Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2032359

EP2032359 - FLEXIBLE HOSE WITH NON-PHTHALATE PLASTICIZERS ADDITIVES FOR TRANSPORTING FOOD LIQUIDS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  19.08.2011
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip02.12.2016New entry: Date of receipt of statement of grounds of an appeal 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
FITT S.p.A
Via Piave 8
36066 Sandrigo (Vicenza) / IT
[N/P]
Former [2009/11]For all designated states
FITT SPA
Via Piave 8
36066 Sandrigo (Vicenza) / IT
Inventor(s)01 / MEZZALIRA, Rinaldo
Via Guarniere, 24
I-36066 Ancignano di Sandrigo / IT
 [2009/11]
Representative(s)Autuori, Angelo , et al
Eureka IP Consulting
Via Monte Cengio, 32
36100 Vicenza / IT
[N/P]
Former [2011/29]Autuori, Angelo , et al
EUREKA IP Consulting Borgo Santa Lucia, 31
36100 Vicenza / IT
Former [2010/29]Maroscia, Antonio , et al
Contrà Porti, 21
36100 Vicenza / IT
Former [2009/13]Pajola, Stefano , et al
Maroscia & Associati S.r.l Contrà Porti, 21
36100 Vicenza / IT
Former [2009/11]Pajola, Stefano
Maroscia & Associati Srl Contrà S. Caterina, 29
36100 Vicenza / IT
Application number, filing date07815095.013.06.2007
[2009/11]
WO2007IB52231
Priority number, dateIT2006VI0018013.06.2006         Original published format: IT VI20060180
[2009/11]
Filing languageIT
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2007144831
Date:21.12.2007
Language:IT
[2007/51]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2032359
Date:11.03.2009
Language:EN
[2009/11]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2032359
Date:21.09.2011
Language:EN
[2011/38]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP08.05.2008
ClassificationInternational:B32B27/22, B32B1/08
[2009/11]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/11]
TitleGerman:SCHLAUCH MIT PHTALATFREIEN WEICHMACHERZUSÄTZEN ZUM TRANSPORT VON FLÜSSIGNAHRUNGSMITTELN[2011/20]
English:FLEXIBLE HOSE WITH NON-PHTHALATE PLASTICIZERS ADDITIVES FOR TRANSPORTING FOOD LIQUIDS[2009/11]
French:TUYAU SOUPLE COMPRENANT DES ADDITIFS PLASTIFIANTS NON PHTALATES POUR LE TRANSPORT DE LIQUIDES ALIMENTAIRES[2009/11]
Former [2009/11]SCHLAUCH MIT PHTALATFREIEN WEICHMACHERZUSÄTZEN ZUR TRANSPORT VON FLÜSSIGNAHRUNGSMITTELN
Entry into regional phase13.06.2007Translation filed 
12.01.2009National basic fee paid 
12.01.2009Designation fee(s) paid 
12.01.2009Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure23.05.2008Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
12.01.2009Examination requested  [2009/14]
16.02.2009Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
01.02.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
09.06.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.12.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
10.01.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.06.2011Communication of intention to grant the patent
26.07.2011Fee for grant paid
