Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2051602

EP2051602 - COLLAPSIBLE EXPANDING LUGGAGE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  28.03.2014
Database last updated on 17.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip17.07.2015Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): HU, LU
published on 19.08.2015  [2015/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Max Mirani Investments, LLC
127 Clinton Street 3
Hoboken NJ 07030 / US
[2009/33]
Former [2009/18]For all designated states
Max Mirani, LLC
127 Clinton Street 3
Hoboken, NJ 07030 / US
Inventor(s)01 / BETTUA, Michael
127 Clinton St., 3
Hoboken, New Jersey 07030 / US
02 / JOSEPH, Kiran
No. 14, Tarapore Avenue
Harrington Road
Chetput
Chennai 600031 / IN
03 / MATTHAI, Rachel
127 Clinton St., 3
Hoboken, New Jersey 07030 / US
 [2013/21]
Former [2009/18]01 / BETTUA, Michael
127 Clinton St., 3
Hoboken, New Jersey 07030 / US
02 / JOSEPH, Kiran
No. 14, Tarapore Avenue Harrington Road Chetput
Chennai 600031 / IN
03 / MATTHAI, Rachel
127 Clinton St., 3
Hoboken, New Jersey 07030 / US
Representative(s)Beck Greener
Fulwood House
12 Fulwood Place
London WC1V 6HR / GB
[2014/16]
Former [2013/21]Bebbington, Nicholas Paul
Beck Greener Fulwood House 12 Fulwood Place
London WC1V 6HR / GB
Former [2009/18]Bebbington, Nicholas Paul
Beck Greener Fulwood House 12 Fulwood Place
GB-London WC1V 6HR / GB
Application number, filing date07813814.606.08.2007
[2009/18]
WO2007US75283
Priority number, dateUS2006046431314.08.2006         Original published format: US 464313
[2009/18]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2008021793
Date:21.02.2008
Language:EN
[2008/08]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2051602
Date:29.04.2009
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.02.2008
[2009/18]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2051602
Date:22.05.2013
Language:EN
[2013/21]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US27.11.2008
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.10.2011
ClassificationInternational:A45C7/00, A45C13/00, A45C5/00, A45C13/26, A45C13/10, A45C13/36
[2009/18]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/18]
TitleGerman:FALT- UND DEHNBARES GEPÄCKSTÜCK[2009/18]
English:COLLAPSIBLE EXPANDING LUGGAGE[2009/18]
French:BAGAGE EXTENSIBLE REPLIABLE[2009/18]
Entry into regional phase20.01.2009National basic fee paid 
20.01.2009Search fee paid 
20.01.2009Designation fee(s) paid 
20.01.2009Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure20.01.2009Examination requested  [2009/18]
15.05.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
09.07.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
06.09.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.12.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
05.04.2013Fee for grant paid
05.04.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  09.07.2012
Opposition(s)25.02.2014No opposition filed within time limit [2014/18]
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.08.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
25.08.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
24.08.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
23.08.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU06.08.2007
AT22.05.2013
BE22.05.2013
CY22.05.2013
CZ22.05.2013
DK22.05.2013
EE22.05.2013
FI22.05.2013
IT22.05.2013
LT22.05.2013
LV22.05.2013
MC22.05.2013
MT22.05.2013
NL22.05.2013
PL22.05.2013
RO22.05.2013
SE22.05.2013
SI22.05.2013
SK22.05.2013
TR22.05.2013
IE06.08.2013
LU06.08.2013
BG22.08.2013
GR23.08.2013
CH31.08.2013
LI31.08.2013
ES02.09.2013
IS22.09.2013
PT23.09.2013
[2015/34]
Former [2015/32]AT22.05.2013
BE22.05.2013
CY22.05.2013
CZ22.05.2013
DK22.05.2013
