternational:F25D23/12, F25D23/02
[2013/51]
Former International [2009/08]F25D25/00
Designated contracting statesDE,   GB,   IT [2017/32]
Former [2009/29]DE,  GB,  IT 
Former [2009/08]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:KÜHLSCHRANK[2009/08]
English:REFRIGERATOR[2009/08]
French:RÉFRIGÉRATEUR[2009/08]
Entry into regional phase14.11.2008National basic fee paid 
14.11.2008Search fee paid 
14.11.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
14.11.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure14.11.2008Examination requested  [2009/08]
08.01.2009Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
12.02.2009Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR
02.06.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
14.12.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.04.2017Fee for grant paid
12.04.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
12.04.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  14.12.2016
Opposition(s)11.05.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/29]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.06.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
23.06.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
24.06.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
31.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
20.06.2013Renewal fee patent year 07
31.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 08
19.06.2015Renewal fee patent year 09
27.06.2016Renewal fee patent year 10
27.06.2017Renewal fee patent year 11
Documents cited:Search[XI]US6857541  (CRISP III HARRY LEE [US]) [X] 1,3 * abstract * * paragraph [0141] * [I] 2,4-12;
 [XA]KR20050071221  (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [X] 1 * figures 1, 2 * [A] 2-12;
 [XA]JP2003262460  (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [X] 1 * abstract * [A] 2-12;
 [A]US3934758  (KIPP FREDERICK M) [A] 1-12 * abstract *;
 [A]KR100550553B  (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [A] 1-12 * figures 1-24 *;
 [A]US2005072178  (PARK JI-YOUNG [KR], et al) [A] 1-12 * abstract *
International search[Y]KR20040042746  (LG ELECTRONICS INC);
 [Y]KR20040102571  (LG ELECTRONICS INC);
 [A]KR20050071221  (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]);
 [A]WO2004085937  (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR], et al)
ExaminationUS3476295
by applicantUS6857541