26.07.2011Fee for publishing/printing paid
12.08.2015Observations by third parties
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  01.02.2010
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  28.03.2012  26.06.2012  ADMISSIBLE
BASF SE
67058 Ludwigshafen / DE
Opponent's representative
BASF IP Association, et al
BASF SE
G-FLP-C006
67056 Ludwigshafen / DE
 02  05.06.2012  20.06.2012  ADMISSIBLE
Evonik Operations GmbH
Rellinghauserstrasse 1-11
45128 Essen / DE
 03  19.06.2012  27.06.2012  ADMISSIBLE
REHAU AG + Co
Rheniumhaus
95111 Rehau / DE
 04  20.06.2012  28.06.2012  ADMISSIBLE
Lynddahl Plast A/S
Industrivej 42
6760 Ribe / DK
Opponent's representative
Budde Schou A/S, et al
Hausergade 3
1128 Copenhagen K / DK
 05  21.06.2012  12.02.2013  ADMISSIBLE
Meister Plast GmbH
Friedrich-Ebert-Str. 75
58454 Witten / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2016/15]
Opponent(s)01  28.03.2012  26.06.2012  ADMISSIBLE
BASF SE
67058 Ludwigshafen / DE
Opponent's representative
BASF IP Association, et al
BASF SE
ZRX-C6
67056 Ludwigshafen / DE
 02  05.06.2012  20.06.2012  ADMISSIBLE
Evonik Degussa GmbH
Rellinghauserstrasse 1-11
45128 Essen / DE
 03  19.06.2012  27.06.2012  ADMISSIBLE
REHAU AG + Co
Rheniumhaus
95111 Rehau / DE
 04  20.06.2012  28.06.2012  ADMISSIBLE
Lynddahl Plast A/S
Industrivej 42
6760 Ribe / DK
Opponent's representative
Budde Schou A/S, et al
Hausergade 3
1128 Copenhagen K / DK
 05  21.06.2012  12.02.2013  ADMISSIBLE
Meister Plast GmbH
Friedrich-Ebert-Str. 75
58454 Witten / DE
Former [2014/25]
Opponent(s)01  28.03.2012  26.06.2012  ADMISSIBLE
BASF SE
67058 Ludwigshafen / DE
Opponent's representative
Muschler, Erwin Friedrich, et al
BASF SE Global Intellectual Property GVX - C6
67056 Ludwigshafen / DE
 02  05.06.2012  20.06.2012  ADMISSIBLE
Evonik Degussa GmbH
Rellinghauserstrasse 1-11
45128 Essen / DE
 03  19.06.2012  27.06.2012  ADMISSIBLE
REHAU AG + Co
Rheniumhaus
95111 Rehau / DE
 04  20.06.2012  28.06.2012  ADMISSIBLE
Lynddahl Plast A/S
Industrivej 42
6760 Ribe / DK
Opponent's representative
Budde Schou A/S, et al
Hausergade 3
1128 Copenhagen K / DK
 05  21.06.2012  12.02.2013  ADMISSIBLE
Meister Plast GmbH
Friedrich-Ebert-Str. 75
58454 Witten / DE
Former [2014/21]
Opponent(s)01  28.03.2012  26.06.2012  ADMISSIBLE
BASF SE
67058 Ludwigshafen / DE
Opponent's representative
Muschler, Erwin Friedrich, et al
BASF SE Global Intellectual Property GVX - C6
67056 Ludwigshafen / DE
 02  05.06.2012  20.06.2012  ADMISSIBLE
Evonik Degussa GmbH
Rellinghauserstrasse 1-11
45128 Essen / DE
 03  19.06.2012  27.06.2012  ADMISSIBLE
REHAU AG + Co
Rheniumhaus
95111 Rehau / DE
 04  20.06.2012  28.06.2012  ADMISSIBLE
Lynddahl Plast A/S
Industrivej 42
6760 Ribe / DK
Opponent's representative
Nielsen, Henrik Sten, et al
Budde Schou A/S
Hausergade 3
1128 Copenhagen K / DK
 05  21.06.2012  12.02.2013  ADMISSIBLE
Meister Plast GmbH
Friedrich-Ebert-Str. 75
58454 Witten / DE
Former [2014/08]
