Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2033141

EP2033141 - EMBEDDED APPLIANCE FOR MULTIMEDIA CAPTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  08.10.2013
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip22.10.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
22.10.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Echo 360, Inc.
21000 Atlantic Boulevard
Dulles, VA 20166 / US
[2012/52]
Former [2012/24]For all designated states
Anystream Education, Inc.
21335 Signal Hill Plaza
Sterling, VA 20164 / US
Former [2009/11]For all designated states
Anystream, Inc.
21335 Signal Hill Plaza
Sterling, VA 20164 / US
Inventor(s)01 / ALLEN, Geoffrey, Benjamin
47807 Brawner Place
Potomac Falls, Virginia 20165 / US
02 / GEYER, Steven, Lee
1409 Summerset Place
Herndon, Virginia 20170 / US
03 / MCELRATH, Rodney, Dale
8913 Riverview Park Drive
Raleigh, North Carolina 27613 / US
 [2009/20]
Former [2009/18]01 / ALLEN, Geoffrey, Benjamin
47807 Brawner Place
Potomac Falls, Virginia 20165 / US
02 / GEYER, Steven, Lee
1409 Summerset Place
Herndon, Virginia 20170 / US
03 / MCELRATH, Rodney, Dale
5601 Picnic Rock Lane
Raleigh, North Carolina 27613 / US
Former [2009/11]01 / ALLEN, Geoffrey, Benjamin
47700 Loweland Terrace
Potomac Falls, Virginia 20165 / US
02 / GEYER, Steven, Lee
1409 Summerset Place
Herndon, Virginia 20170 / US
03 / MCELRATH, Rodney, Dale
5601 Picnic Rock Lane
Raleigh, North Carolina 27613 / US
Representative(s)Gill Jennings & Every LLP
The Broadgate Tower
20 Primrose Street
London EC2A 2ES / GB
[N/P]
Former [2009/11]Haley, Stephen
Gill Jennings & Every LLP Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street
London EC2M 7LH / GB
Application number, filing date07812250.422.06.2007
[2009/11]
WO2007US71872
Priority number, dateUS2006047299723.06.2006         Original published format: US 472997
[2009/11]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2007150019
Date:27.12.2007
Language:EN
[2007/52]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2033141
Date:11.03.2009
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.12.2007
[2009/11]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US04.12.2008
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP20.09.2012
ClassificationInternational:G06K9/00, H04N5/232, H04N1/00, H04L29/06, H04N5/44
[2012/43]
Former International [2009/11]G06K9/00, H04N5/232
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/11]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:EINGEBETTETES GERÄT FÜR MULTIMEDIAERFASSUNG[2009/11]
English:EMBEDDED APPLIANCE FOR MULTIMEDIA CAPTURE[2009/11]
French:DISPOSITIF INTÉGRÉ DE CAPTURE MULTIMÉDIA[2009/11]
Entry into regional phase13.01.2009National basic fee paid 
13.01.2009Search fee paid 
13.01.2009Designation fee(s) paid 
13.01.2009Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure13.01.2009Examination requested  [2009/11]
19.04.2013Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
27.05.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
04.10.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.09.2014Date of oral proceedings
28.10.2014Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
28.10.2014Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Appeal following examination05.01.2015Appeal received No.  T0573/15
09.03.2015Statement of grounds filed
10.02.2020Date of oral proceedings
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  27.05.2013
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.06.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
25.06.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
27.06.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
26.06.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
27.06.2013Renewal fee patent year 07
30.06.2014Renewal fee patent year 08
29.06.2015Renewal fee patent year 09
27.06.2016Renewal fee patent year 10
27.06.2017Renewal fee patent year 11
27.06.2018Renewal fee patent year 12
27.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 13
Documents cited:Search[IY]WO0127763  (IVEX CORP [US]) [I] 1-8,10-18 * page 1, line 19 - page 18, line 19; figures 1-4 * [Y] 9;
 [IY]US6104430  (FUKUOKA HIROKI [JP]) [I] 1-8 * the whole document * [Y] 9;
 [Y]  - HANCOCK B, "Security Views", COMPUTERS & SECURITY, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS. AMSTERDAM, NL, (19990101), vol. 18, no. 6, ISSN 0167-4048, pages 458 - 470, XP004178851 [Y] 9 * page 462, column l, line 16 - page 463, column r, line 4 *
 [A]  - XIN FENG ET AL, "Integrating Embedded PC and Internet Technologies for Real-Time Control and Imaging", IEEE / ASME TRANSACTIONS ON MECHATRONICS, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, US, (20020301), vol. 7, no. 1, ISSN 1083-4435, XP011034374 [A] 1-18 * the whole document *
 [A]  - MING LI ET AL, "Embedded video surveillance system for vehicle over WLAN and CDMA1X", WIRELESS COMMUNICATIONS, NETWORKING AND MOBILE COMPUTING, 2005. PROCEE DINGS. 2005 INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON WUHAN, CHINA SEPT. 23-26, 2005, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, (20050923), vol. 2, doi:10.1109/WCNM.2005.1544291, ISBN 978-0-7803-9335-6, pages 1292 - 1295, XP010856387 [A] 1-18 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/WCNM.2005.1544291
 [A]  - FRANK STAJANO ET AL, The Resurrecting Duckling: Security Issues for Ad-hoc Wireless Networks, SECURITY PROTOCOLS LECTURE NOTES IN COMPUTER SCIENCE;;LNCS, SPRINGER, BERLIN, DE, PAGE(S) 172 - 182, (20000101), ISBN 978-3-540-67381-1, XP019048733 [A] 1-18 * the whole document *
International search[T]US7298930  (EROL BERNA [US], et al);
 [A]US2004051787  (MUTSURO YASUO [JP], et al);
 [A]US2001017655  (ARAKI YOSHIYUKI [JP])
by applicantWO0127763
 US6104430