Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2089086

EP2089086 - Respiratory tube connecting device [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2009/34]RESPIRATORY TUBE CONNECTING DEVICE
[2014/01]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  13.03.2015
Database last updated on 19.07.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip26.08.2016Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): ES
published on 28.09.2016  [2016/39]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Dräger Medical GmbH
Moislinger Allee 53 - 55
23558 Lübeck / DE
[2014/19]
Former [2010/51]For all designated states
Dräger Medical GmbH
Moislinger Allee 53 - 55
23558 Lübeck / DE
Former [2009/34]For all designated states
Dräger Medical AG & Co. KG
Moislinger Allee 53-55
23558 Lübeck / DE
Inventor(s)01 / TAPPEHORN, Ludger
Rosa - Luxemburg - Str. 15
23560 Lübeck / DE
02 / WOTHA, Gerd
Mittelstr. 2
23626 Warnsdorf / DE
03 / SCHERMEIER, Olaf
Erich-Mühsam-Weg 15
23560 Lübeck / DE
04 / ABRAHAM, Klaus
Johannes-Stelling-Str.
23560 Lübeck / DE
 [2009/36]
Former [2009/34]01 / TAPPEHORN, Ludger
Schulweg 5
23617 Stockelsdorf / DE
02 / WOTHA, Gerd
Mittelstr. 2
23626 Warnsdorf / DE
03 / SCHERMEIER, Olaf
Erich-Mühsam-Weg 15
23560 Lübeck / DE
04 / ABRAHAM, Klaus
Johannes-Stelling-Str.
23560 Lübeck / DE
Representative(s)Uexküll & Stolberg
Partnerschaft von
Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB
Beselerstraße 4
22607 Hamburg / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/19]UEXKÜLL & STOLBERG
Patentanwälte
Beselerstrasse 4
22607 Hamburg / DE
Former [2010/49]UEXKÜLL & STOLBERG
Patentanwälte Beselerstrasse 4
22607 Hamburg / DE
Former [2009/34]Strauss, Steffen
Drägerwerk AG & Co. KGaA Corporate Patent Department Moislinger Allee 53-55
23542 Lübeck / DE
Application number, filing date07817766.403.11.2007
[2009/34]
WO2007DE01975
Priority number, dateDE2006105385714.11.2006         Original published format: DE102006053857
[2009/34]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2008058506
Date:22.05.2008
Language:DE
[2008/21]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2089086
Date:19.08.2009
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.05.2008
[2009/34]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2089086
Date:07.05.2014
Language:DE
[2014/19]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP14.08.2008
ClassificationInternational:A61M16/08
[2009/34]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/37]
Former [2009/34]DE,  FR,  GB 
TitleGerman:Atemschlauch-Anschlussvorrichtung[2014/01]
English:Respiratory tube connecting device[2014/01]
French:Dispositif de raccordement de flexible respiratoire[2014/01]
Former [2009/34]ATEMSCHLAUCH-ANSCHLUSSVORRICHTUNG
Former [2009/34]RESPIRATORY TUBE CONNECTING DEVICE
Former [2009/34]DISPOSITIF DE RACCORDEMENT DE FLEXIBLE RESPIRATOIRE
Entry into regional phase04.05.2009National basic fee paid 
04.05.2009Designation fee(s) paid 
04.05.2009Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure04.05.2009Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