Opponent(s)01  28.03.2012  26.06.2012  ADMISSIBLE
BASF SE
67058 Ludwigshafen / DE
Opponent's representative
Muschler, Erwin Friedrich, et al
BASF SE Global Intellectual Property GVX - C6
67056 Ludwigshafen / DE
 02  05.06.2012  20.06.2012  ADMISSIBLE
Evonik Degussa GmbH
Rellinghauserstrasse 1-11
45128 Essen / DE
 03  19.06.2012  27.06.2012  ADMISSIBLE
REHAU AG + Co
Rheniumhaus
95111 Rehau / DE
 04  20.06.2012  28.06.2012  ADMISSIBLE
Lynddahl Plast A/S
Industrivej 42
6760 Ribe / DK
Opponent's representative
Nielsen, Henrik Sten, et al
Budde Schou A/S
Hausergade 3
1128 Copenhagen K / DK
 05  21.06.2012  12.02.2013  ADMISSIBLE
Meister Plast GmbH
Friedrich-Ebert-Str. 75
58454 Witten / DE
Opponent's representative
Zapf, Christoph, et al
Patentanwälte Dr. Solf und Zapf Postfach 13 01 13
42028 Wuppertal / DE
Former [2012/31]
Opponent(s)01  28.03.2012  26.06.2012  ADMISSIBLE
BASF SE
67058 Ludwigshafen / DE
Opponent's representative
Muschler, Erwin Friedrich, et al
BASF SE Global Intellectual Property GVX - C6
67056 Ludwigshafen / DE
 02  05.06.2012  20.06.2012  ADMISSIBLE
Evonik Oxeno GmbH
Paul-Baumann-Strasse 1
45772 Marl / DE
 03  19.06.2012  27.06.2012  ADMISSIBLE
REHAU AG + Co
Rheniumhaus
95111 Rehau / DE
 04  20.06.2012  28.06.2012  ADMISSIBLE
Lynddahl Plast A/S
Industrivej 42
6760 Ribe / DK
Opponent's representative
Nielsen, Henrik Sten, et al
Budde Schou A/S Vester Søgade 10
1601 Copenhagen V / DK
 05  21.06.2012   
Meister Plast GmbH
Friedrich-Ebert-Str. 75
58454 Witten / DE
Opponent's representative
Zapf, Christoph, et al
Patentanwälte Dr. Solf und Zapf Postfach 13 01 13
42028 Wuppertal / DE
Former [2012/30]
Opponent(s)01  28.03.2012   
BASF SE
67058 Ludwigshafen / DE
Opponent's representative
Muschler, Erwin Friedrich, et al
BASF SE Global Intellectual Property GVX - C6
67056 Ludwigshafen / DE
 02  05.06.2012  20.06.2012  ADMISSIBLE
Evonik Oxeno GmbH
Paul-Baumann-Strasse 1
45772 Marl / DE
 03  19.06.2012   
REHAU AG + Co
Rheniumhaus
95111 Rehau / DE
Former [2012/28]
Opponent(s)01  28.03.2012   
BASF SE
67058 Ludwigshafen / DE
Opponent's representative
Muschler, Erwin Friedrich, et al
BASF SE Global Intellectual Property GVX - C6
67056 Ludwigshafen / DE
 02  05.06.2012   
Evonik Oxeno GmbH
Paul-Baumann-Strasse 1
45772 Marl / DE
Former [2012/18]
Opponent(s)01  28.03.2012    ADMISSIBLE
BASF SE
67058 Ludwigshafen / DE
Opponent's representative
Muschler, Erwin Friedrich
BASF SE Global Intellectual Property GVX - C6
67056 Ludwigshafen / DE
30.07.2012Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
11.02.2013Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
22.06.2016Date of oral proceedings
22.07.2016Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
22.07.2016Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition27.09.2016Appeal received No.  T2219/16
01.12.2016Statement of grounds filed
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.06.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
