Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2038225

EP2038225 - Electrodeionization apparatus and water treatment method [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2009/13]ELECTRODEIONIZATION APPARATUS AND LOW SCALE POTENTIAL WATER TREATMENT
[2012/51]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  21.03.2014
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip17.07.2015Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): HU, LU
published on 19.08.2015  [2015/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Siemens Industry, Inc.
3333 Old Milton Parkway
Alpharetta, GA 30005-4437 / US
[2011/23]
Former [2009/13]For all designated states
Siemens Water Technologies Corp.
181 Thorn Hill Road
Warrendale, PA 15086 / US
Inventor(s)01 / GIFFORD, Joseph, D.
8 Maclntosh Avenue
Marlborough, MA 01752 / US
02 / ARBA, John, W.
111 Kingsbury Ave
Bradford, MA 01835 / US
03 / FREYDINA, Evgeniya
21 Birch Ridge Road
Acton, MA 01720 / US
04 / JHA, Anil, D.
150 B Portola Street
San Francisco, CA 94129 / US
05 / LIANG, Li-Shiang
258 Bolton Road
Harvard, MA 01451 / US
06 / WANG, Lu
Room 13-3-302
Xiaojiahe Wanke Xishantingyuan
Haiden District
100091 Beijing / CN
 [2013/20]
Former [2009/13]01 / GIFFORD, Joseph, D.
8 Maclntosh Avenue
Marlborough, MA 01752 / US
02 / ARBA, John, W.
111 Kingsbury Ave
Bradford, MA 01835 / US
03 / FREYDINA, Evgeniya
21 Birch Ridge Road
Acton, MA 01720 / US
04 / JHA, Anil, D.
150 B Portola Street
San Francisco, CA 94129 / US
05 / LIANG, Li-Shiang
258 Bolton Road
Harvard, MA 01451 / US
06 / WANG, Lu
Room 13-3-302 Xiaojiahe Wanke Xishantingyuan Haiden District
100091 Beijing / CN
Representative(s)Hazzard, Alan David
Siemens AG
Postfach 22 16 34
80506 Munich / DE
[N/P]
Former [2013/20]Hazzard, Alan David
Siemens AG
Postfach 22 16 34
80506 München / DE
Former [2009/13]Hazzard, Alan David
Siemens AG Postfach 22 16 34
80506 Munich / DE
Application number, filing date07809832.422.06.2007
[2009/13]
WO2007US14622
Priority number, dateUS20060805510P22.06.2006         Original published format: US 805510 P
US20060805505P22.06.2006         Original published format: US 805505 P
[2009/13]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2007149574
Date:27.12.2007
Language:EN
[2007/52]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2038225
Date:25.03.2009
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.12.2007
[2009/13]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2038225
Date:15.05.2013
Language:EN
[2013/20]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP03.07.2008
ClassificationInternational:C02F1/469, C02F1/46, B01D61/48
[2012/51]
Former International [2009/13]C02F1/469, C02F1/46
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/13]
TitleGerman:Elektroden-ionisationsgerät und Wasserbehandlungsverfahren[2012/51]
English:Electrodeionization apparatus and water treatment method[2012/51]
French:Appareil d'électrodésionisation et procédé de traitement d'eau[2012/51]
Former [2009/13]ELEKTRODEN-IONISATIONSGERÄT UND WASSERBEHANDLUNG ZUR INKRUSTATIONSVERMEIDUNG
Former [2009/13]ELECTRODEIONIZATION APPARATUS AND LOW SCALE POTENTIAL WATER TREATMENT
Former [2009/13]APPAREIL D'ÉLECTRODÉSIONISATION ET PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT IMPLIQUANT UN POTENTIEL ÉLECTRIQUE FAIBLE
Entry into regional phase22.01.2009National basic fee paid 
22.01.2009Designation fee(s) paid 
22.01.2009Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure15.08.2008Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
21.01.2009Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
22.01.2009Examination requested  [2009/13]
09.02.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
