Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2079584

EP2079584 - LASER MARKING OF PIGMENT LAYERS ON DOCUMENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  27.01.2012
Database last updated on 11.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip13.11.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
13.11.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
L-1 Secure Credentialing, Inc.
296 Concord Road
Billerica, MA 01821 / US
[2012/08]
Former [2009/30]For all designated states
Digimarc Corporation
9405 SW Gemini Drive
Beaverton, OR 97008 / US
Inventor(s)01 / JONES, Robert, L.
1 Coventry Lane
Andover, MA 01810 / US
02 / BI, Daoshen
1107 Liberty Square Road
Boxborough, MA 01719 / US
 [2009/39]
Former [2009/30]01 / JONES, Robert, L.
1 Coventry Lane
Andover, MA 01810 / US
02 / BI, Daoshen
58 Loring Avenue
Boxborough, MA 01719 / US
Representative(s)Conroy, John , et al
Fish & Richardson P.C.
Highlight Business Towers
Mies-van-der-Rohe-Straße 8
80807 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2013/31]Peterreins, Frank
Fish & Richardson P.C.
Highlight Business Towers
Mies-van-der-Rohe-Strasse 8
80807 München / DE
Former [2013/15]Mintz Levin Cohn Ferris Glovsky and Popeo LLP
Alder Castle
10 Noble Street
London EC2V 7JX / GB
Former [2009/52]Bevan, Emma , et al
Mintz, Levin, Cohn, Ferris, Glovsky and Popeo IP, LLP Alder Castle 10 Noble Street
London EC2V 7JX / GB
Former [2009/30]Bevan, Emma , et al
Mintz, Levin, Cohn, Ferris, Glovsky and Popeo IP, LLP Alder Castle 10 Noble Street
London EC2V 7JX / GB
Application number, filing date07814639.631.08.2007
[2009/30]
WO2007US77450
Priority number, dateUS20060824410P01.09.2006         Original published format: US 824410 P
[2009/30]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2008028158
Date:06.03.2008
Language:EN
[2008/10]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2079584
Date:22.07.2009
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.03.2008
[2009/30]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2079584
Date:29.02.2012
Language:EN
[2012/09]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US23.10.2008
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.03.2010
ClassificationInternational:B41M5/24, B42D15/10, G06K19/02
[2010/26]
Former International [2010/17]B41M5/24, B42D15/10
Former International [2009/30]B32B29/06
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/30]
TitleGerman:LASERMARKIERUNG VON PIGMENTSCHICHTEN AUF DOKUMENTEN[2009/30]
English:LASER MARKING OF PIGMENT LAYERS ON DOCUMENTS[2009/30]
French:MARQUAGE LASER DE COUCHES DE PIGMENTS SUR DES DOCUMENTS[2009/30]
Entry into regional phase01.04.2009National basic fee paid 
01.04.2009Search fee paid 
01.04.2009Designation fee(s) paid 
01.04.2009Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure01.04.2009Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
01.04.2009Examination requested  [2009/30]
02.07.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
11.01.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.02.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
