Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2046946

EP2046946 - PLURIPOTENT STEM CELL CULTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  01.09.2017
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip11.10.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY
published on 13.11.2019  [2019/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
LifeScan, Inc.
965 Chesterbrook Boulevard
Wayne, PA 19087 / US
[N/P]
Former [2016/52]For all designated states
Lifescan, Inc.
965 Chesterbrook Boulevard
Wayne, PA 19087 / US
Former [2009/16]For all designated states
Lifescan, Inc.
1000 Gibraltar Drive
Milpitas, CA 95035 / US
Inventor(s)01 / PELLEGRINO-GENSEY, J. Lee
303 Wynnewood Road
Ewing, New Jersey 08628 / US
02 / FRYER, Benjamin
503 S. 46th Street
Philadelphia, Pennsylvania 19143 / US
 [2009/16]
Representative(s)Goodfellow, Hugh Robin , et al
Carpmaels & Ransford LLP
One Southampton Row
London WC1B 5HA / GB
[2016/43]
Former [2009/16]Goodfellow, Hugh Robin , et al
Carpmaels & Ransford, 43-45 Bloomsbury Square London
WC1A 2RA / GB
Application number, filing date07812340.326.06.2007
[2009/16]
WO2007US72133
Priority number, dateUS20060805770P26.06.2006         Original published format: US 805770 P
[2009/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2008036447
Date:27.03.2008
Language:EN
[2008/13]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2046946
Date:15.04.2009
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.03.2008
[2009/16]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2046946
Date:26.10.2016
Language:EN
[2016/43]
Type: B8 Corrected title page of specification 
No.:EP2046946
Date:25.01.2017
[2017/04]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP29.05.2008
ClassificationInternational:C12N5/00, C12N5/073, C12N5/0735
[2015/34]
Former International [2009/16]C12N5/06
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2016/43]
Former [2009/16]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:PLURIPOTENTE STAMMZELLENKULTUR[2009/16]
English:PLURIPOTENT STEM CELL CULTURE[2009/16]
French:CULTURE DE CELLULES SOUCHES PLURIPOTENTES[2009/16]
Entry into regional phase26.01.2009National basic fee paid 
26.01.2009Designation fee(s) paid 
26.01.2009Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure26.01.2009Examination requested  [2009/16]
07.04.2009Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
06.02.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
25.09.2013Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
04.12.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.12.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
31.03.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.10.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.02.2016Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
04.05.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
14.09.2016Fee for grant paid
14.09.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
14.09.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  06.02.2013
Opposition(s)27.07.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/40]
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
04.12.2013Request for further processing filed
04.12.2013Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
17.01.2014Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.01.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
11.06.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
13.06.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
14.06.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
10.06.2013Renewal fee patent year 07
31.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 08
10.06.2015Renewal fee patent year 09
10.06.2016Renewal fee patent year 10
