Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2027522

EP2027522 - ADAPTIVE POWER MANAGEMENT OF A DISK DRIVE BASED ON TEMPERATURE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  13.02.2015
Database last updated on 18.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip13.02.2015No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 18.03.2015  [2015/12]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Scientific-Atlanta, LLC
5030 Sugarloaf Parkway
Lawrenceville, GA 30044 / US
[2014/14]
Former [2009/09]For all designated states
Scientific-Atlanta, Inc.
5030 Sugarloaf Parkway
Lawrenceville, Georgia 30044 / US
Inventor(s)01 / SCHUTTE, Mark E.
1115 River Laurel Drive
Suwanee, Georgia 30024 / US
 [2009/09]
Representative(s)Mathys & Squire LLP
The Shard
32 London Bridge Street
London SE1 9SG / GB
[N/P]
Former [2014/15]Mathys & Squire LLP
120 Holborn London
EC1N 2SQ / GB
Former [2010/33]Mathys & Squire LLP
120 Holborn London
EC1N 2SQ / GB
Former [2009/09]Pautex Schneider, Nicole Véronique , et al
Novagraaf International SA 25, avenue du Pailly
1220 Les Avanchets - Geneva / CH
Application number, filing date07811970.831.05.2007
[2009/09]
WO2007US70030
Priority number, dateUS2006045184413.06.2006         Original published format: US 451844
[2009/09]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2007146598
Date:21.12.2007
Language:EN
[2007/51]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2027522
Date:25.02.2009
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.12.2007
[2009/09]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2027522
Date:09.04.2014
Language:EN
[2014/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP08.05.2008
ClassificationInternational:G06F1/32, G06F1/20, H04N5/781
[2013/42]
Former International [2013/34]H04N5/781, G06F1/20
Former International [2013/29]G06F1/32, H04N5/781, G06F1/20
Former International [2013/10]H04N5/781, G06F1/20
Former International [2009/09]G06F1/32
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   NL [2010/34]
Former [2009/09]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:ADAPTIVE LEISTUNGSVERWALTUNG EINES PLATTENLAUFWERKS AUF TEMPERATURBASIS[2009/09]
English:ADAPTIVE POWER MANAGEMENT OF A DISK DRIVE BASED ON TEMPERATURE[2009/09]
French:GESTION ADAPTATIVE DE LA PUISSANCE D'UNE UNITÉ DE DISQUE SUR LA BASE DE LA TEMPÉRATURE[2013/16]
Former [2009/09]GESTION DE LA PUISSANCE ADAPTATIVE D'UNE UNITÉ DE DISQUE SUR LA BASE DE LA TEMPÉRATURE
Entry into regional phase21.11.2008National basic fee paid 
21.11.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
21.11.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure21.11.2008Examination requested  [2009/09]
16.12.2008Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
09.04.2010Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR
26.01.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
23.05.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.07.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
26.07.2013Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
20.09.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.01.2014Fee for grant paid
20.01.2014Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  26.01.2011
Opposition(s)12.01.2015No opposition filed within time limit [2015/12]
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.05.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
25.05.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
25.05.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
25.05.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
28.05.2013Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipNL09.04.2014
[2014/50]
Cited inInternational search[Y]US5481733  (DOUGLIS FREDERICK [US], et al) [Y] 1-18,1,2,5,6,8-11,16,17 * column 3, line 18 - line 32 * * table 2 * * column 8, line 15 - line 63 * * column 9, line 40 - column 10, line 10 * * column 10, line 46 - column 12, line 25 * * figures 1-3 *;
 [Y]US5452277  (BAJOREK CHRISTOPHER H [US], et al) [Y] 1-18 * column 4, line 11 - line 29 * * column 5, line 63 - column 7, line 47 * * column 8, line 10 - line 56 * * column 9, line 6 - line 22 * * figures 3,6 *;
 [Y]US2004260957  (JEDDELOH JOSEPH M [US], et al) [Y] 1,2,5,6,8-11,16,17 * paragraph [0014] * * paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0029] * * figures 3,4,6 *;
 [A]US6892313  (CODILIAN RAFFI [US], et al) [A] 1-18 * column 1, line 32 - line 64 * * column 2, line 61 - column 3, line 7 * * column 3, line 65 - column 4, line 24 * * column 5, line 44 - column 6, line 44 * * figures 1-7 *