17.06.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.08.2011Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.12.2011Fee for grant paid
19.12.2011Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  02.07.2010
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  29.11.2012  07.12.2012  ADMISSIBLE
Giesecke & Devrient GmbH
Prinzregentenstrasse 159
81677 München / DE
Opponent's representative
Klunker IP Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Destouchesstraße 68
80796 München / DE
 [2017/28]
Former [2016/14]
Opponent(s)01  29.11.2012  07.12.2012  ADMISSIBLE
Giesecke & Devrient GmbH
Prinzregentenstrasse 159
81677 München / DE
Opponent's representative
Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch
Patentanwälte
Destouchesstraße 68
80796 München / DE
Former [2013/02]
Opponent(s)01  29.11.2012   
Giesecke & Devrient GmbH
Prinzregentenstrasse 159
81677 München / DE
13.02.2013Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
22.08.2013Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
16.03.2016Date of oral proceedings
22.04.2016Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
22.04.2016Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
Appeal following opposition21.06.2016Appeal received No.  T1564/16
10.08.2016Statement of grounds filed
18.09.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.08.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
25.08.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
25.08.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU31.08.2007
AT29.02.2012
BE29.02.2012
CY29.02.2012
CZ29.02.2012
DK29.02.2012
EE29.02.2012
FI29.02.2012
IT29.02.2012
LT29.02.2012
LV29.02.2012
MT29.02.2012
NL29.02.2012
PL29.02.2012
RO29.02.2012
SE29.02.2012
SI29.02.2012
SK29.02.2012
TR29.02.2012
BG29.05.2012
GR30.05.2012
ES09.06.2012
IS29.06.2012
PT29.06.2012
CH31.08.2012
FR31.08.2012
GB31.08.2012
IE31.08.2012
LI31.08.2012
LU31.08.2012
MC31.08.2012
[2014/34]
Former [2014/27]AT29.02.2012
BE29.02.2012
CY29.02.2012
CZ29.02.2012
DK29.02.2012
EE29.02.2012
FI29.02.2012
IT29.02.2012
LT29.02.2012
LV29.02.2012
MT29.02.2012
NL29.02.2012
PL29.02.2012
RO29.02.2012
SE29.02.2012
SI29.02.2012
SK29.02.2012
TR29.02.2012
BG29.05.2012
GR30.05.2012
ES09.06.2012
IS29.06.2012
PT29.06.2012
CH31.08.2012
FR31.08.2012
GB31.08.2012
IE31.08.2012
LI31.08.2012
LU31.08.2012
MC31.08.2012
Former [2014/21]AT29.02.2012
BE29.02.2012
CY29.02.2012
CZ29.02.2012
DK29.02.2012
EE29.02.2012
FI29.02.2012
IT29.02.2012
LT29.02.2012
LV29.02.2012
MT29.02.2012
NL29.02.2012
PL29.02.2012
RO29.02.2012
SE29.02.2012
SI29.02.2012
SK29.02.2012
TR29.02.2012
BG29.05.2012
GR30.05.2012
ES09.06.2012
IS29.06.2012
PT29.06.2012
CH31.08.2012
FR31.08.2012
GB31.08.2012
IE31.08.2012
LI31.08.2012
MC31.08.2012
Former [2013/51]AT29.02.2012
BE29.02.2012
CY29.02.2012
CZ29.02.2012
DK29.02.2012
EE29.02.2012
FI29.02.2012
IT29.02.2012
LT29.02.2012
LV29.02.2012
MT29.02.2012
NL29.02.2012
PL29.02.2012
RO29.02.2012
SE29.02.2012
SI29.02.2012
SK29.02.2012
BG29.05.2012
GR30.05.2012
ES09.06.2012
IS29.06.2012
