Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2218181

EP2218181 - LOW COST SYSTEM CONCEPT FOR GESTURE LIGHT CONTROL [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  20.06.2014
Database last updated on 24.08.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip20.06.2014Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 23.07.2014  [2014/30]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
LITE-ON IT Corporation
14F., No. 392 Rueiguang Road Neihu Taipei City
T'ai pei 114 / TW
[2010/33]
Inventor(s)01 / VAN ENDERT, Tony, Petrus
14F, No.392 Ruey Kuang Rd. Neihu Taipei
Taiwan / CN
 [2010/33]
Representative(s)Lang, Christian , et al
LangPatent Anwaltskanzlei
Ingolstädter Straße 5
80807 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2012/45]Lang, Christian , et al
LangPatent
Anwaltskanzlei
Rosenheimer Strasse 139
81671 München / DE
Former [2010/33]Lang, Christian , et al
IP Law Firm LangRaible Herzog-Wilhelm-Straße 22
80331 München / DE
Application number, filing date07816670.926.10.2007
[2010/33]
WO2007CN03057
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2009052660
Date:30.04.2009
Language:EN
[2009/18]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2218181
Date:18.08.2010
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.04.2009
[2010/33]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CN30.04.2009
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.02.2012
ClassificationInternational:H03K17/94, H05B37/02, H05B33/08
[2012/12]
Former International [2010/33]H03K17/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2010/33]
TitleGerman:KOSTENGÜNSTIGES SYSTEMKONZEPT ZUR GESTIK-LICHTSTEUERUNG[2010/33]
English:LOW COST SYSTEM CONCEPT FOR GESTURE LIGHT CONTROL[2010/33]
French:CONCEPT DE SYSTÈME DE FAIBLES COÛTS POUR UNE COMMANDE GESTUELLE DE L'ÉCLAIRAGE[2010/33]
Entry into regional phase19.05.2010National basic fee paid 
19.05.2010Search fee paid 
19.05.2010Designation fee(s) paid 
19.05.2010Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure19.05.2010Examination requested  [2010/33]
10.09.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
02.10.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
13.02.2014Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2014/30]
12.03.2014Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2014/30]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  02.10.2013
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.05.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
29.10.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
28.10.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
29.08.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
05.08.2013Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[I]WO2006056814  (MATHMOS LTD [GB]; WALKER NIGEL [GB]) [I] 1-6 * abstract * * page 1, line 28 - page 4, line 9 * * page 6, line 26 - page 19, line 17 * * figures 1-6 *;
 [I]WO2004039631  (REIME GERD [DE]) [I] 1-6 * the whole document *;
 [A]DE10242890  (UNIV MUENCHEN TECH [DE]) [A] 1-6 * the whole document *;
 [A]US6263260  (BODMER JAMES [CH] ET AL) [A] 1-6 * the whole document *
International search[A]JP2007265702  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS LTD);
 [A]JP2002190398  (TOSHIBA LIGHTECH KK);
 [A]JPH08286287  (CANON KK);
 [A]CN1874640  (UNIV ZHEJIANG)