Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2021472

EP2021472 - COMPOUNDS AND METHODS FOR MODULATING GENE EXPRESSION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  27.05.2011
Database last updated on 13.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip08.09.2017Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): BE
published on 11.10.2017  [2017/41]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Ionis Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
2855 Gazelle Court
Carlsbad, CA 92010 / US
[2016/07]
Former [2011/39]For all designated states
Isis Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
2855 Gazelle Court
Carlsbad, CA 92010 / US
Former [2009/07]For all designated states
Isis Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
1896 Rutherford Road
Carlsbad, CA 92008 / US
Inventor(s)01 / BHANOT, Sanjay
8094 Paseo Arrayan
Carlsbad, CA 92009 / US
02 / GEARY, Richard S.
3352 Avenida Nieve
Carlsbad, CA 92009 / US
03 / MCKAY, Robert
12467 Golden Eye Lane
Poway, CA 92064 / US
04 / MONIA, Brett P.
2306 Casa Hermosa Court
Encinitas, CA 92024 / US
05 / SETH, Punit P.
896 Kestral Drive
San Marcos, CA 92078 / US
06 / SIWKOWSKI, Andrew M.
7317-b Alicante Rd.
Carlsbad, CA 92009 / US
07 / SWAYZE, Eric E.
7789 Palenque Street
Carlsbad, CA 92009 / US
08 / WANCEWICZ, Edward
12326 Colony Dr.
Poway, CA 92064 / US
 [2009/07]
Representative(s)Chapman, Desmond Mark
Carpmaels & Ransford LLP
One Southampton Row
London WC1B 5HA / GB
[N/P]
Former [2012/52]Chapman, Desmond Mark
Carpmaels & Ransford One Southampton Row London
WC1B 5HA / GB
Former [2009/07]Hallybone, Huw George
Carpmaels & Ransford 43-45 Bloomsbury Square
London WC1A 2RA / GB
Application number, filing date07811872.607.05.2007
[2009/07]
WO2007US68401
Priority number, dateUS20060746631P05.05.2006         Original published format: US 746631 P
US20060747059P11.05.2006         Original published format: US 747059 P
US20060805660P23.06.2006         Original published format: US 805660 P
US20060864554P06.11.2006         Original published format: US 864554 P
WO2007US6118327.01.2007         Original published format: PCT/US2007/061183
[2009/13]
Former [2009/07]US20060746631P05.05.2006
US20060747059P11.05.2006
US20060805660P23.06.2006
US20060864554P06.11.2006
WO2007US0611827.01.2007
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2007146511
Date:21.12.2007
Language:EN
[2007/51]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2021472
Date:11.02.2009
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.12.2007
[2009/07]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2021472
Date:29.06.2011
Language:EN
[2011/26]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP12.06.2008
ClassificationInternational:C12N15/113, A61K31/712, // C07H21/04, A61K31/7125
[2010/48]
Former International [2010/38]C12N15/113
Former International [2009/07]C12N15/11
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/07]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERBINDUNGEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR MODULATION VON GENEXPRESSION[2009/07]
English:COMPOUNDS AND METHODS FOR MODULATING GENE EXPRESSION[2009/07]
French:COMPOSÉS ET PROCÉDÉS DE MODULATION DE L'EXPRESSION GÉNIQUE[2009/07]
Entry into regional phase05.12.2008National basic fee paid 
05.12.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
05.12.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure05.12.2008Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
05.12.2008Examination requested  [2009/07]
20.03.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
17.09.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.12.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
15.06.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.12.2010Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.04.2011Fee for grant paid