23.09.2011Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
20.11.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.11.2012Date of oral proceedings
07.12.2012Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
17.12.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.04.2013Fee for grant paid
04.04.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  09.02.2011
Opposition(s)18.02.2014No opposition filed within time limit [2014/17]
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
20.11.2011Request for further processing filed
20.11.2011Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
06.12.2011Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.06.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
21.06.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
20.06.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
18.06.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU22.06.2007
AT15.05.2013
BE15.05.2013
CY15.05.2013
CZ15.05.2013
DK15.05.2013
EE15.05.2013
FI15.05.2013
IT15.05.2013
LT15.05.2013
LV15.05.2013
MC15.05.2013
MT15.05.2013
PL15.05.2013
RO15.05.2013
SE15.05.2013
SI15.05.2013
SK15.05.2013
TR15.05.2013
IE22.06.2013
LU22.06.2013
CH30.06.2013
LI30.06.2013
FR15.07.2013
BG15.08.2013
GR16.08.2013
ES26.08.2013
IS15.09.2013
PT16.09.2013
[2015/34]
Former [2015/32]AT15.05.2013
BE15.05.2013
CY15.05.2013
CZ15.05.2013
DK15.05.2013
EE15.05.2013
FI15.05.2013
IT15.05.2013
LT15.05.2013
LV15.05.2013
MC15.05.2013
MT15.05.2013
PL15.05.2013
RO15.05.2013
SE15.05.2013
SI15.05.2013
SK15.05.2013
TR15.05.2013
IE22.06.2013
CH30.06.2013
LI30.06.2013
FR15.07.2013
BG15.08.2013
GR16.08.2013
ES26.08.2013
IS15.09.2013
PT16.09.2013
Former [2015/30]AT15.05.2013
BE15.05.2013
CY15.05.2013
CZ15.05.2013
DK15.05.2013
EE15.05.2013
FI15.05.2013
IT15.05.2013
LT15.05.2013
LV15.05.2013
MC15.05.2013
MT15.05.2013
PL15.05.2013
RO15.05.2013
SE15.05.2013
SI15.05.2013
SK15.05.2013
IE22.06.2013
CH30.06.2013
LI30.06.2013
FR15.07.2013
BG15.08.2013
GR16.08.2013
ES26.08.2013
IS15.09.2013
PT16.09.2013
Former [2015/13]AT15.05.2013
BE15.05.2013
CZ15.05.2013
DK15.05.2013
EE15.05.2013
FI15.05.2013
IT15.05.2013
LT15.05.2013
LV15.05.2013
MC15.05.2013
MT15.05.2013
PL15.05.2013
RO15.05.2013
SE15.05.2013
SI15.05.2013
SK15.05.2013
IE22.06.2013
CH30.06.2013
LI30.06.2013
FR15.07.2013
BG15.08.2013
GR16.08.2013
ES26.08.2013
IS15.09.2013
PT16.09.2013
Former [2014/24]AT15.05.2013
BE15.05.2013
CZ15.05.2013
DK15.05.2013
EE15.05.2013
FI15.05.2013
IT15.05.2013
LT15.05.2013
LV15.05.2013
MC15.05.2013
PL15.05.2013
RO15.05.2013
SE15.05.2013
SI15.05.2013
SK15.05.2013
IE22.06.2013
CH30.06.2013
LI30.06.2013
FR15.07.2013
BG15.08.2013
GR16.08.2013
ES26.08.2013
IS15.09.2013
PT16.09.2013
Former [2014/20]AT15.05.2013
BE15.05.2013
CZ15.05.2013
DK15.05.2013
EE15.05.2013
FI15.05.2013
IT15.05.2013
LT15.05.2013
LV15.05.2013
MC15.05.2013
PL15.05.2013
RO15.05.2013
SE15.05.2013
SI15.05.2013
SK15.05.2013
IE22.06.2013
CH30.06.2013
LI30.06.2013
BG15.08.2013
GR16.08.2013
ES26.08.2013
IS15.09.2013
PT16.09.2013
Former [2014/14]AT15.05.2013
BE15.05.2013
CZ15.05.2013
DK15.05.2013
EE15.05.2013
FI15.05.2013
IT15.05.2013
LT15.05.2013
LV15.05.2013
MC15.05.2013
PL15.05.2013
RO15.05.2013
SE15.05.2013
SI15.05.2013
SK15.05.2013
BG15.08.2013
GR16.08.2013
ES26.08.2013
IS15.09.2013
PT16.09.2013
Former [2014/11]AT15.05.2013
BE15.05.2013
CZ15.05.2013
DK15.05.2013
EE15.05.2013
FI15.05.2013
IT15.05.2013
LT15.05.2013
LV15.05.2013
PL15.05.2013
RO15.05.2013
SE15.05.2013
SI15.05.2013
SK15.05.2013
BG15.08.2013
GR16.08.2013
ES26.08.2013
IS15.09.2013
PT16.09.2013
Former [2014/10]AT15.05.2013
BE15.05.2013
CZ15.05.2013
DK15.05.2013
EE15.05.2013
FI15.05.2013
LT15.05.2013
LV15.05.2013
PL15.05.2013
