EP2068838 - PHARMACEUTICAL FORMULATIONS COMPRISING CLOPIDOGREL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.02.2013 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Acino Pharma AG Birsweg 2 4253 Liesberg / CH | [2012/09] |
Former [2009/25] | For all designated states Acino Pharma AG Erlenstrasse 1 4058 Basel / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
REY, Hélène 1, Impasse des Peupliers FR-68128 Rosenau / FR | 02 /
FISCHER, Marc Blumenstrasse 19 CH-4106 Therwil / CH | 03 /
SCHEER, Mathias Mozartstr. 9 79664 Wehr / DE | [2009/25] | Representative(s) | Henkel & Partner mbB Patentanwaltskanzlei, Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Erika-Mann Strasse 23 80636 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/44] | Henkel, Breuer & Partner Patentanwälte Erika-Mann Strasse 23 80636 München / DE | ||
Former [2011/19] | Breuer, Markus Breuer & Müller Partnerschaft Patentanwälte Heimeranstrasse 35 80339 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/31] | Braun, André jr., et al Braunpat Braun Eder AG Reussstrasse 22 Postfach 4015 Basel / CH | ||
Former [2009/25] | Braun, André jr., et al Braunpat Braun Eder AG Reussstrasse 22 4054 Basel / CH | Application number, filing date | 07818184.9 | 17.09.2007 | [2009/25] | WO2007EP08070 | Priority number, date | EP20060019429 | 16.09.2006 Original published format: EP 06019429 | [2009/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008031623 | Date: | 20.03.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2068838 | Date: | 17.06.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.03.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2068838 | Date: | 11.04.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.03.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/16, A61K9/20, A61K31/60 | [2009/25] | CPC: |
A61K9/1641 (EP,US);
A61K9/1617 (EP,US);
A61K9/1694 (EP,US);
A61K9/2077 (EP,US);
A61P9/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/25] | Title | German: | PHARMAZEUTISCHE FORMULIERUNGEN MIT CLOPIDOGREL | [2009/25] | English: | PHARMACEUTICAL FORMULATIONS COMPRISING CLOPIDOGREL | [2009/25] | French: | FORMULATIONS PHARMACEUTIQUES CONTENANT DU CLOPIDOGREL | [2009/25] | Entry into regional phase | 16.04.2009 | National basic fee paid | 16.04.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.04.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.04.2009 | Examination requested [2009/25] | 03.08.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.10.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.05.2010 | Observations by third parties | 24.11.2010 | Observations by third parties | 12.09.2011 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 13.10.2011 | 13.10.2011 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 24.10.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.02.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 23.02.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP11003617.5 / EP2359810 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.08.2009 | Opposition(s) | 14.01.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 17.09.2007 | CY | 11.04.2012 | CZ | 11.04.2012 | EE | 11.04.2012 | LT | 11.04.2012 | LV | 11.04.2012 | MT | 11.04.2012 | RO | 11.04.2012 | SI | 11.04.2012 | SK | 11.04.2012 | TR | 11.04.2012 | BG | 11.07.2012 | IS | 11.08.2012 | AT | 17.09.2012 | IE | 17.09.2012 | IT | 17.09.2012 | LU | 17.09.2012 | PL | 17.09.2012 | ES | 18.09.2012 | BE | 30.09.2012 | MC | 30.09.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | CY | 11.04.2012 | |
CZ | 11.04.2012 | ||
EE | 11.04.2012 | ||
LT | 11.04.2012 | ||
LV | 11.04.2012 | ||
MT | 11.04.2012 | ||
RO | 11.04.2012 | ||
SI | 11.04.2012 | ||
SK | 11.04.2012 | ||
TR | 11.04.2012 | ||
BG | 11.07.2012 | ||
IS | 11.08.2012 | ||
AT | 17.09.2012 | ||
IE | 17.09.2012 | ||
IT | 17.09.2012 | ||
LU | 17.09.2012 | ||
PL | 17.09.2012 | ||
ES | 18.09.2012 | ||
BE | 30.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
Former [2014/26] | CY | 11.04.2012 | |
CZ | 11.04.2012 | ||
EE | 11.04.2012 | ||
LT | 11.04.2012 | ||
LV | 11.04.2012 | ||
MT | 11.04.2012 | ||
RO | 11.04.2012 | ||
SI | 11.04.2012 | ||
SK | 11.04.2012 | ||
TR | 11.04.2012 | ||
BG | 11.07.2012 | ||
IS | 11.08.2012 | ||
AT | 17.09.2012 | ||
IE | 17.09.2012 | ||
