Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2026701

EP2026701 - GLOSSOPEXY TENSION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2009/09]GLOSSOPEXY TENSION SYSTEM AND METHOD
[2015/51]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  17.03.2017
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip17.08.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): BG
published on 19.09.2018  [2018/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Koninklijke Philips N.V.
High Tech Campus 5
5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
[2016/19]
Former [2013/39]For all designated states
Koninklijke Philips N.V.
High Tech Campus 5
5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
Former [2009/46]For all designated states
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V.
Groenewoudseweg 1
5621 BA Eindhoven / NL
Former [2009/09]For all designated states
Aspire Medical, Inc.
610 Palomar Avenue
Sunnyvale CA 94085 / US
Inventor(s)01 / HIROTSUKA, Mark
4925 Northlawn Drive
San Jose, California 95130 / US
02 / JACKSON, Jasper
38321 Amaryllis Place
Newark, California 94560 / US
03 / FRAZIER, Andrew
517 Fern Ridge Ct.
Sunnyvale, California 94087 / US
04 / ROUE, Chad
1487 Green Drive
San Jose, California 95129 / US
05 / VAN DER BURG, Erik
16417 Peacock Lane
Los Gatos, California 95032 / US
06 / DINEEN, Michael
171 Mimosa Way
Portola Valley, California 94028 / US
 [2009/09]
Representative(s)Damen, Daniel Martijn , et al
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards
High Tech Campus 5
5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
[2016/19]
Former [2009/49]Damen, Daniel Martijn , et al
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220
5600 AE Eindhoven / NL
Former [2009/46]Damen, Daniel Martijn , et al
Phillips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 44
5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
Former [2009/09]Kary, Pierre , et al
Zacco Sweden AB Patent Department P.O. Box 23101
104 35 Stockholm / SE
Application number, filing date07809542.913.06.2007
[2009/09]
WO2007US13926
Priority number, dateUS20060813230P13.06.2006         Original published format: US 813230 P
US20060813285P13.06.2006         Original published format: US 813285 P
US20060813058P13.06.2006         Original published format: US 813058 P
[2009/09]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2007146362
Date:21.12.2007
Language:EN
[2007/51]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2026701
Date:25.02.2009
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.12.2007
[2009/09]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2026701
Date:11.05.2016
Language:EN
[2016/19]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP20.03.2008
ClassificationInternational:A61B17/04, A61B17/06
[2009/09]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2016/19]
Former [2009/09]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:GLOSSOPLEXIE-SPANNUNGSSYSTEM[2015/51]
English:GLOSSOPEXY TENSION SYSTEM[2015/51]
French:SYSTÈME DE TENSIONNEMENT DE GLOSSOPEXIE[2015/51]
Former [2009/09]GLOSSOPLEXIE-SPANNUNGSSYSTEM UND -VERFAHREN
Former [2009/09]GLOSSOPEXY TENSION SYSTEM AND METHOD