SE15.05.2013
SI15.05.2013
SK15.05.2013
BG15.08.2013
GR16.08.2013
ES26.08.2013
IS15.09.2013
PT16.09.2013
Former [2014/09]AT15.05.2013
BE15.05.2013
DK15.05.2013
EE15.05.2013
FI15.05.2013
LT15.05.2013
LV15.05.2013
PL15.05.2013
SE15.05.2013
SI15.05.2013
BG15.08.2013
GR16.08.2013
ES26.08.2013
IS15.09.2013
PT16.09.2013
Former [2014/06]AT15.05.2013
BE15.05.2013
FI15.05.2013
LT15.05.2013
LV15.05.2013
PL15.05.2013
SE15.05.2013
SI15.05.2013
BG15.08.2013
GR16.08.2013
ES26.08.2013
IS15.09.2013
PT16.09.2013
Former [2014/02]AT15.05.2013
FI15.05.2013
LT15.05.2013
LV15.05.2013
PL15.05.2013
SE15.05.2013
SI15.05.2013
BG15.08.2013
GR16.08.2013
ES26.08.2013
IS15.09.2013
PT16.09.2013
Former [2013/50]AT15.05.2013
FI15.05.2013
LT15.05.2013
PL15.05.2013
SE15.05.2013
SI15.05.2013
BG15.08.2013
GR16.08.2013
ES26.08.2013
IS15.09.2013
PT16.09.2013
Former [2013/49]AT15.05.2013
FI15.05.2013
LT15.05.2013
SE15.05.2013
SI15.05.2013
GR16.08.2013
ES26.08.2013
IS15.09.2013
PT16.09.2013
Former [2013/48]AT15.05.2013
LT15.05.2013
ES26.08.2013
IS15.09.2013
PT16.09.2013
Former [2013/47]LT15.05.2013
PT16.09.2013
Cited inInternational search[X]WO9951529  (SACHEM INC [US]) [X] 1-10,46-50 * page 16, line 3 - line 13; figure 3; claims 1-38 *;
 [X]GB2403166  (ACCENTUS PLC [GB] IPSOLUTIONS [GB]; ACCENTUS PLC [GB]) [X] 1-10,46-50 * page 3, line 1 - line 23; figures 1-3; claims 1-6 *;
 [X]US2002139676  (MOULIN JACQUES [FR] ET AL) [X] 1-10,22-30,46-50 * paragraphs [0001] , [0002] , [0012]; figure 1; example 1; claims 1-16 * * paragraphs [0015] , [0020] , [0021] , [0024] *;
 [X]US3686089  (KORNGOLD EMMANUEL ET AL) [X] 1-10,46-50 * column 2, line 44 - line 69; figure 1 *;
 [X]US2794776  (BRIGGS ROBERT E) [X] 1-10,46-50 * column 1, line 15 - line 40 * * column 3, line 53 - column 4, line 20 * * column 7, line 16 - column 8, line 51 *;
 [DX]US2005103722  (FREYDINA EVGENIYA [US] ET AL) [DX] 1-10,22-30,40-42,46-51 * paragraphs [0007] , [0034]; figure 2; claims 1-72 * * paragraph [0036] *;
 [X]US2004206627  (BEJTLICH CHESTER L [US] ET AL) [X] 22-30,35,36,40-42,51,61-64 * paragraph [0004] - paragraph [0006]; figures 1-8 * * paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0013] * * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0018] * * paragraph [0030] * * paragraph [0034] - paragraph [0035] * * paragraph [0041] * * paragraph [0072] * * paragraphs [0069] , [0073] - [0075] * * paragraph [0067] - paragraph [0068]; claims 16,19 *;
 [X]US2006060532  (DAVIS THOMAS A [US]) [X] 22-24,61-64 * paragraph [0039] - paragraph [0043]; figures 2,6 * * paragraph [0054] - paragraph [0055] * * paragraph [0089] *;
 [X]WO2005044427  (IONICS [US]; BATCHELDER BRUCE [US]; ZHANG LI [US]; CARSON WILLIAM W [U) [X] 11-18,22-24,52,53,61-64 * page 1, paragraph 1; figures 1-3 * * page 5, paragraph 2 - paragraph 3 * * page 15, paragraph 2 * * page 18, paragraph 3 * * page 21, paragraph 3 * * page 25, paragraph 1 *;
 [X]WO9939810  (UNITED STATES FILTER CORP [US]; EMERY NIGEL [GB]; WOODWARD ROGER [GB];) [X] 22-24,61,62 * page 4, line 9 - line 17 * * page 8, line 27 - page 9, line 5 * * page 11, line 18 - line 28 * * page 7, line 17 - line 20 *;
 [X]WO2005106100  (UNILEVER NV [NL]; UNILEVER PLC [GB]; LEVER HINDUSTAN LTD [IN]; VAN KRA) [X] 22-24,35,36 * page 13, line 1 - line 18 * * page 22, line 10 - line 31 *;
 [X]US2006037862  (MIWA MASAYUKI [JP] ET AL) [X] 22-24 * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0027] * * paragraphs [0036] , [0039]; table 1 *;
 [X]EP1308201  (KURITA WATER IND LTD [JP]) [X] 11-18,22-24,52,53 * paragraphs [0049] , [0055]; figure 1 *;
 [X]US6365023  (DE LOS REYES GASTON [US] ET AL) [X] 22-24,35,36 * paragraph [0042] - paragraph [0043] * * paragraph [0047] *