IT | 17.09.2012 | ||
PL | 17.09.2012 | ||
ES | 18.09.2012 | ||
BE | 30.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | CY | 11.04.2012 | |
CZ | 11.04.2012 | ||
EE | 11.04.2012 | ||
LT | 11.04.2012 | ||
LV | 11.04.2012 | ||
MT | 11.04.2012 | ||
RO | 11.04.2012 | ||
SI | 11.04.2012 | ||
SK | 11.04.2012 | ||
TR | 11.04.2012 | ||
BG | 11.07.2012 | ||
IS | 11.08.2012 | ||
AT | 17.09.2012 | ||
IE | 17.09.2012 | ||
IT | 17.09.2012 | ||
PL | 17.09.2012 | ||
BE | 30.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
Former [2014/09] | CY | 11.04.2012 | |
CZ | 11.04.2012 | ||
EE | 11.04.2012 | ||
LT | 11.04.2012 | ||
LV | 11.04.2012 | ||
MT | 11.04.2012 | ||
RO | 11.04.2012 | ||
SI | 11.04.2012 | ||
SK | 11.04.2012 | ||
BG | 11.07.2012 | ||
IS | 11.08.2012 | ||
AT | 17.09.2012 | ||
IE | 17.09.2012 | ||
IT | 17.09.2012 | ||
PL | 17.09.2012 | ||
BE | 30.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/51] | CY | 11.04.2012 | |
CZ | 11.04.2012 | ||
EE | 11.04.2012 | ||
LT | 11.04.2012 | ||
LV | 11.04.2012 | ||
MT | 11.04.2012 | ||
RO | 11.04.2012 | ||
SI | 11.04.2012 | ||
SK | 11.04.2012 | ||
BG | 11.07.2012 | ||
IS | 11.08.2012 | ||
IE | 17.09.2012 | ||
IT | 17.09.2012 | ||
PL | 17.09.2012 | ||
BE | 30.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/50] | CY | 11.04.2012 | |
CZ | 11.04.2012 | ||
EE | 11.04.2012 | ||
LT | 11.04.2012 | ||
LV | 11.04.2012 | ||
RO | 11.04.2012 | ||
SI | 11.04.2012 | ||
SK | 11.04.2012 | ||
BG | 11.07.2012 | ||
IS | 11.08.2012 | ||
IE | 17.09.2012 | ||
IT | 17.09.2012 | ||
PL | 17.09.2012 | ||
BE | 30.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/37] | CY | 11.04.2012 | |
CZ | 11.04.2012 | ||
EE | 11.04.2012 | ||
LT | 11.04.2012 | ||
LV | 11.04.2012 | ||
RO | 11.04.2012 | ||
SI | 11.04.2012 | ||
SK | 11.04.2012 | ||
BG | 11.07.2012 | ||
IS | 11.08.2012 | ||
IE | 17.09.2012 | ||
IT | 17.09.2012 | ||
BE | 30.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/34] | CY | 11.04.2012 | |
CZ | 11.04.2012 | ||
EE | 11.04.2012 | ||
LT | 11.04.2012 | ||
LV | 11.04.2012 | ||
RO | 11.04.2012 | ||
SI | 11.04.2012 | ||
SK | 11.04.2012 | ||
BG | 11.07.2012 | ||
IS | 11.08.2012 | ||
IE | 17.09.2012 | ||
BE | 30.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/33] | CY | 11.04.2012 | |
CZ | 11.04.2012 | ||
EE | 11.04.2012 | ||
LT | 11.04.2012 | ||
LV | 11.04.2012 | ||
RO | 11.04.2012 | ||
SI | 11.04.2012 | ||
SK | 11.04.2012 | ||
IS | 11.08.2012 | ||
IE | 17.09.2012 | ||
BE | 30.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/20] | CY | 11.04.2012 | |
CZ | 11.04.2012 | ||
EE | 11.04.2012 | ||
LT | 11.04.2012 | ||
LV | 11.04.2012 | ||
RO | 11.04.2012 | ||
SI | 11.04.2012 | ||
SK | 11.04.2012 | ||
IS | 11.08.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | CY | 11.04.2012 | |
CZ | 11.04.2012 | ||
EE | 11.04.2012 | ||
LT | 11.04.2012 | ||
LV | 11.04.2012 | ||
RO | 11.04.2012 | ||
SI | 11.04.2012 | ||
SK | 11.04.2012 | ||
IS | 11.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | CY | 11.04.2012 | |
EE | 11.04.2012 | ||
LT | 11.04.2012 | ||
LV | 11.04.2012 | ||
SI | 11.04.2012 | ||
IS | 11.08.2012 | ||
Former [2012/51] | CY | 11.04.2012 | |
LT | 11.04.2012 | ||
LV | 11.04.2012 | ||
SI | 11.04.2012 | ||
IS | 11.08.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | CY | 11.04.2012 | |
LT | 11.04.2012 | ||
LV | 11.04.2012 | ||
IS | 11.08.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | CY | 11.04.2012 | |
LT | 11.04.2012 | ||
IS | 11.08.2012 | ||
Former [2012/47] | LT | 11.04.2012 | Cited in | International search | [DY]US4847265 (BADORC ALAIN [FR], et al) [DY] 1-3* column 1, line 45 - line 50 *; | JPH0789875 [ ] (DAIICHI SEIYAKU CO); | [XY]FR2792836 (SANOFI SA [FR]) [X] 1,2,4-17 * page 2, line 5 - line 14 * * page 3, line 5 - line 19 * * examples 10,11 * * claim - * [Y] 1-17; | [XY]EP1161956 (DAIICHI SEIYAKU CO [JP]) [X] 1,2,6,8-17 * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0008] * * examples 3,4 * * claim - * [Y] 1-17; | [Y]WO2004072085 (HELM AG [DE], et al) [Y] 1-3 * example 4 *; | [XY] - MATSUMOTO, TAKAHIRO ET AL, "Pharmaceutical tablets prevented from delayed disintegration", CA, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, Database accession no. 123:17941, URL: STN, XP002421170 [X] 1,2,4-17 * abstract * [Y] 1-17 | Examination | EP1900358 | other | EP1900358 |