Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2059868

EP2059868 - PORTABLE ELECTRONIC DEVICE FOR PHOTO MANAGEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  05.08.2011
Database last updated on 14.07.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip04.10.2013Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): HU
published on 06.11.2013  [2013/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
APPLE INC.
1 Infinite Loop
Cupertino, CA 95014 / US
[2010/39]
Former [2009/21]For all designated states
Apple Inc.
1 Infinite Loop
Cupertino, CA 95014 / US
Inventor(s)01 / MATAS, Michael
1065 Middlefield Road
Palo Alto, CA 94301 / US
02 / CHRISTIE, Greg
1112 Kelly Drive
San Jose, CA 95129 / US
03 / MARCOS, Paul, D.
1108 Covington Road
Los Altos, CA 95014 / US
04 / FORSTALL, Scott
329 Martens Way
Mountain View, CA 94040 / US
05 / VAN OS, Marcel
116 Lundy's Lane Unit A
San Francisco, CA 94110 / US
06 / ORDING, Bas
44 Newburg Street
San Francisco, CA 94131 / US
07 / CHAUDHRI, Imran
300 Linden Street, 7
San Francisco, CA 94102 / US
 [2009/21]
Representative(s)Lang, Johannes
Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB
Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte
Postfach 86 06 20
81633 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2009/21]Lang, Johannes
Bardehle Pagenberg Dost Altenburg Geissler, Postfach 86 06 20
81633 München / DE
Former [2008/33]Lang, Johannes
Bardehle Pagenberg Dost Altenburg Geissler Isenbruck Postfach 86 06 20
81633 München / DE
Application number, filing date07814633.931.08.2007
[2009/21]
WO2007US77441
Priority number, dateUS20060824769P06.09.2006         Original published format: US 824769 P
US20070883785P06.01.2007         Original published format: US 883785 P
US20070879253P07.01.2007         Original published format: US 879253 P
US20070879469P08.01.2007         Original published format: US 879469 P
US20070937993P29.06.2007         Original published format: US 937993 P
US20070947118P29.06.2007         Original published format: US 947118 P
US2007084821030.08.2007         Original published format: US 848210
[2009/21]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2008030779
Date:13.03.2008
Language:EN
[2008/11]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2059868
Date:20.05.2009
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.03.2008
[2009/21]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2059868
Date:29.09.2010
Language:EN
[2010/39]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP26.06.2008
ClassificationInternational:G06F3/048
[2009/21]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/21]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:TRAGBARES ELEKTRONISCHES GERÄT ZUR FOTO-VERWALTUNG[2009/21]
English:PORTABLE ELECTRONIC DEVICE FOR PHOTO MANAGEMENT[2009/21]
French:DISPOSITIF ÉLECTRONIQUE PORTATIF POUR GESTION DE PHOTOGRAPHIES[2009/21]
Entry into regional phase25.04.2008National basic fee paid 
25.04.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
25.04.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure25.04.2008Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
25.04.2008Examination requested  [2009/21]
10.08.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
