Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2022132

EP2022132 - MULTI-BAND ANTENNA FOR GSM, UMTS, AND WIFI APPLICATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  27.04.2012
Database last updated on 13.07.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip27.04.2012Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 30.05.2012  [2012/22]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sony Ericsson Mobile Communications AB
Nya Vattentornet
221 88 Lund / SE
[2009/07]
Inventor(s)01 / HUYNH, Minh-Chau
313 Coral Creek Lane
Morrisville, North Carolina 27560 / US
 [2009/07]
Representative(s)Robinson, Ian Michael
Appleyard Lees
15 Clare Road
Halifax HX1 2HY / GB
[N/P]
Former [2009/07]Robinson, Ian Michael
Appleyard Lees 15 Clare Road
Halifax, West Yorkshire HX1 2HY / GB
Application number, filing date07811780.110.01.2007
[2009/07]
WO2007US60304
Priority number, dateUS2006043553517.05.2006         Original published format: US 435535
[2009/07]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2007143230
Date:13.12.2007
Language:EN
[2007/50]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2022132
Date:11.02.2009
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.12.2007
[2009/07]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP27.03.2008
ClassificationInternational:H01Q1/24, H01Q5/00, H01Q9/04
[2009/07]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2009/35]
Former [2009/07]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:MEHRBANDANTENNE FÜR GSM-, UMTS- UND WIFI-ANWENDUNGEN[2009/07]
English:MULTI-BAND ANTENNA FOR GSM, UMTS, AND WIFI APPLICATIONS[2009/07]
French:ANTENNE TOUTES BANDES POUR APPLICATIONS GSM, UMTS ET WIFI[2009/07]
Entry into regional phase27.10.2008National basic fee paid 
27.10.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
27.10.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure31.03.2008Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
27.10.2008Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
27.10.2008Examination requested  [2009/07]
23.04.2012Application withdrawn by applicant  [2012/22]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.10.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
22.01.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
24.01.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
11.01.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
Cited inInternational search[X]WO0235652  (ACE TECH [KR], et al) [X] 1-3,6,10,11,15-20,25,26 * page 5, line 11 - page 9, line 4 * * figures 1A,1B,2,3 *;
 [X]US6727855  (NALBANDIAN VAHAKN [US]) [X] 1-3,6,15,16,19,20 * column 3, line 27 - column 5, line 64 * * figures 1-4 *;
 [X]US2001043161  (TSENG WEN-JEN [TW], et al) [X] 1-3,6,15,16,19,20 * paragraphs [0039] - [0041] * * figure 10 *