EP2020058 - FLEXIBLE ELECTRICAL CONNECTOR/HOUSING ASSEMBLY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.05.2016 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.05.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.06.2016 [2016/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Deere & Company One John Deere Place Moline, IL 61265 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2009/06] | For all designated states Deere & Company One John Deere Place Moline, IL 61265 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HARMELINK, Gregory, Keith 4025 Rivershore Drive Moorhead, MN 56560 / US | 02 /
SCHLICHTMANN, Michael, Ray 3912 21st Street South Fargo, ND 58104 / US | 03 /
COWLES, Kevin, Park 3647 22nd Street South Fargo, ND 58104 / US | 04 /
JACOBSON, Jon, Thomas 4727 Rose Creek Parkway Fargo, ND 58104 / US | [2009/06] | Representative(s) | Holst, Sönke John Deere GmbH & Co. KG Global Intellectual Property Services John-Deere-Strasse 70 68163 Mannheim / DE | [2015/27] |
Former [2009/06] | Holst, Sönke Deere & Company European Office Global Intellectual Property Services John-Deere-Strasse 70 68163 Mannheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 07809008.1 | 11.04.2007 | [2009/06] | WO2007US08780 | Priority number, date | US20060434341 | 15.05.2006 Original published format: US 434341 | [2009/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007133354 | Date: | 22.11.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/47] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2020058 | Date: | 04.02.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.11.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2020058 | Date: | 01.07.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 03.04.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.05.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H01R13/518, H01R13/52, H01R27/02, H01R13/658, // H01R13/74, H01R12/58 | [2015/09] | CPC: |
H01R27/02 (EP,US);
H01R13/518 (EP,US);
H01R13/5219 (EP,US);
H01R12/58 (EP,US);
H01R13/74 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2012/22] | H01R13/518, H01R13/52, H01R27/02, H01R13/658 | ||
Former IPC [2009/06] | H01R13/60 | Designated contracting states | DE, GB [2015/27] |
Former [2009/29] | DE, GB | ||
Former [2009/06] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | FLEXIBLE ELEKTRISCHE STECKVERBINDER-/GEHÄUSEANORDNUNG | [2009/06] | English: | FLEXIBLE ELECTRICAL CONNECTOR/HOUSING ASSEMBLY | [2009/06] | French: | BOÎTIER SOUPLE PORTE CONNECTEURS | [2009/06] | Entry into regional phase | 15.12.2008 | National basic fee paid | 15.12.2008 | Search fee paid | 15.12.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.12.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.12.2008 | Examination requested [2009/06] | 16.12.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 06.02.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 12.10.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.01.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.04.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.02.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.05.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 20.05.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.05.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.01.2014 | Opposition(s) | 04.04.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 17.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US6454368 (BEDAU NORBERT [DE], et al) [X] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [X]FR2841395 (PLUG IN [FR]) [X] 1-9 * figures 1,4 *; | [Y]US6652292 (PRATT GREGORY R [US], et al) [Y] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [Y]US2002142650 (CLARK GORDON P [US], et al) [Y] 1-9 * figure 1 *; | [A]US3803531 (SORENSEN D) [A] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [A]US2005122694 (KANE VINCENT M [US]) [A] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [A]US5365658 (FREEMAN MIKE [US], et al) [A] 1-9 * figure 1 *; | [A]US2004095732 (AZUMI ISAO [JP], et al) [A] 1-9 * the whole document * | International search | [Y]US6652292 (PRATT GREGORY R [US], et al); | [A]US4960391 (BEINHAUR ERNEST L [US], et al); | [A]US3803531 (SORENSEN D) | by applicant | US2003162421 | US6454368 |