Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2026692

EP2026692 - PERICARDIUM MANAGEMENT TOOL AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  25.02.2011
Database last updated on 22.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip25.02.2011Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 30.03.2011  [2011/13]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Acorn Cardiovascular, Inc.
601 Campus Drive
St- Paul, MN 55112 / US
[2009/09]
Inventor(s)01 / HJELLE, Aaron J.
11100 Xenia Avenue North
Champlin, Minnesota 55316 / US
02 / PIGNATO, Paul Andrew
8440 N. Fawn Lake Road N.E.
Stacy, Minnesota 55079 / US
03 / WALSH, Robert G.
17185 Jackson Trail
Lakeville, Minnesota 55044 / US
04 / MATTISON, Richard C.
14215 288th Avenue N.W.
Zimmerman, Minnesota 55389 / US
 [2009/09]
Representative(s)Humphreys, Ceris Anne , et al
Abel & Imray
20 Red Lion Street
London WC1R 4PQ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2009/09]Humphreys, Ceris Anne , et al
Abel & Imray 20 Red Lion Street
London WC1R 4PQ / GB
Application number, filing date07809118.818.05.2007
[2009/09]
WO2007US12032
Priority number, dateUS2006043783819.05.2006         Original published format: US 437838
US2006043784219.05.2006         Original published format: US 437842
[2009/09]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2007136814
Date:29.11.2007
Language:EN
[2007/48]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2026692
Date:25.02.2009
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.11.2007
[2009/09]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US06.11.2008
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.12.2009
ClassificationInternational:A61B17/02
[2010/01]
Former International [2009/09]A61B1/32
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2009/45]
Former [2009/09]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:PÄRICARDIUM-VERWALTUNGSINSTRUMENT UND VERFAHREN[2009/09]
English:PERICARDIUM MANAGEMENT TOOL AND METHOD[2009/09]
French:OUTIL ET PROCÉDÉ DE GESTION DU PÉRICARDE[2009/09]
Entry into regional phase10.12.2008National basic fee paid 
10.12.2008Search fee paid 
10.12.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
10.12.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure10.12.2008Examination requested  [2009/09]
18.12.2008Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
07.05.2009Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
17.06.2009Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR
24.03.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
05.10.2010Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2011/13]
09.11.2010Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2011/13]
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.05.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
23.04.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[X]US2005059865  (KAHLE HENRY [US], et al) [X] 1,3-4,6,8-10,12 * abstract * * paragraph [0046] - paragraph [0047] *;
 [X]US6382211  (CROOK BERWYN M [US]) [X] 1,3,9 * column 2, lines 40-67 * * column 3, line 58 - column 4, line 61 *;
 [X]WO0126559  (ATROPOS LTD [IE], et al) [X] 1,3,9 * page 5, line 20 - page 6, line 25; figures 3a,3b *;
 [XA]US2005241647  (NGUYEN ERIC [US], et al) [X] 1,3,9 * abstract * * paragraph [0041] - paragraph [0043] * [A] 2,4-8,10-12
International search[XA]US5522790  (MOLL FREDERIC H [US], et al) [X] 28-31, 34-36 * , see whole document. * [A] 1-27, 32-33, 37-56;
 [X]US6450983  (RAMBO ROBERT D [US]) [X] 1, 7, 15-20, 27 * , see whole document. *