04.05.2009Examination requested  [2009/34]
10.10.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.02.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.05.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
21.11.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.12.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.03.2014Fee for grant paid
24.03.2014Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP13189588.0  / EP2711041
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  10.10.2011
Opposition(s)10.02.2015No opposition filed within time limit [2015/16]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.11.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
12.11.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
14.11.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
13.11.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
28.11.2013Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU03.11.2007
BG07.05.2014
CY07.05.2014
CZ07.05.2014
DK07.05.2014
EE07.05.2014
ES07.05.2014
FI07.05.2014
IT07.05.2014
LT07.05.2014
LV07.05.2014
MC07.05.2014
MT07.05.2014
NL07.05.2014
PL07.05.2014
PT07.05.2014
RO07.05.2014
SE07.05.2014
SI07.05.2014
SK07.05.2014
TR07.05.2014
GR08.08.2014
IS07.09.2014
AT03.11.2014
IE03.11.2014
LU03.11.2014
BE30.11.2014
CH30.11.2014
LI30.11.2014
[2016/39]
Former [2016/33]HU03.11.2007
BG07.05.2014
CY07.05.2014
CZ07.05.2014
DK07.05.2014
EE07.05.2014
FI07.05.2014
IT07.05.2014
LT07.05.2014
LV07.05.2014
MC07.05.2014
MT07.05.2014
NL07.05.2014
PL07.05.2014
PT07.05.2014
RO07.05.2014
SE07.05.2014
SI07.05.2014
SK07.05.2014
TR07.05.2014
GR08.08.2014
IS07.09.2014
AT03.11.2014
IE03.11.2014
LU03.11.2014
BE30.11.2014
CH30.11.2014
LI30.11.2014
Former [2016/32]HU03.11.2007
BG07.05.2014
CY07.05.2014
CZ07.05.2014
DK07.05.2014
EE07.05.2014
FI07.05.2014
IT07.05.2014
LT07.05.2014
LV07.05.2014
MC07.05.2014
NL07.05.2014
PL07.05.2014
PT07.05.2014
RO07.05.2014
SE07.05.2014
SI07.05.2014
SK07.05.2014
TR07.05.2014
GR08.08.2014
IS07.09.2014
AT03.11.2014
IE03.11.2014
LU03.11.2014
BE30.11.2014
CH30.11.2014
LI30.11.2014
Former [2016/30]BG07.05.2014
CY07.05.2014
CZ07.05.2014
DK07.05.2014
EE07.05.2014
FI07.05.2014
IT07.05.2014
LT07.05.2014
LV07.05.2014
MC07.05.2014
NL07.05.2014
PL07.05.2014
PT07.05.2014
RO07.05.2014
SE07.05.2014
SI07.05.2014
SK07.05.2014
GR08.08.2014
IS07.09.2014
AT03.11.2014
IE03.11.2014
LU03.11.2014
BE30.11.2014
CH30.11.2014
LI30.11.2014
Former [2016/25]BG07.05.2014
CY07.05.2014
CZ07.05.2014
DK07.05.2014
EE07.05.2014
FI07.05.2014
IT07.05.2014
LT07.05.2014
LV07.05.2014
MC07.05.2014
NL07.05.2014
PL07.05.2014
RO07.05.2014
SE07.05.2014
SI07.05.2014
SK07.05.2014
GR08.08.2014
IS07.09.2014
AT03.11.2014
IE03.11.2014
LU03.11.2014
BE30.11.2014
CH30.11.2014
LI30.11.2014
Former [2016/12]CY07.05.2014
CZ07.05.2014
DK07.05.2014
EE07.05.2014
FI07.05.2014
IT07.05.2014
LT07.05.2014
LV07.05.2014
MC07.05.2014
NL07.05.2014
PL07.05.2014
RO07.05.2014
SE07.05.2014
SI07.05.2014
SK07.05.2014
GR08.08.2014
IS07.09.2014
AT03.11.2014
IE03.11.2014
LU03.11.2014
BE30.11.2014
CH30.11.2014
LI30.11.2014
