Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2086928

EP2086928 - PROCESS FOR UREA PRODUCTION AND RELATED PLANT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  25.06.2010
Database last updated on 10.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip04.09.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
04.09.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
CASALE SA
Via Giulio Pocobelli 6
6900 Lugano / CH
[2015/48]
Former [2009/33]For all designated states
Urea Casale S.A.
Via Guillo Pocobelli 6
6900 Lugano-Besso / CH
Inventor(s)01 / ZARDI, Federico
Via Lucino, 60
6932 Breganzona / CH
02 / STICCHI, Paolo
Via Tesserete, 19
6900 Massagno / CH
03 / BRUNENGO, Paolo
Via Ferri, 27
6900 Lugano / CH
 [2009/33]
Representative(s)Zardi, Marco , et al
M. Zardi & Co. SA
Via Pioda 6
6900 Lugano / CH
[N/P]
Former [2009/33]Zardi, Marco , et al
M. Zardi & Co. S.A. Via Pioda 6
6900 Lugano / CH
Application number, filing date07818804.209.10.2007
[2009/33]
WO2007EP08730
Priority number, dateEP2006002299104.11.2006         Original published format: EP 06022991
[2009/33]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2008052639
Date:08.05.2008
Language:EN
[2008/19]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2086928
Date:12.08.2009
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.05.2008
[2009/33]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2086928
Date:28.07.2010
Language:EN
[2010/30]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP08.05.2008
ClassificationInternational:C07C273/04
[2009/33]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/33]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND ANLAGE FÜR DIE HERSTELLUNG VON HARNSTOFF[2017/27]
English:PROCESS FOR UREA PRODUCTION AND RELATED PLANT[2009/33]
French:PROCÉDÉ ET INSTALLATION POUR LA PRODUCTION D'URÉE[2017/27]
Former [2009/33]VERFAHREN ZUR HARNSTOFFPRODUKTION UND DAMIT IN ZUSAMMENHANG STEHENDE ANLAGE
Former [2009/33]PROCÉDÉ DESTINÉ À PRODUIRE DE L'URÉE ET INSTALLATION ASSOCIÉE
Entry into regional phase03.06.2009National basic fee paid 
03.06.2009Designation fee(s) paid 
03.06.2009Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure26.05.2008Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
03.06.2009Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
03.06.2009Examination requested  [2009/33]
01.02.2010Communication of intention to grant the patent
01.04.2010Fee for grant paid
01.04.2010Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  28.04.2011  14.07.2011  ADMISSIBLE
Stamicarbon B.V.
Mercator 3
6135 KW Sittard / NL
Opponent's representative
V.O., et al
P.O. Box 87930
2508 DH Den Haag / NL
 [2015/48]
Former [2013/36]
Opponent(s)01  28.04.2011  14.07.2011  ADMISSIBLE
Stamicarbon B.V.
Mercator 3
6135 KW Sittard / NL
Opponent's representative
Jansen, Cornelis Marinus, et al
V.O.
Johan de Wittlaan 7
2517 JR Den Haag / NL
Former [2011/23]
Opponent(s)01  28.04.2011   
Stamicarbon B.V.
Mercator 2
6135KW Sittard / NL
Opponent's representative
Jansen, Cornelis Marinus, et al
VEREENIGDE Johan de Wittlaan 7
2517 JR Den Haag / NL
deletedDeletion: Legal effect of rejection of opposition [ N /P ]
19.07.2011Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
30.01.2012Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
03.12.2013Date of oral proceedings
28.01.2014Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
28.01.2014Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
21.04.2017Date of oral proceedings
30.06.2017Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
30.06.2017Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
Appeal following opposition31.08.2017Appeal received No.  T1887/17
10.11.2017Statement of grounds filed
28.08.2017Appeal received No.  T1887/17
07.11.2017Statement of grounds filed
01.04.2014Appeal received No.  T0807/14
02.06.2014Statement of grounds filed
14.01.2016Result of appeal procedure: continuation of opposition procedure
14.01.2016Date of oral proceedings
26.01.2016Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
26.11.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.10.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT28.07.2010
BE28.07.2010
CY28.07.2010
CZ28.07.2010
DK28.07.2010
EE28.07.2010
FI28.07.2010
IT28.07.2010
LT28.07.2010
LV28.07.2010
MT28.07.2010
RO28.07.2010
SE28.07.2010
SI28.07.2010
SK28.07.2010
TR28.07.2010
IE09.10.2010
LU09.10.2010
BG28.10.2010
GR29.10.2010
MC31.10.2010
ES08.11.2010
IS28.11.2010
PT29.11.2010
HU29.01.2011
GB09.10.2011
CH31.10.2011
LI31.10.2011
[2015/22]
Former [2011/29]AT28.07.2010
BE28.07.2010
CY28.07.2010
CZ28.07.2010
DK28.07.2010
EE28.07.2010
FI28.07.2010
IT28.07.2010
LT28.07.2010
LV28.07.2010
RO28.07.2010
SE28.07.2010
SI28.07.2010
SK28.07.2010
BG28.10.2010
GR29.10.2010
MC31.10.2010
ES08.11.2010
IS28.11.2010
PT29.11.2010
Former [2011/26]AT28.07.2010
BE28.07.2010
CY28.07.2010
CZ28.07.2010
DK28.07.2010
EE28.07.2010
FI28.07.2010
IT28.07.2010
LT28.07.2010
LV28.07.2010
RO28.07.2010
SE28.07.2010
SI28.07.2010
SK28.07.2010
BG28.10.2010
GR29.10.2010
MC31.10.2010
IS28.11.2010
PT29.11.2010
Cited inInternational search[X]US4864059  (FUJII HIDETSUGU [JP]) [X] 1-21 * column 7, line 27 - column 8, line 19; figure 1; claims 1-5 *;
 [X]EP1203765  (TOYO ENGINEERING CORP [JP], et al) [X] 1-21 * page 6, line 3 - line 26; figures 1,2; claims 1-11 *;
 [DA]NL8900152  (STAMICARBON) [DA] 1-21 * claims 1-6 *;
 [A]WO0196288  (UREA CASALE SA [CH], et al) [A] 1-21 * claims 1-5 *;
 [A]US5597454  (LEE JING M [US]) [A] 1-21 * claims 1-11 *;
 [DA]WO02090323  (DSM NV [NL], et al) [DA] 1-21 * claims 1-10 *;
 [A]EP0212744  (STAMICARBON [NL]) [A] 1-21 * claims 1-6 *;
 [A]GB1129787  (NORSK HYDRO ELEKTRISK) [A] 1-21 * claims 1-3 *;
 [PI]EP1719755  (UREA CASALE SA [CH]) [PI] 1-21 * claims 1-12 *