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU26.06.2007
AT26.10.2016
BE26.10.2016
CY26.10.2016
CZ26.10.2016
DK26.10.2016
EE26.10.2016
FI26.10.2016
LT26.10.2016
LV26.10.2016
MC26.10.2016
NL26.10.2016
RO26.10.2016
SE26.10.2016
SI26.10.2016
SK26.10.2016
BG26.01.2017
GR27.01.2017
IS26.02.2017
PT27.02.2017
IE26.06.2017
LU26.06.2017
MT26.06.2017
CH30.06.2017
LI30.06.2017
[2019/46]
Former [2019/31]HU26.06.2007
AT26.10.2016
BE26.10.2016
CZ26.10.2016
DK26.10.2016
EE26.10.2016
FI26.10.2016
LT26.10.2016
LV26.10.2016
MC26.10.2016
NL26.10.2016
RO26.10.2016
SE26.10.2016
SI26.10.2016
SK26.10.2016
BG26.01.2017
GR27.01.2017
IS26.02.2017
PT27.02.2017
IE26.06.2017
LU26.06.2017
MT26.06.2017
CH30.06.2017
LI30.06.2017
Former [2018/43]AT26.10.2016
BE26.10.2016
CZ26.10.2016
DK26.10.2016
EE26.10.2016
FI26.10.2016
LT26.10.2016
LV26.10.2016
MC26.10.2016
NL26.10.2016
RO26.10.2016
SE26.10.2016
SI26.10.2016
SK26.10.2016
BG26.01.2017
GR27.01.2017
IS26.02.2017
PT27.02.2017
IE26.06.2017
LU26.06.2017
MT26.06.2017
CH30.06.2017
LI30.06.2017
Former [2018/23]AT26.10.2016
BE26.10.2016
CZ26.10.2016
DK26.10.2016
EE26.10.2016
FI26.10.2016
LT26.10.2016
LV26.10.2016
MC26.10.2016
NL26.10.2016
RO26.10.2016
SE26.10.2016
SI26.10.2016
SK26.10.2016
BG26.01.2017
GR27.01.2017
IS26.02.2017
PT27.02.2017
IE26.06.2017
LU26.06.2017
CH30.06.2017
LI30.06.2017
Former [2018/21]AT26.10.2016
BE26.10.2016
CZ26.10.2016
DK26.10.2016
EE26.10.2016
FI26.10.2016
LT26.10.2016
LV26.10.2016
MC26.10.2016
NL26.10.2016
RO26.10.2016
SE26.10.2016
SI26.10.2016
SK26.10.2016
BG26.01.2017
GR27.01.2017
IS26.02.2017
PT27.02.2017
LU26.06.2017
CH30.06.2017
LI30.06.2017
Former [2018/11]AT26.10.2016
BE26.10.2016
CZ26.10.2016
DK26.10.2016
EE26.10.2016
FI26.10.2016
LT26.10.2016
LV26.10.2016
MC26.10.2016
NL26.10.2016
RO26.10.2016
SE26.10.2016
SI26.10.2016
SK26.10.2016
BG26.01.2017
GR27.01.2017
IS26.02.2017
PT27.02.2017
Former [2017/52]AT26.10.2016
BE26.10.2016
CZ26.10.2016
DK26.10.2016
EE26.10.2016
FI26.10.2016
LT26.10.2016
LV26.10.2016
NL26.10.2016
RO26.10.2016
SE26.10.2016
SI26.10.2016
SK26.10.2016
BG26.01.2017
GR27.01.2017
IS26.02.2017
PT27.02.2017
Former [2017/38]AT26.10.2016
BE26.10.2016
CZ26.10.2016
DK26.10.2016
EE26.10.2016
FI26.10.2016
LT26.10.2016
LV26.10.2016
NL26.10.2016
RO26.10.2016
SE26.10.2016
SK26.10.2016
BG26.01.2017
GR27.01.2017
IS26.02.2017
PT27.02.2017
Former [2017/36]AT26.10.2016
BE26.10.2016
CZ26.10.2016
DK26.10.2016
EE26.10.2016
FI26.10.2016
LT26.10.2016
LV26.10.2016
NL26.10.2016
RO26.10.2016
SE26.10.2016
SK26.10.2016
GR27.01.2017
IS26.02.2017
PT27.02.2017
Former [2017/35]AT26.10.2016
BE26.10.2016
CZ26.10.2016
DK26.10.2016
EE26.10.2016
FI26.10.2016
LT26.10.2016
LV26.10.2016
NL26.10.2016
RO26.10.2016
SE26.10.2016
GR27.01.2017
IS26.02.2017
PT27.02.2017
Former [2017/34]AT26.10.2016
BE26.10.2016
CZ26.10.2016
DK26.10.2016
FI26.10.2016
LT26.10.2016
LV26.10.2016
NL26.10.2016
SE26.10.2016
GR27.01.2017
IS26.02.2017
PT27.02.2017
Former [2017/33]AT26.10.2016
BE26.10.2016
DK26.10.2016
FI26.10.2016
LT26.10.2016
LV26.10.2016
NL26.10.2016
SE26.10.2016
GR27.01.2017
IS26.02.2017
PT27.02.2017
Former [2017/26]AT26.10.2016
BE26.10.2016
FI26.10.2016
LT26.10.2016
LV26.10.2016
NL26.10.2016
SE26.10.2016
GR27.01.2017
IS26.02.2017
PT27.02.2017
Former [2017/12]LV26.10.2016
Cited inInternational search[X]WO0151616  (GERON CORP [US]; CARPENTER MELISSA K [US]; FUNK WALTER D [US]; GOLD JO) [X] 1-3,24-26 * page 2, line 39 - line 41 * * page 13, line 36 - page 19, line 38 * * example 1 *;
 [X]WO03054169  (THROMB X NV [BE]; SCHOONJANS LUC [BE]) [X] 1-3,24-26 * example 2 *;
 [X]WO2005080551  (UNIV NEWCASTLE [GB]; MURDOCH ALISON [GB]; STOJKOVIC MIODRAG [GB]; LAKO) [X] 1-3,24-26 * page 20, line 1 - line 10 *;
 [A]WO2004044158  (UNIV JOHNS HOPKINS [US]; CHENG LINZHAO [US])
ExaminationEP2302036