12.11.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.03.2010Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.07.2010Fee for grant paid
21.07.2010Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP10172417.7  / EP2282275
EP11178257.9  / EP2390799
EP11178259.5  / EP2390779
EP18197554.1  / EP3447620
Opposition(s)30.06.2011No opposition filed within time limit [2011/36]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.08.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
17.08.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT29.09.2010
BE29.09.2010
CY29.09.2010
CZ29.09.2010
DK29.09.2010
EE29.09.2010
HU29.09.2010
IT29.09.2010
LT29.09.2010
LV29.09.2010
MT29.09.2010
PL29.09.2010
RO29.09.2010
SI29.09.2010
SK29.09.2010
TR29.09.2010
BG29.12.2010
GR30.12.2010
ES09.01.2011
IS29.01.2011
PT31.01.2011
[2013/45]
Former [2013/44]AT29.09.2010
BE29.09.2010
CY29.09.2010
CZ29.09.2010
DK29.09.2010
EE29.09.2010
IT29.09.2010
LT29.09.2010
LV29.09.2010
MT29.09.2010
PL29.09.2010
RO29.09.2010
SI29.09.2010
SK29.09.2010
TR29.09.2010
BG29.12.2010
GR30.12.2010
ES09.01.2011
IS29.01.2011
PT31.01.2011
Former [2013/42]AT29.09.2010
BE29.09.2010
CY29.09.2010
CZ29.09.2010
DK29.09.2010
EE29.09.2010
IT29.09.2010
LT29.09.2010
LV29.09.2010
MT29.09.2010
PL29.09.2010
RO29.09.2010
SI29.09.2010
SK29.09.2010
BG29.12.2010
GR30.12.2010
ES09.01.2011
IS29.01.2011
PT31.01.2011
Former [2013/26]AT29.09.2010
BE29.09.2010
CY29.09.2010
CZ29.09.2010
DK29.09.2010
EE29.09.2010
IT29.09.2010
LT29.09.2010
LV29.09.2010
MT29.09.2010
PL29.09.2010
RO29.09.2010
SI29.09.2010
SK29.09.2010
GR30.12.2010
ES09.01.2011
IS29.01.2011
PT31.01.2011
Former [2012/05]AT29.09.2010
BE29.09.2010
CZ29.09.2010
DK29.09.2010
EE29.09.2010
IT29.09.2010
LT29.09.2010
LV29.09.2010
MT29.09.2010
PL29.09.2010
RO29.09.2010
SI29.09.2010
SK29.09.2010
GR30.12.2010
ES09.01.2011
IS29.01.2011
PT31.01.2011
Former [2011/40]AT29.09.2010
BE29.09.2010
CZ29.09.2010
DK29.09.2010
EE29.09.2010
IT29.09.2010
LT29.09.2010
LV29.09.2010
PL29.09.2010
RO29.09.2010
SI29.09.2010
SK29.09.2010
GR30.12.2010
ES09.01.2011
IS29.01.2011
PT31.01.2011
Former [2011/34]AT29.09.2010
BE29.09.2010
CZ29.09.2010
EE29.09.2010
IT29.09.2010
LT29.09.2010
LV29.09.2010
RO29.09.2010
SI29.09.2010
SK29.09.2010
GR30.12.2010
ES09.01.2011
IS29.01.2011
PT31.01.2011
Former [2011/27]AT29.09.2010
BE29.09.2010
CZ29.09.2010
EE29.09.2010
IT29.09.2010
LT29.09.2010
LV29.09.2010
RO29.09.2010
SI29.09.2010
SK29.09.2010
GR30.12.2010
IS29.01.2011
PT31.01.2011
Former [2011/26]AT29.09.2010
CZ29.09.2010
EE29.09.2010
IT29.09.2010
LT29.09.2010
LV29.09.2010
RO29.09.2010
SI29.09.2010
SK29.09.2010
GR30.12.2010
IS29.01.2011
PT31.01.2011
Cited inInternational search[A]US2006001652  (CHIU YEN-CHANG [TW], et al) [A] 1 * page 1, paragraph 5 - paragraph 10 *;
 [A]US2005183026  (AMANO RYOKO [JP], et al) [A] 1-13,15-26,28,30 * abstract * * page 1, paragraph 7 - paragraph 16 * * page 6, paragraph 115 - paragraph 116 * * figures 11,13A *;
 [A]US2004205504  (PHILLIPS BRENT RUSSEL [US]) [A] 1-13,15-26,28,30 * abstract * * page 1, paragraph 9 - paragraph 16 *;
 [A]WO03023593  (MYORIGO OY [FI], et al) [A] 32-40 * abstract * * page 7, line 18 - page 9, line 14 * * figures 1-5 *;
 [A]US2003122787  (ZIMMERMAN JOHN [US], et al) [A] 32-40 * the whole document *