Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2070044

EP2070044 - LIVE COHERENT IMAGE SELECTION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  30.03.2011
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip31.07.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Adobe Inc.
345 Park Avenue
San Jose, CA 95110-2704 / US
[2019/12]
Former [2009/25]For all designated states
Adobe Systems Incorporated
345 Park Avenue
San Jose, CA 95110-2704 / US
Inventor(s)01 / WILENSKY, Gregg, D.
2355 Polk Street, 304
San Francisco, CA 94109 / US
02 / COHEN, Scott, D.
1056 Michelangelo Drive
Sunnyvale, CA 94087 / US
03 / CHIEN, Jen-chan
20685 Seaton Avenue
Saratoga, CA 95070 / US
 [2009/25]
Representative(s)Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Friedenheimer Brücke 21
80639 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2009/25]Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte
Grafinger Strasse 2
81671 München / DE
Application number, filing date07813184.420.07.2007
[2009/25]
WO2007US74022
Priority number, dateUS20060820087P21.07.2006         Original published format: US 820087 P
US2006051718906.09.2006         Original published format: US 517189
[2009/25]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2008011594
Date:24.01.2008
Language:EN
[2008/04]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2070044
Date:17.06.2009
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.01.2008
[2009/25]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP14.08.2008
ClassificationInternational:G06T5/00
[2009/25]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/25]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:DIREKTE KOHÄRENTE BILDAUSWAHL[2009/25]
English:LIVE COHERENT IMAGE SELECTION[2009/25]
French:SELECTION D'IMAGES COHERENTES EN DIRECT[2009/25]
Entry into regional phase20.02.2009National basic fee paid 
20.02.2009Designation fee(s) paid 
20.02.2009Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure20.02.2009Examination requested  [2009/25]
23.04.2009Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
29.11.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
23.03.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.12.2014Date of oral proceedings
15.12.2014Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
15.12.2014Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Appeal following examination12.02.2015Appeal received No.  T0946/15
26.03.2015Statement of grounds filed
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  29.11.2010
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.07.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
14.07.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
12.07.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
13.07.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
10.07.2013Renewal fee patent year 07
14.07.2014Renewal fee patent year 08
10.07.2015Renewal fee patent year 09
11.07.2016Renewal fee patent year 10
12.07.2017Renewal fee patent year 11
11.07.2018Renewal fee patent year 12
29.07.2019Renewal fee patent year 13
Cited inInternational search[X]US2006159342  (SUN YIYONG [US] ET AL) [X] 1-33 * figures 3-5 * * page 1, paragraph 4 - paragraph 5 * * page 1, paragraph 9 - paragraph 10 * * page 2, paragraph 20 - page 3, paragraph 23 * * page 4, paragraph 32 - paragraph 38 *;
 [X]US2004008886  (BOYKOV YURI [US]) [X] 1-33 * figures 3-5 * * page 2, paragraph 21 - page 3, paragraph 39 * * page 4, paragraph 54 - page 5, paragraph 59 *;
 [X]  - KAR-HAN TAN ET AL, "Selecting objects with freehand sketches", PROCEEDINGS OF THE EIGHT IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON COMPUTER VISION. (ICCV). VANCOUVER, BRITISH COLUMBIA, CANADA, JULY 7 - 14, 2001; [INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON COMPUTER VISION], LOS ALAMITOS, CA : IEEE COMP. SOC, US, (20010707), vol. 1, ISBN 978-0-7695-1143-6, pages 337 - 344, XP010554002 [X] 1-33 * figures 1,3,7 * * page 338, column R, line 1, paragraph 3 - page 339, column L, line L * * page 340, column L, line 1, paragraph 5 - page 341, column L, line L * * page 341, column L, paragraph 6 - page 342, column L *
 [X]  - YURI BOYKOV ET AL, "Interactive Organ Segmentation Using Graph Cuts", MEDICAL IMAGE COMPUTING AND COMPUTER-ASSISTED INTERVENTION - MIC CAI 2000 LECTURE NOTES IN COMPUTER SCIENCE;;LNCS, SPRINGER-VERLAG, BE, (20040101), vol. 1935, ISBN 978-3-540-41189-5, pages 276 - 286, XP019001267 [X] 1-33 * page 277, line 12 - page 278, line 24 * * page 279, line 1, paragraph 2 - page 280, line L *
 [A]  - ROTHER C ET AL, "GrabCut - interactive foreground extraction using iterated graph cuts", ACM TRANSACTIONS ON GRAPHICS, ACM, NEW YORK, NY, US, (20040801), vol. 23, no. 3, ISSN 0730-0301, pages 309 - 314, XP002340109 [A] 1-33 * page 310, column L, paragraph 1.2 * * page 311, column L, line 1, paragraph 3 - page 312, column R, line L * * figures 3,5 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/1015706.1015720
 [A]  - KAR-HAN TAN ET AL, "A representation of image structure and its application to object selection using freehand sketches", PROCEEDINGS 2001 IEEE CONFERENCE ON COMPUTER VISION AND PATTERN RECOGNITION. CVPR 2001. KAUAI, HAWAII, DEC. 8 - 14, 2001; [PROCEEDINGS OF THE IEEE COMPUTER CONFERENCE ON COMPUTER VISION AND PATTERN RECOGNITION], LOS ALAMITOS, CA, IEEE COMP. SOC, US, (20011208), vol. 2, ISBN 978-0-7695-1272-3, pages 677 - 683, XP010584190 [A] 1-33 * figures 1,3,12,13 * * pages II-679, column L, paragraph 4 - pages II-680, column L, paragraph 5 *