Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2027069

EP2027069 - CALCIUM FORTIFICATION SUBSTANCE FOR CLEAR BEVERAGES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  14.10.2016
Database last updated on 17.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip14.10.2016Refusal of applicationpublished on 16.11.2016  [2016/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Innophos, Inc.
259 Prospect Plains Road Bldg. G
Cranbury, NJ 08512 / US
[2009/09]
Inventor(s)01 / GODBER, John
4546 N. Malden Street
Chicago, Illinois 60640 / US
02 / SHAHEED, Amr
25 Paceview Drive
Howell, New Jersey 07731 / US
 [2009/29]
Former [2009/09]01 / GODBER, John
61 Gervin Road
Lawrenceville, NJ / US
02 / SHAHEED, Amr
25 Paceview Drive
Howell, New Jersey 07731 / US
Representative(s)Bauer, Wulf , et al
Patentanwälte
Bauer Vorberg Kayser
Partnerschaft mbB
Goltsteinstrasse 87
50968 Köln / DE
[N/P]
Former [2009/31]Bauer, Wulf , et al
Bauer Vorberg Kayser Patentanwälte Lindenallee 43
50968 Köln (Marienburg) / DE
Former [2009/09]Bauer, Wulf , et al
Bauer - Vorberg - Kayser Patentanwälte Lindenallee 43
50968 Köln / DE
Application number, filing date07809433.108.06.2007
[2009/09]
WO2007US13619
Priority number, dateUS20060812215P09.06.2006         Original published format: US 812215 P
[2009/09]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2007146184
Date:21.12.2007
Language:EN
[2007/51]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2027069
Date:25.02.2009
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.12.2007
[2009/09]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US07.02.2008
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP05.03.2012
ClassificationInternational:C01B25/00, A23L2/52, A23L1/304
[2012/14]
Former International [2009/09]C01B25/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/09]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:CALCIUM-VERSTÄRKUNGSSUBSTANZ FÜR KLARE GETRÄNKE[2009/09]
English:CALCIUM FORTIFICATION SUBSTANCE FOR CLEAR BEVERAGES[2009/09]
French:SUBSTANCE DE FORTIFICATION EN CALCIUM POUR DES BOISSONS LIMPIDES[2009/09]
Entry into regional phase28.11.2008National basic fee paid 
28.11.2008Search fee paid 
28.11.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
28.11.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedCommunication of intention to grant the patent
28.11.2008Examination requested  [2009/09]
01.10.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
13.03.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08)
22.11.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.05.2016Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 31.05.2016
31.05.2016Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
24.06.2016Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2016/46]
04.07.2016Application refused, date of legal effect [2016/46]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  13.03.2013
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.11.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
31.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
22.06.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
27.06.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
27.06.2013Renewal fee patent year 07
31.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 08
19.06.2015Renewal fee patent year 09
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.06.200903   M06   Fee paid on   12.11.2009
30.06.201610   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XI]EP0075429  (PHILIP MORRIS INC [US]) [X] 1-3,7-12 * examples 1-4 * [I] 4-6;
 [A]US2005013903  (MYERS NADEEN B [US]) [A] 1-12;
 [A]US2005123652  (KUZMA WILLIAM M [US]) [A] 1-12 * the whole document *
International search[X]US2006093705  (MEHANSHO HAILE [US], et al);
 [Y]US4642238  (LIN SANTA H C [US], et al);
 [Y]US6086927  (FRIELICH SEAN H [US], et al);
 [Y]US2002102331  (CHANG PEI K [US], et al);
 [Y]US4891198  (ACKILLI JOSEPH A [US], et al);
 [Y]US2006062885  (JACOBSON MICHAEL R [US], et al);
 [Y]US6740344  (MURPHY MAEVE [US], et al)