24.06.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
22.06.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU13.06.2007
AT21.09.2011
BE21.09.2011
CY21.09.2011
CZ21.09.2011
DK21.09.2011
EE21.09.2011
FI21.09.2011
LT21.09.2011
LV21.09.2011
MT21.09.2011
NL21.09.2011
PL21.09.2011
RO21.09.2011
SE21.09.2011
SI21.09.2011
SK21.09.2011
TR21.09.2011
BG21.12.2011
GR22.12.2011
ES01.01.2012
IS21.01.2012
PT23.01.2012
IE13.06.2012
LU13.06.2012
CH30.06.2012
LI30.06.2012
MC30.06.2012
[2014/34]
Former [2014/27]AT21.09.2011
BE21.09.2011
CY21.09.2011
CZ21.09.2011
DK21.09.2011
EE21.09.2011
FI21.09.2011
LT21.09.2011
LV21.09.2011
MT21.09.2011
NL21.09.2011
PL21.09.2011
RO21.09.2011
SE21.09.2011
SI21.09.2011
SK21.09.2011
TR21.09.2011
BG21.12.2011
GR22.12.2011
ES01.01.2012
IS21.01.2012
PT23.01.2012
IE13.06.2012
LU13.06.2012
CH30.06.2012
LI30.06.2012
MC30.06.2012
Former [2014/21]AT21.09.2011
BE21.09.2011
CY21.09.2011
CZ21.09.2011
DK21.09.2011
EE21.09.2011
FI21.09.2011
LT21.09.2011
LV21.09.2011
MT21.09.2011
NL21.09.2011
PL21.09.2011
RO21.09.2011
SE21.09.2011
SI21.09.2011
SK21.09.2011
TR21.09.2011
BG21.12.2011
GR22.12.2011
ES01.01.2012
IS21.01.2012
PT23.01.2012
IE13.06.2012
CH30.06.2012
LI30.06.2012
MC30.06.2012
Former [2013/35]AT21.09.2011
BE21.09.2011
CY21.09.2011
CZ21.09.2011
DK21.09.2011
EE21.09.2011
FI21.09.2011
LT21.09.2011
LV21.09.2011
MT21.09.2011
NL21.09.2011
PL21.09.2011
RO21.09.2011
SE21.09.2011
SI21.09.2011
SK21.09.2011
BG21.12.2011
GR22.12.2011
ES01.01.2012
IS21.01.2012
PT23.01.2012
IE13.06.2012
CH30.06.2012
LI30.06.2012
MC30.06.2012
Former [2013/29]AT21.09.2011
BE21.09.2011
CY21.09.2011
CZ21.09.2011
DK21.09.2011
EE21.09.2011
FI21.09.2011
LT21.09.2011
LV21.09.2011
NL21.09.2011
PL21.09.2011
RO21.09.2011
SE21.09.2011
SI21.09.2011
SK21.09.2011
BG21.12.2011
GR22.12.2011
ES01.01.2012
IS21.01.2012
PT23.01.2012
IE13.06.2012
CH30.06.2012
LI30.06.2012
MC30.06.2012
Former [2012/18]AT21.09.2011
BE21.09.2011
CY21.09.2011
FI21.09.2011
LT21.09.2011
LV21.09.2011
SE21.09.2011
SI21.09.2011
GR22.12.2011
Former [2012/12]AT21.09.2011
CY21.09.2011
FI21.09.2011
LT21.09.2011
LV21.09.2011
SE21.09.2011
SI21.09.2011
GR22.12.2011
Cited inInternational search[X]JPH08289928  (TOYO BOSEKI) [X] 1-23 * the whole document *;
 [X]JP2003070902  (TOYO BOSEKI, et al) [X] 1-23 * the whole document *;
 [X]DE20312108U  (REHAU AG & CO [DE]) [X] 1-23 * page 1, line 1 - line 6 * * page 2, line 17 - line 32 * * page 3, line 24 - page 4, line 5 * * page 4, line 15 - line 21 * * claims 1-3,6 *;
 [X]DE20311708U  (REHAU AG & CO [DE]) [X] 1-23 * page 1, line 1 - line 6 * * page 2, line 7 - line 13 * * page 4, line 1 - line 25 * * page 4, line 30 - line 33 * * claims 1-6 *
by applicantWO02092686
 EP0623776
 EP0960297
OppositionUS3755224
 US2005054750
    - Anna Mai, "Test Gartenschläuche. Das Schlaucht", Ökotest, (20050800), no. 8, pages 124 - 127,170, XP055285071
    - MG, "Weiches PVC ohne Phthalate", Additive Masterbatches, (20150410), no. 27, XP055285079