Former [2009/09]SYSTÈME DE TENSIONNEMENT DE GLOSSOPEXIE ET PROCÉDÉ CORRESPONDANT
Entry into regional phase24.11.2008National basic fee paid 
24.11.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
24.11.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure24.11.2008Examination requested  [2009/09]
02.10.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
21.01.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.05.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
24.06.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.04.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
21.05.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.08.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
24.11.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.11.2015Date of oral proceedings
01.12.2015Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
04.12.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
31.03.2016Fee for grant paid
31.03.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
31.03.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  02.10.2012
Opposition(s)14.02.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/16]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.03.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
31.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
30.06.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
02.07.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
01.07.2013Renewal fee patent year 07
31.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 08
30.06.2015Renewal fee patent year 09
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU13.06.2007
AT11.05.2016
BE11.05.2016
BG11.05.2016
CY11.05.2016
CZ11.05.2016
DK11.05.2016
EE11.05.2016
ES11.05.2016
FI11.05.2016
IS11.05.2016
IT11.05.2016
LT11.05.2016
LV11.05.2016
MC11.05.2016
NL11.05.2016
PL11.05.2016
RO11.05.2016
SE11.05.2016
SI11.05.2016
SK11.05.2016
TR11.05.2016
IE13.06.2016
LU13.06.2016
CH30.06.2016
LI30.06.2016
MT30.06.2016
FR11.07.2016
GB11.08.2016
GR12.08.2016
PT12.09.2016
[2018/38]
Former [2018/32]HU13.06.2007
AT11.05.2016
BE11.05.2016
CY11.05.2016
CZ11.05.2016
DK11.05.2016
EE11.05.2016
ES11.05.2016
FI11.05.2016
IS11.05.2016
IT11.05.2016
LT11.05.2016
LV11.05.2016
MC11.05.2016
NL11.05.2016
PL11.05.2016
RO11.05.2016
SE11.05.2016
SI11.05.2016
SK11.05.2016
TR11.05.2016
IE13.06.2016
LU13.06.2016
CH30.06.2016
LI30.06.2016
MT30.06.2016
FR11.07.2016
GB11.08.2016
GR12.08.2016
PT12.09.2016
Former [2018/29]HU13.06.2007
AT11.05.2016
BE11.05.2016
CY11.05.2016
CZ11.05.2016
DK11.05.2016
EE11.05.2016
ES11.05.2016
FI11.05.2016
IT11.05.2016
LT11.05.2016
LV11.05.2016
MC11.05.2016
NL11.05.2016
PL11.05.2016
RO11.05.2016
SE11.05.2016
SI11.05.2016
SK11.05.2016
TR11.05.2016
IE13.06.2016
LU13.06.2016
CH30.06.2016
LI30.06.2016
FR11.07.2016
GB11.08.2016
GR12.08.2016
PT12.09.2016
Former [2018/28]HU13.06.2007
AT11.05.2016
BE11.05.2016
CY11.05.2016
CZ11.05.2016
DK11.05.2016
EE11.05.2016
ES11.05.2016
FI11.05.2016
IT11.05.2016
LT11.05.2016
LV11.05.2016
MC11.05.2016
NL11.05.2016
PL11.05.2016
RO11.05.2016
SE11.05.2016
SI11.05.2016
SK11.05.2016
IE13.06.2016
CH30.06.2016
LI30.06.2016
FR11.07.2016
GB11.08.2016
GR12.08.2016
PT12.09.2016