Former [2015/46]CY07.05.2014
CZ07.05.2014
DK07.05.2014
EE07.05.2014
FI07.05.2014
IT07.05.2014
LT07.05.2014
LV07.05.2014
MC07.05.2014
NL07.05.2014
PL07.05.2014
RO07.05.2014
SE07.05.2014
SI07.05.2014
SK07.05.2014
GR08.08.2014
IS07.09.2014
IE03.11.2014
LU03.11.2014
BE30.11.2014
CH30.11.2014
LI30.11.2014
Former [2015/36]CY07.05.2014
CZ07.05.2014
DK07.05.2014
EE07.05.2014
FI07.05.2014
IT07.05.2014
LT07.05.2014
LV07.05.2014
MC07.05.2014
NL07.05.2014
PL07.05.2014
RO07.05.2014
SE07.05.2014
SI07.05.2014
SK07.05.2014
GR08.08.2014
IS07.09.2014
LU03.11.2014
BE30.11.2014
CH30.11.2014
LI30.11.2014
Former [2015/33]CY07.05.2014
CZ07.05.2014
DK07.05.2014
EE07.05.2014
FI07.05.2014
IT07.05.2014
LT07.05.2014
LV07.05.2014
MC07.05.2014
NL07.05.2014
PL07.05.2014
RO07.05.2014
SE07.05.2014
SK07.05.2014
GR08.08.2014
IS07.09.2014
LU03.11.2014
BE30.11.2014
CH30.11.2014
LI30.11.2014
Former [2015/32]CY07.05.2014
CZ07.05.2014
DK07.05.2014
EE07.05.2014
FI07.05.2014
IT07.05.2014
LT07.05.2014
LV07.05.2014
MC07.05.2014
NL07.05.2014
PL07.05.2014
RO07.05.2014
SE07.05.2014
SK07.05.2014
GR08.08.2014
IS07.09.2014
LU03.11.2014
BE30.11.2014
Former [2015/30]CY07.05.2014
CZ07.05.2014
DK07.05.2014
EE07.05.2014
FI07.05.2014
IT07.05.2014
LT07.05.2014
LV07.05.2014
NL07.05.2014
PL07.05.2014
RO07.05.2014
SE07.05.2014
SK07.05.2014
GR08.08.2014
IS07.09.2014
LU03.11.2014
BE30.11.2014
Former [2015/22]CY07.05.2014
CZ07.05.2014
DK07.05.2014
EE07.05.2014
FI07.05.2014
IT07.05.2014
LT07.05.2014
LV07.05.2014
NL07.05.2014
PL07.05.2014
RO07.05.2014
SE07.05.2014
SK07.05.2014
GR08.08.2014
IS07.09.2014
Former [2015/12]CY07.05.2014
CZ07.05.2014
DK07.05.2014
EE07.05.2014
FI07.05.2014
LT07.05.2014
LV07.05.2014
NL07.05.2014
PL07.05.2014
RO07.05.2014
SE07.05.2014
SK07.05.2014
GR08.08.2014
IS07.09.2014
Former [2015/11]CY07.05.2014
CZ07.05.2014
DK07.05.2014
EE07.05.2014
FI07.05.2014
LT07.05.2014
LV07.05.2014
PL07.05.2014
RO07.05.2014
SE07.05.2014
SK07.05.2014
GR08.08.2014
IS07.09.2014
Former [2015/10]CY07.05.2014
CZ07.05.2014
DK07.05.2014
EE07.05.2014
FI07.05.2014
LT07.05.2014
LV07.05.2014
PL07.05.2014
SE07.05.2014
SK07.05.2014
GR08.08.2014
IS07.09.2014
Former [2015/08]CY07.05.2014
DK07.05.2014
FI07.05.2014
LT07.05.2014
LV07.05.2014
PL07.05.2014
SE07.05.2014
GR08.08.2014
IS07.09.2014
Former [2014/50]CY07.05.2014
FI07.05.2014
LT07.05.2014
LV07.05.2014
PL07.05.2014
SE07.05.2014
GR08.08.2014
IS07.09.2014
Former [2014/49]CY07.05.2014
FI07.05.2014
LT07.05.2014
IS07.09.2014
Former [2014/48]CY07.05.2014
LT07.05.2014
Former [2014/47]CY07.05.2014
Cited inInternational search[XA]EP1520599  (FISHER & PAYKEL HEALTHCARE LTD [NZ]) [X] 1,2,5-8 * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0043] * [A] 3,4;
 [XA]DE102005001247  (MAP MEDIZIN TECHNOLOGIE GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-5,8 * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0047]; figures 1a,2a * [A] 6,7;
 [X]EP1138340  (MAP GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,2,4,5,8 * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0027] *
Examination US6484724
by applicantEP1520599
 DE102005001247
 EP1138340
 US6484724