PT29.06.2012
CH31.08.2012
FR31.08.2012
GB31.08.2012
IE31.08.2012
LI31.08.2012
MC31.08.2012
Former [2013/40]AT29.02.2012
BE29.02.2012
CY29.02.2012
CZ29.02.2012
DK29.02.2012
EE29.02.2012
FI29.02.2012
IT29.02.2012
LT29.02.2012
LV29.02.2012
NL29.02.2012
PL29.02.2012
RO29.02.2012
SE29.02.2012
SI29.02.2012
SK29.02.2012
BG29.05.2012
GR30.05.2012
ES09.06.2012
IS29.06.2012
PT29.06.2012
CH31.08.2012
FR31.08.2012
GB31.08.2012
IE31.08.2012
LI31.08.2012
MC31.08.2012
Former [2013/34]AT29.02.2012
BE29.02.2012
CY29.02.2012
CZ29.02.2012
DK29.02.2012
EE29.02.2012
FI29.02.2012
IT29.02.2012
LT29.02.2012
LV29.02.2012
NL29.02.2012
PL29.02.2012
RO29.02.2012
SE29.02.2012
SI29.02.2012
SK29.02.2012
BG29.05.2012
GR30.05.2012
ES09.06.2012
IS29.06.2012
PT29.06.2012
CH31.08.2012
GB31.08.2012
IE31.08.2012
LI31.08.2012
MC31.08.2012
Former [2013/33]AT29.02.2012
BE29.02.2012
CY29.02.2012
CZ29.02.2012
DK29.02.2012
EE29.02.2012
FI29.02.2012
IT29.02.2012
LT29.02.2012
LV29.02.2012
NL29.02.2012
PL29.02.2012
RO29.02.2012
SE29.02.2012
SI29.02.2012
SK29.02.2012
BG29.05.2012
GR30.05.2012
ES09.06.2012
IS29.06.2012
PT29.06.2012
CH31.08.2012
IE31.08.2012
LI31.08.2012
MC31.08.2012
Former [2012/50]BE29.02.2012
CY29.02.2012
CZ29.02.2012
DK29.02.2012
EE29.02.2012
FI29.02.2012
IT29.02.2012
LT29.02.2012
LV29.02.2012
NL29.02.2012
PL29.02.2012
RO29.02.2012
SE29.02.2012
SI29.02.2012
SK29.02.2012
GR30.05.2012
IS29.06.2012
PT29.06.2012
Former [2012/49]BE29.02.2012
CY29.02.2012
CZ29.02.2012
DK29.02.2012
EE29.02.2012
FI29.02.2012
LT29.02.2012
LV29.02.2012
NL29.02.2012
PL29.02.2012
RO29.02.2012
SE29.02.2012
SI29.02.2012
GR30.05.2012
IS29.06.2012
PT29.06.2012
Former [2012/48]BE29.02.2012
CY29.02.2012
EE29.02.2012
FI29.02.2012
LT29.02.2012
LV29.02.2012
NL29.02.2012
SE29.02.2012
GR30.05.2012
IS29.06.2012
PT29.06.2012
Former [2012/41]BE29.02.2012
CY29.02.2012
FI29.02.2012
LT29.02.2012
LV29.02.2012
NL29.02.2012
GR30.05.2012
IS29.06.2012
PT29.06.2012
Former [2012/39]BE29.02.2012
FI29.02.2012
LT29.02.2012
LV29.02.2012
NL29.02.2012
GR30.05.2012
IS29.06.2012
PT29.06.2012
Former [2012/37]BE29.02.2012
FI29.02.2012
LT29.02.2012
NL29.02.2012
GR30.05.2012
IS29.06.2012
PT29.06.2012
Former [2012/36]LT29.02.2012
NL29.02.2012
GR30.05.2012
IS29.06.2012
Former [2012/35]LT29.02.2012
NL29.02.2012
IS29.06.2012
Former [2012/34]LT29.02.2012
IS29.06.2012
Former [2012/33]LT29.02.2012
Documents cited:Search[X]EP1661729  (MERCK PATENT GMBH) [X] 1-12 * paragraphs [0001] , [0009] - [0025] - [0034] - [0048]; figures 1-4; examples 1-8; claims 1-10 *
International search[XY]US4754128  (TAKEDA MITSURU [JP], et al) [X] 1-2, 5, 9-23 * , column 2, lines 5-68. * [Y] 3-4, 6-8;
 [Y]US5061341  (KILDAL MAURICE A [US], et al) [Y] 3-4 * , column 2, lines 5-68. *;
 [X]US5635012  (BELLUCI BARRY P [US], et al) [X] 24-26 * , column 2, lines 15-68. *;
 [Y]US6689205  (BRUECKNER HANS-DIETER [DE], et al) [Y] 6-8 * , column 3, lines 1-68. *
ExaminationWO02090002
 US2004233463
by applicantUS6066594
 US4754128
 US5783024
 US6007660
 US6159327
 US6283188
 US6003581
 US2005084693
 EP1661729
 US5061341
 US6614914
 US6817530
 US20020325434