20.04.2011Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP11160528.3  / EP2363481
EP11160534.1  / EP2363482
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  20.03.2009
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  26.03.2012  24.04.2012  ADMISSIBLE
Roche Innovation Center Copenhagen A/S
Fremtidsvej 3
2970 Hørsholm / DK
Opponent's representative
D Young & Co LLP
Briton House
Briton Street
Southampton SO14 3EB / GB
 [2015/34]
Former [2015/01]
Opponent(s)01  26.03.2012  24.04.2012  ADMISSIBLE
Roche Innovation Center Copenhagen A/S
Fremtidsvej 3
2970 Hørsholm / DK
Opponent's representative
Harding, Charles Thomas
D Young & Co LLP
120 Holborn
London EC1N 2DY / GB
Former [2012/18]
Opponent(s)01  26.03.2012   
Santaris Pharma A/S
Kogle Allé 6
2970 Hørsholm / DK
Opponent's representative
Harding, Charles Thomas
D Young & Co LLP
120 Holborn
GB-London EC1N 2DY / GB
11.05.2012Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
21.11.2012Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
27.03.2014Date of oral proceedings
03.04.2014Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04)
15.05.2014Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
11.08.2014Reply to a communication from the opposition division
01.12.2014Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 19.12.2014
19.12.2014Date of oral proceedings
22.12.2014Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
Appeal following opposition27.02.2015Appeal received No.  T0344/15
01.05.2015Statement of grounds filed
13.02.2015Appeal received No.  T0344/15
29.04.2015Statement of grounds filed
Fees paidRenewal fee
05.12.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
31.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
10.05.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU07.05.2007
AT29.06.2011
CY29.06.2011
CZ29.06.2011
EE29.06.2011
FI29.06.2011
LT29.06.2011
LV29.06.2011
MT29.06.2011
NL29.06.2011
PL29.06.2011
RO29.06.2011
SE29.06.2011
SI29.06.2011
SK29.06.2011
TR29.06.2011
BG29.09.2011
GR30.09.2011
IS29.10.2011
PT31.10.2011
LU07.05.2012
MC31.05.2012
IE07.05.2014
IT07.05.2014
ES08.05.2014
BE31.05.2014
[2017/41]
Former [2016/33]HU07.05.2007
AT29.06.2011
CY29.06.2011
CZ29.06.2011
EE29.06.2011
FI29.06.2011
LT29.06.2011
LV29.06.2011
MT29.06.2011
NL29.06.2011
PL29.06.2011
RO29.06.2011
SE29.06.2011
SI29.06.2011
SK29.06.2011
TR29.06.2011
BG29.09.2011
GR30.09.2011
IS29.10.2011
PT31.10.2011
LU07.05.2012
MC31.05.2012
IE07.05.2014
IT07.05.2014
ES08.05.2014
Former [2015/23]HU07.05.2007
AT29.06.2011
CY29.06.2011
CZ29.06.2011
EE29.06.2011
FI29.06.2011
LT29.06.2011
LV29.06.2011
MT29.06.2011
NL29.06.2011
PL29.06.2011
RO29.06.2011
SE29.06.2011
SI29.06.2011
SK29.06.2011
TR29.06.2011
BG29.09.2011
GR30.09.2011
IS29.10.2011
PT31.10.2011
LU07.05.2012
MC31.05.2012
IE07.05.2014
IT07.05.2014
Former [2015/21]HU07.05.2007
AT29.06.2011
CY29.06.2011
CZ29.06.2011
EE29.06.2011
FI29.06.2011
LT29.06.2011
LV29.06.2011
MT29.06.2011
NL29.06.2011
PL29.06.2011
RO29.06.2011
SE29.06.2011
SI29.06.2011
SK29.06.2011
TR29.06.2011
BG29.09.2011
GR30.09.2011
IS29.10.2011
PT31.10.2011
LU07.05.2012
MC31.05.2012
IE07.05.2014
Former [2014/34]HU07.05.2007
AT29.06.2011
CY29.06.2011
CZ29.06.2011
EE29.06.2011
FI29.06.2011
LT29.06.2011
LV29.06.2011
MT29.06.2011
NL29.06.2011
PL29.06.2011
RO29.06.2011
SE29.06.2011
SI29.06.2011
SK29.06.2011
TR29.06.2011
BG29.09.2011
GR30.09.2011
IS29.10.2011
PT31.10.2011
LU07.05.2012
MC31.05.2012
Former [2014/27]AT29.06.2011
CY29.06.2011
CZ29.06.2011
EE29.06.2011
FI29.06.2011
LT29.06.2011
LV29.06.2011
MT29.06.2011
NL29.06.2011
PL29.06.2011
RO29.06.2011
SE29.06.2011
SI29.06.2011
SK29.06.2011
TR29.06.2011
BG29.09.2011
GR30.09.2011
IS29.10.2011
PT31.10.2011
LU07.05.2012
MC31.05.2012
Former [2014/21]AT29.06.2011
CY29.06.2011
CZ29.06.2011
EE29.06.2011
FI29.06.2011
LT29.06.2011
LV29.06.2011
