Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2026701 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2026701



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 1674
17.03.2017 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
11.05.2016 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
14.04.2016 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
31.03.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
31.03.2016 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
31.03.2016 French translation of claims Search / examination 3
31.03.2016 German translation of the claims Search / examination 3
07.12.2015 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant Search / examination 1
04.12.2015 Annex to the communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
04.12.2015 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
04.12.2015 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
04.12.2015 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
04.12.2015 Text intended for grant Search / examination 216
04.12.2015 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 215
03.12.2015 Document concerning representation Search / examination 2
01.12.2015 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
01.12.2015 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
01.12.2015 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
01.12.2015 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
14.10.2015 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Search / examination 1
06.10.2015 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Search / examination 2
02.10.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
02.10.2015 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
02.10.2015 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 2
02.10.2015 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
02.10.2015 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
02.10.2015 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
02.10.2015 Claims Search / examination 2
02.10.2015 Claims Search / examination 2
02.10.2015 Claims Search / examination 2
02.10.2015 Claims Search / examination 2
02.10.2015 Claims Search / examination 2
02.10.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
02.10.2015 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Search / examination 8
06.06.2015 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
05.06.2015 Advice of delivery Search / examination 2
12.05.2015 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
12.05.2015 Annex to the communication Search / examination 4
12.05.2015 Preparation for oral proceedings Search / examination 2
12.05.2015 Summons to attend oral proceedings Search / examination 1
24.11.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
24.11.2014 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
24.11.2014 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 84
24.11.2014 Claims Search / examination 2
24.11.2014 Description Search / examination 84
24.11.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
24.11.2014 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
06.08.2014 Annex to the communication Search / examination 4
06.08.2014 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
21.05.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
21.05.2014 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
21.05.2014 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 22
21.05.2014 Claims Search / examination 3
21.05.2014 Description Search / examination 9
21.05.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
21.05.2014 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
15.04.2014 Annex to a communication Search / examination 3
15.04.2014 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
15.04.2014 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
14.11.2013 Document concerning representation Search / examination 60
22.08.2013 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 1
14.08.2013 Annexes in respect of a request for a change Search / examination 2
13.08.2013 Request for change of name - applicant Search / examination 4
24.06.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
24.06.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
24.06.2013 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
27.05.2013 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
27.05.2013 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
21.01.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
21.01.2013 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
21.01.2013 Claims Search / examination 3
21.01.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
21.01.2013 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 7
02.10.2012 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
02.10.2012 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
24.08.2011 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Search / examination 1
09.08.2011 Letter relating to the automatic debiting procedure Search / examination 1
03.08.2011 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 2
04.04.2011 Confirmation of revocation of automatic debit order Search / examination 1
29.11.2010 Confirmation of revocation of automatic debit order Search / examination 1
27.10.2009 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant Search / examination 1
12.10.2009 Communication concerning the filing of a power of attorney Search / examination 1
12.10.2009 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
12.10.2009 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 1
03.09.2009 Request for transfer of rights - applicant Search / examination 4
28.01.2009 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
26.01.2009 Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees Search / examination 2
24.11.2008 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
24.11.2008 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 3
24.10.2008 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
20.03.2008 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 4
20.03.2008 International publication of the international search report Search / examination 2
15.01.2008 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 172
15.01.2008 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 199
15.01.2008 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 204
21.12.2007 International publication of the A2 Pamphlet Search / examination 229