Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP2038801 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2038801



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 468
23.02.2018 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
19.04.2017 Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC Search / examination 1
23.03.2017 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
09.03.2017 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
09.03.2017 French translation of claims Search / examination 3
09.03.2017 German translation of the claims Search / examination 3
09.03.2017 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
04.11.2016 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
04.11.2016 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
04.11.2016 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
04.11.2016 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 29
04.11.2016 Text intended for grant (version for approval) Search / examination 29
27.09.2016 F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal Appeal 1
23.09.2016 Decision of the Board of Appeal Appeal 17
23.09.2016 Decision of the Board of Appeal Search / examination 17
23.09.2016 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 2
07.09.2016 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 3
07.09.2016 Amended description with annotations Appeal 1
07.09.2016 Claims submitted during oral proceedings Search / examination 3
07.09.2016 Description submitted during oral proceedings Search / examination 1
07.09.2016 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
07.09.2016 F3314 Oral proceedings: Minutes (ex parte) Appeal 2
04.07.2016 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 3
04.07.2016 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 3
04.07.2016 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 3
04.07.2016 Claims Appeal 3
04.07.2016 Claims Appeal 3
04.07.2016 Claims Appeal 3
04.07.2016 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 16
21.05.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
19.05.2016 F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal Appeal 1
17.05.2016 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 3
17.05.2016 F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) Appeal 17
11.05.2016 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
01.03.2016 F3303.17 Change of the composition of the Board (T), in case Chairman is a legal member Appeal 1
23.12.2014 F3004 Communication of the Registry Appeal 2
16.12.2014 General enquiry Appeal 1
11.11.2013 Submission concerning representation Search / examination 1
07.08.2012 Submission concerning representation Search / examination 1
25.06.2012 F3004 Communication of the Registry Appeal 3
12.06.2012 General enquiry Appeal 1
30.08.2011 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
16.08.2011 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant Search / examination 1
22.06.2011 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
15.06.2011 Processing of an appeal Appeal 2
23.05.2011 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 3
23.05.2011 Claims Appeal 3
23.05.2011 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 9
14.02.2011 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
13.01.2011 Advice of delivery Search / examination 2
13.01.2011 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
11.01.2011 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
11.01.2011 Annex to a communication Search / examination 1
11.01.2011 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
11.01.2011 Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) Search / examination 1
11.01.2011 Decision to refuse the application (examining division) Search / examination 2
11.01.2011 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Search / examination 10
11.01.2011 Means of redress Search / examination 2
11.01.2011 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
11.01.2011 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
11.01.2011 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
11.01.2011 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Search / examination 1
02.12.2010 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Search / examination 1
26.11.2010 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Search / examination 1
24.11.2010 Annex to the communication Search / examination 6
24.11.2010 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Search / examination 1
02.11.2010 Submission concerning representation Search / examination 1
29.10.2010 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
29.10.2010 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
29.10.2010 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
29.10.2010 Claims Search / examination 3
29.10.2010 Claims Search / examination 3
29.10.2010 Claims Search / examination 3
29.10.2010 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Search / examination 16
07.08.2010 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
05.08.2010 Advice of delivery Search / examination 2
04.08.2010 Annex to the communication Search / examination 5
04.08.2010 Preparation for oral proceedings Search / examination 2
04.08.2010 Summons to attend oral proceedings Search / examination 1
21.10.2009 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant Search / examination 1
02.09.2009 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
02.09.2009 Claims Search / examination 2
02.09.2009 Description Search / examination 4
02.09.2009 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 7
01.09.2009 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
01.09.2009 Claims Search / examination 2
01.09.2009 Description Search / examination 4
01.09.2009 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 7
21.04.2009 Annex to the communication Search / examination 4
21.04.2009 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
25.02.2009 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
03.02.2009 Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees Search / examination 2
21.01.2009 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 6
09.12.2008 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
27.11.2008 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
27.11.2008 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
27.11.2008 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 3
07.11.2008 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
27.08.2008 Reminder for payment period (examination fee/designation fees) Search / examination 1
21.08.2008 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 3
21.08.2008 International publication of the international search report Search / examination 2
22.01.2008 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 44
03.01.2008 Published international application - A2 Search / examination 30
01.10.2007 Abstract International Searching Authority 1
01.10.2007 Claims International Searching Authority 4
01.10.2007 Description International Searching Authority 13
01.10.2007 Drawings International Searching Authority 12
01.10.2007 Submission concerning representation International Searching Authority 1