EE22.05.2013
FI22.05.2013
IT22.05.2013
LT22.05.2013
LV22.05.2013
MC22.05.2013
MT22.05.2013
NL22.05.2013
PL22.05.2013
RO22.05.2013
SE22.05.2013
SI22.05.2013
SK22.05.2013
TR22.05.2013
IE06.08.2013
BG22.08.2013
GR23.08.2013
CH31.08.2013
LI31.08.2013
ES02.09.2013
IS22.09.2013
PT23.09.2013
Former [2015/30]AT22.05.2013
BE22.05.2013
CY22.05.2013
CZ22.05.2013
DK22.05.2013
EE22.05.2013
FI22.05.2013
IT22.05.2013
LT22.05.2013
LV22.05.2013
MC22.05.2013
NL22.05.2013
PL22.05.2013
RO22.05.2013
SE22.05.2013
SI22.05.2013
SK22.05.2013
IE06.08.2013
BG22.08.2013
GR23.08.2013
CH31.08.2013
LI31.08.2013
ES02.09.2013
IS22.09.2013
PT23.09.2013
Former [2014/33]AT22.05.2013
BE22.05.2013
CZ22.05.2013
DK22.05.2013
EE22.05.2013
FI22.05.2013
IT22.05.2013
LT22.05.2013
LV22.05.2013
MC22.05.2013
NL22.05.2013
PL22.05.2013
RO22.05.2013
SE22.05.2013
SI22.05.2013
SK22.05.2013
IE06.08.2013
BG22.08.2013
GR23.08.2013
CH31.08.2013
LI31.08.2013
ES02.09.2013
IS22.09.2013
PT23.09.2013
Former [2014/20]AT22.05.2013
BE22.05.2013
CZ22.05.2013
DK22.05.2013
EE22.05.2013
FI22.05.2013
IT22.05.2013
LT22.05.2013
LV22.05.2013
MC22.05.2013
NL22.05.2013
PL22.05.2013
RO22.05.2013
SE22.05.2013
SI22.05.2013
SK22.05.2013
BG22.08.2013
GR23.08.2013
CH31.08.2013
LI31.08.2013
ES02.09.2013
IS22.09.2013
PT23.09.2013
Former [2014/14]AT22.05.2013
BE22.05.2013
CZ22.05.2013
DK22.05.2013
EE22.05.2013
FI22.05.2013
IT22.05.2013
LT22.05.2013
LV22.05.2013
NL22.05.2013
PL22.05.2013
RO22.05.2013
SE22.05.2013
SI22.05.2013
SK22.05.2013
BG22.08.2013
GR23.08.2013
ES02.09.2013
IS22.09.2013
PT23.09.2013
Former [2014/11]AT22.05.2013
BE22.05.2013
CZ22.05.2013
DK22.05.2013
EE22.05.2013
FI22.05.2013
IT22.05.2013
LT22.05.2013
LV22.05.2013
PL22.05.2013
RO22.05.2013
SE22.05.2013
SI22.05.2013
SK22.05.2013
BG22.08.2013
GR23.08.2013
ES02.09.2013
IS22.09.2013
PT23.09.2013
Former [2014/10]AT22.05.2013
BE22.05.2013
CZ22.05.2013
DK22.05.2013
EE22.05.2013
FI22.05.2013
LT22.05.2013
LV22.05.2013
PL22.05.2013
SE22.05.2013
SI22.05.2013
SK22.05.2013
BG22.08.2013
GR23.08.2013
ES02.09.2013
IS22.09.2013
PT23.09.2013
Former [2014/09]AT22.05.2013
BE22.05.2013
DK22.05.2013
EE22.05.2013
FI22.05.2013
LT22.05.2013
LV22.05.2013
PL22.05.2013
SE22.05.2013
SI22.05.2013
BG22.08.2013
GR23.08.2013
ES02.09.2013
IS22.09.2013
PT23.09.2013
Former [2014/06]AT22.05.2013
BE22.05.2013
FI22.05.2013
LT22.05.2013
LV22.05.2013
PL22.05.2013
SE22.05.2013
SI22.05.2013
BG22.08.2013
GR23.08.2013
ES02.09.2013
IS22.09.2013
PT23.09.2013
Former [2014/02]AT22.05.2013
FI22.05.2013
LT22.05.2013
LV22.05.2013
PL22.05.2013
SE22.05.2013
SI22.05.2013
BG22.08.2013
GR23.08.2013
ES02.09.2013
IS22.09.2013
PT23.09.2013
Former [2013/50]AT22.05.2013
FI22.05.2013
LT22.05.2013
PL22.05.2013
SE22.05.2013
SI22.05.2013
BG22.08.2013
GR23.08.2013
ES02.09.2013
IS22.09.2013
PT23.09.2013
Former [2013/49]AT22.05.2013
FI22.05.2013
LT22.05.2013
SE22.05.2013
SI22.05.2013
GR23.08.2013
ES02.09.2013
IS22.09.2013
PT23.09.2013
Former [2013/48]AT22.05.2013
LT22.05.2013
ES02.09.2013
IS22.09.2013
PT23.09.2013
Former [2013/47]LT22.05.2013
PT23.09.2013
Documents cited:Search[XI]US2250126  (THOMAS CROSS WALTER) [X] 1,6 * the whole document * [I] 2-5,7,14;
 [A]US5749446  (HSIEH AQUINO [CN]) [A] 14 * abstract *;
 [E]GB2441180  (HENSHALL DAVID HENRY [GB]) [E] 1 * the whole document *;
 [XI]US3647035  (HONIG WILLIAM) [X] 1,6 * the whole document * [I] 3-5,7;
 [X]US6401890  (TAN FU-HSING [TW]) [X] 1,6,14 * the whole document *
International search[Y]US5289906  (GUIDI PIERINO GIUSEPPE [IT]);
 [Y]US4773515  (KOTKINS JR HENRY L [US]);
 [X]US2538616  (THOMAS CROSS WALTER);
 [Y]US6502677  (TIRAMANI PAOLO M B [US], et al);
 [Y]US6408443  (PARK BOO YL [KR]);
 [X]US3031121  (HERBERT CHASE);
 [XP]US2007074941  (LIANG JOSEPH [TW])
by applicantUS6443274
 US2250126
 US5749446