Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2024787

EP2024787 - UV AND VISIBLE LASER SYSTEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  15.01.2010
Database last updated on 22.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip15.01.2010Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 17.02.2010  [2010/07]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Corning Incorporated
1 Riverfront Plaza
Corning, NY 14831 / US
[N/P]
Former [2009/08]For all designated states
Corning Incorporated
1 Riverfront Plaza
Corning NY 14831 / US
Former [2008/38]For all designated states
Corning Incorporated
One Riverfront Plaza
Corning, New York 14831 / US
Inventor(s)01 / KUKSENKOV, Dmitri V
117 Brook Road
Painted Post, New York 14870 / US
02 / SUDARSHANAM, Venkatapuram S
8515 Pepperridge Drive
Colorado Springs, CO 80920 / US
03 / ZENTENO, Luis A
38 Katie Lane
Painted Post, New York 14870 / US
 [2009/08]
Representative(s)Greene, Simon Kenneth
Elkington and Fife LLP
Prospect House
8 Pembroke Road
Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB
[N/P]
Former [2010/03]Greene, Simon Kenneth
Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks
Kent TN13 1XR / GB
Former [2009/08]Greene, Simon Kenneth
Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road
Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB
Application number, filing date07809246.731.05.2007
[2009/08]
WO2007US12775
Priority number, dateUS20060810505P02.06.2006         Original published format: US 810505 P
[2009/08]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2007142988
Date:13.12.2007
Language:EN
[2007/50]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2024787
Date:18.02.2009
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.12.2007
[2009/08]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP20.03.2008
ClassificationInternational:G02F1/35
[2009/08]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2009/27]
Former [2009/08]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:UV- UND SICHTBARE LASERSYSTEME[2009/08]
English:UV AND VISIBLE LASER SYSTEMS[2009/08]
French:SYSTÈMES LASER UV ET VISIBLE[2009/08]
Entry into regional phase11.12.2008National basic fee paid 
11.12.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
11.12.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure11.12.2008Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
11.12.2008Examination requested  [2009/08]
06.01.2009Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
10.02.2009Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR
02.04.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
13.08.2009Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2010/07]
13.08.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.09.2009Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2010/07]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.05.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[XYI]US2006039423  (TOKUHISA AKIRA [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,5-9,11-16 * paragraphs [0071] , [0072] , [0076] , [0079] - [0081] - [0170] - [0180] - [0203] - [0206]; figures 3,10,11a * [Y] 10 [I] 3,4;
 [XYI]US2002054613  (KANG JIN U [US]) [X] 1,2,5-7,9,11-16 * paragraphs [0018] - [0021]; figure 1 * [Y] 10 [I] 3,4;
 [XYI]US6256327  (GOLDBERG LEW [US]) [X] 1-4,6-13,15,16 * column 2, line 65 - column 5, line 23 * * column 6, line 12 - line 17 * * column 6, line 39 - line 63 * * column 8, line 4 - line 54 * * figures 1,6 * [Y] 10 [I] 5,14;
 [XI]EP1571741  (NIPPON KOGAKU KK [JP]) [X] 1-3,6,8,9,16 * paragraphs [0018] - [0058]; figure 1 * [I] 4,7,15;
 [PXY]US2007064749  (KANEDA YUSHI [JP], et al) [PX] 1-9,11-16 * the whole document * [PY] 10