Former [2017/37]AT11.05.2016
BE11.05.2016
CZ11.05.2016
DK11.05.2016
EE11.05.2016
ES11.05.2016
FI11.05.2016
IT11.05.2016
LT11.05.2016
LV11.05.2016
MC11.05.2016
NL11.05.2016
PL11.05.2016
RO11.05.2016
SE11.05.2016
SI11.05.2016
SK11.05.2016
IE13.06.2016
CH30.06.2016
LI30.06.2016
FR11.07.2016
GB11.08.2016
GR12.08.2016
PT12.09.2016
Former [2017/24]AT11.05.2016
BE11.05.2016
CZ11.05.2016
DK11.05.2016
EE11.05.2016
ES11.05.2016
FI11.05.2016
IT11.05.2016
LT11.05.2016
LV11.05.2016
MC11.05.2016
NL11.05.2016
PL11.05.2016
RO11.05.2016
SE11.05.2016
SI11.05.2016
SK11.05.2016
IE13.06.2016
CH30.06.2016
LI30.06.2016
FR11.07.2016
GR12.08.2016
PT12.09.2016
Former [2017/22]AT11.05.2016
BE11.05.2016
CZ11.05.2016
DK11.05.2016
EE11.05.2016
ES11.05.2016
FI11.05.2016
IT11.05.2016
LT11.05.2016
LV11.05.2016
MC11.05.2016
NL11.05.2016
PL11.05.2016
RO11.05.2016
SE11.05.2016
SK11.05.2016
CH30.06.2016
LI30.06.2016
FR11.07.2016
GR12.08.2016
PT12.09.2016
Former [2017/17]AT11.05.2016
BE11.05.2016
CZ11.05.2016
DK11.05.2016
EE11.05.2016
ES11.05.2016
FI11.05.2016
IT11.05.2016
LT11.05.2016
LV11.05.2016
MC11.05.2016
NL11.05.2016
PL11.05.2016
RO11.05.2016
SE11.05.2016
SK11.05.2016
GR12.08.2016
PT12.09.2016
Former [2017/11]AT11.05.2016
BE11.05.2016
CZ11.05.2016
DK11.05.2016
EE11.05.2016
ES11.05.2016
FI11.05.2016
IT11.05.2016
LT11.05.2016
LV11.05.2016
NL11.05.2016
PL11.05.2016
RO11.05.2016
SE11.05.2016
SK11.05.2016
GR12.08.2016
PT12.09.2016
Former [2017/10]BE11.05.2016
CZ11.05.2016
DK11.05.2016
EE11.05.2016
ES11.05.2016
FI11.05.2016
IT11.05.2016
LT11.05.2016
LV11.05.2016
NL11.05.2016
PL11.05.2016
RO11.05.2016
SE11.05.2016
SK11.05.2016
GR12.08.2016
PT12.09.2016
Former [2017/09]CZ11.05.2016
DK11.05.2016
EE11.05.2016
ES11.05.2016
FI11.05.2016
IT11.05.2016
LT11.05.2016
LV11.05.2016
NL11.05.2016
RO11.05.2016
SE11.05.2016
BE30.06.2016
GR12.08.2016
PT12.09.2016
Former [2017/07]DK11.05.2016
ES11.05.2016
FI11.05.2016
IT11.05.2016
LT11.05.2016
LV11.05.2016
NL11.05.2016
SE11.05.2016
BE30.06.2016
GR12.08.2016
PT12.09.2016
Former [2017/03]ES11.05.2016
FI11.05.2016
IT11.05.2016
LT11.05.2016
LV11.05.2016
NL11.05.2016
SE11.05.2016
BE30.06.2016
GR12.08.2016
PT12.09.2016
Former [2016/52]ES11.05.2016
FI11.05.2016
LT11.05.2016
LV11.05.2016
NL11.05.2016
SE11.05.2016
GR12.08.2016
PT12.09.2016
Former [2016/51]ES11.05.2016
FI11.05.2016
LT11.05.2016
LV11.05.2016
NL11.05.2016
GR12.08.2016
PT12.09.2016
Former [2016/50]ES11.05.2016
FI11.05.2016
LT11.05.2016
LV11.05.2016
NL11.05.2016
Former [2016/49]FI11.05.2016
LT11.05.2016
NL11.05.2016
Former [2016/46]LT11.05.2016
Cited inInternational search[X]EP0702934  (ETHICON INC [US]) [X] 1-13 * the whole document *;
 [X]US5464424  (O'DONNELL JR FRANCIS E [US]) [X] 1-13 * the whole document *;
 [PX]FR2880253  (CHANTRIAUX JEAN FRANCOIS [FR]) [PX] 1-13 * the whole document *;
 [X]WO2004066847  (CAPURRO SERGIO [IT]) [X] 1-13 * the whole document *;
 [X]DE29614901U  (KRAMER MASSOW KLAUS [DE]) [X] 1,6,13 * the whole document *;
 [X]WO0128457  (TENDON TECHNOLOGY LTD [US]) [X] 1-13 * the whole document *;
 [X]US5127413  (EBERT EDWARD A [US]) [X] 1-3,6-9,11,13 * the whole document *;
 [XP]WO2007056583  (ASPIRE MEDICAL INC [US]) [XP] 1-13 * the whole document *
ExaminationUS6042536