Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2026701


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
17.08.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  19.09.2018  [2018/38]
20.07.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  22.08.2018  [2018/34]
13.07.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  15.08.2018  [2018/33]
06.07.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  08.08.2018  [2018/32]
15.06.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  18.07.2018  [2018/29]
08.06.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  11.07.2018  [2018/28]
15.09.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  18.10.2017  [2017/42]
18.08.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.09.2017  [2017/38]
11.08.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  13.09.2017  [2017/37]
26.05.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  28.06.2017  [2017/26]
12.05.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  14.06.2017  [2017/24]
28.04.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  31.05.2017  [2017/22]
24.03.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  26.04.2017  [2017/17]
17.03.2017 No opposition filed within time limit published on  19.04.2017  [2017/16]
17.02.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  22.03.2017  [2017/12]
10.02.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  15.03.2017  [2017/11]
03.02.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  08.03.2017  [2017/10]
03.02.2017 Change - lapse in a contracting state published on  08.03.2017  [2017/10]
27.01.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  01.03.2017  [2017/09]
13.01.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  15.02.2017  [2017/07]
23.12.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  25.01.2017  [2017/04]
16.12.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  18.01.2017  [2017/03]
25.11.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  28.12.2016  [2016/52]
18.11.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  21.12.2016  [2016/51]
11.11.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  14.12.2016  [2016/50]
04.11.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  07.12.2016  [2016/49]
14.10.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  16.11.2016  [2016/46]
08.04.2016 (Expected) grant published on  11.05.2016  [2016/19]
06.04.2016 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
06.04.2016 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
02.04.2016 New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
04.12.2015 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
30.11.2015 New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
13.11.2015 Change - German title published on  16.12.2015  [2015/51]
13.11.2015 Change - English title published on  16.12.2015  [2015/51]
13.11.2015 Change - French title published on  16.12.2015  [2015/51]
03.07.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
11.05.2015 New entry: Date of oral proceedings
25.11.2014 New entry: Reply to examination report
05.08.2014 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
22.05.2014 New entry: Reply to examination report
14.04.2014 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
03.04.2014 New entry: Renewal fee paid
23.08.2013 Change - applicant published on  25.09.2013  [2013/39]
05.07.2013 New entry: Renewal fee paid
24.06.2013 New entry: Reply to examination report
27.05.2013 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
22.01.2013 New entry: Reply to examination report
01.10.2012 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
28.09.2012 First examination report
06.07.2012 New entry: Renewal fee paid
18.08.2011 Deletion: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit
12.08.2011 New entry: Renewal fee paid
01.08.2011 New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit
13.04.2010 New entry: Renewal fee paid
30.10.2009 Change - representative published on  02.12.2009  [2009/49]
09.10.2009 Change - applicant published on  11.11.2009  [2009/46]
09.10.2009 Change - representative published on  11.11.2009  [2009/46]
14.08.2009 Change - extension states published on  16.09.2009  [2009/38]
03.04.2009 New entry: Renewal fee paid
23.01.2009 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  25.02.2009  [2009/09]
23.01.2009 Request for examination filed published on  25.02.2009  [2009/09]
16.12.2008 PCT data prior to European publication
02.12.2008 PCT data prior to European publication
27.11.2008 PCT data prior to European publication
21.03.2008 PCT data prior to European publication
28.02.2008 PCT data prior to European publication
26.12.2007 PCT data prior to European publication
23.10.2007 PCT data prior to European publication