MT29.06.2011
NL29.06.2011
PL29.06.2011
RO29.06.2011
SE29.06.2011
SI29.06.2011
SK29.06.2011
TR29.06.2011
BG29.09.2011
GR30.09.2011
IS29.10.2011
PT31.10.2011
MC31.05.2012
Former [2013/35]AT29.06.2011
CY29.06.2011
CZ29.06.2011
EE29.06.2011
FI29.06.2011
LT29.06.2011
LV29.06.2011
MT29.06.2011
NL29.06.2011
PL29.06.2011
RO29.06.2011
SE29.06.2011
SI29.06.2011
SK29.06.2011
BG29.09.2011
GR30.09.2011
IS29.10.2011
PT31.10.2011
MC31.05.2012
Former [2013/29]AT29.06.2011
CY29.06.2011
CZ29.06.2011
EE29.06.2011
FI29.06.2011
LT29.06.2011
LV29.06.2011
NL29.06.2011
PL29.06.2011
RO29.06.2011
SE29.06.2011
SI29.06.2011
SK29.06.2011
BG29.09.2011
GR30.09.2011
IS29.10.2011
PT31.10.2011
MC31.05.2012
Former [2012/12]AT29.06.2011
CY29.06.2011
CZ29.06.2011
EE29.06.2011
FI29.06.2011
LT29.06.2011
LV29.06.2011
NL29.06.2011
PL29.06.2011
RO29.06.2011
SE29.06.2011
SI29.06.2011
SK29.06.2011
GR30.09.2011
IS29.10.2011
PT31.10.2011
Former [2011/52]AT29.06.2011
FI29.06.2011
LT29.06.2011
LV29.06.2011
SE29.06.2011
SI29.06.2011
GR30.09.2011
Former [2011/50]FI29.06.2011
LT29.06.2011
LV29.06.2011
SE29.06.2011
SI29.06.2011
GR30.09.2011
Former [2011/49]FI29.06.2011
LT29.06.2011
SE29.06.2011
GR30.09.2011
Former [2011/48]LT29.06.2011
SE29.06.2011
Cited inInternational search[X]WO2004044181  (ISIS PHARMACEUTICALS INC [US], et al) [X] 1,2,5,16-22,35,37-46,48-51,53-55 * page 217; table 41 *;
 [X]WO2006020676  (ISIS PHARMACEUTICALS INC [US], et al) [X] 44-51,53 * claims 1-216; tables 1-42 *;
 [PX]WO2007031081  (SANTARIS PHARMA AS [DK], et al) [PX] 1-6,9-11,15-22,35-37,43-46,48,49,51,53-55 * the whole document *
 [X]  - FRIEDEN M ET AL, "Expanding the design horizon of antisense oligonucleotides with alpha-L-LNA", NUCLEIC ACIDS RESEARCH, OXFORD UNIVERSITY PRESS, SURREY, GB, (20031101), vol. 31, no. 21, ISSN 0305-1048, pages 6365 - 6372, XP002281376 [X] 1-7,9-11,15-26,33,35,44,45,49 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/nar/gkg820
 [X]  - FLUITER K ET AL, "ON THE IN VITRO AND IN VIVO PROPERTIES OF FOUR LOCKED NUCLEIC ACID NUCLEOTIDES INCORPORATED INTO AN ANTI-H-RAS ANTISENSE OLIGONUCLEOTIDE", CHEMBIOCHEM - A EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF CHEMICAL BIOLOGY, WILEY VCH, WEINHEIM, DE, (20050606), vol. 6, no. 6, ISSN 1439-4227, pages 1104 - 1109, XP009069506 [X] 1-7,9-11,15-26,33,35,44,45,49 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/cbic.200400419
by applicantWO2004044181
 WO2006020676
 WO2007031081
 WO9414226
 WO2005021570
 US7053207
 US6268490
 US6770748
 US6794499
 US7034133
 US6525191
 US2004171570
 US2004219565
 US2004014959
 US2003207841
 US2004143114
 US6670461
 US2003082807
 WO9324510
 WO9426764
    - SINGH ET AL., CHEM. COMMUN., (1998), vol. 4, pages 455 - 456
    - KOSHKIN ET AL., TETRAHEDRON, (1998), vol. 54, pages 3607 - 3630
    - WAHLESTEDT ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. U. S. A., (2000), vol. 97, pages 5633 - 5638
    - KUMAR ET AL., BIOORG. MED. CHEM. LETT., (1998), vol. 8, pages 2219 - 2222
    - SINGH ET AL., J. ORG. CHEM., (1998), vol. 63, pages 10035 - 10039
    - DAVIDSON; SHELNESS, ANNU. REV. NUTR., (2000), vol. 20, pages 169 - 193
    - GRUNDY ET AL., CIRCULATION, (2004), vol. 110, pages 227 - 239
    - YOU ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (1995), vol. 270, pages 29365 - 29371
    - WRIGHT, AM. J. PHYSIOL. RENAL PHYSIOL., (2001), vol. 280, pages FI0 - 18
    - NAWANO ET AL., AM. J. PHYSIOL. ENDOCRINOL. METAB., (2000), vol. 278, pages E535 - 543
    - ABIFADEL ET AL., NAT. GENET., (2003), vol. 34, pages 154 - 156
    - FRIDOVICH, ANNU. REV. BIOCHEM., (1995), vol. 64, pages 97 - 112
    - AL-CHALABI; LEIGH, CURR. OPIN. NEUROL., (2000), vol. 13, pages 397 - 405
    - ALISKY; DAVIDSON, HUM. GENE THER., (2000), vol. 11, pages 2315 - 2329
    - GEARY ET AL., CURR. OPIN. INVESTIG. DRUGS, (2001), vol. 2, pages 562 - 573