Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2094652

EP2094652 - INTEGRATED PROCESS FOR UREA AND MELAMINE PRODUCTION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  19.12.2016
Database last updated on 09.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip17.07.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
17.07.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
CASALE SA
Via Giulio Pocobelli 6
6900 Lugano / CH
[2016/22]
Former [2009/36]For all designated states
UREA CASALE S.A.
Via Giulio Pocobelli, 6
6900 Lugano-Besso / CH
Inventor(s)01 / ZARDI, Federico
Via Lucino, 60
6932 Breganzona / CH
02 / STICCHI, Paolo
Via Tesserete, 19
6900 Massagno / CH
03 / BRUNENGO, Paolo
Via Ferri, 27
6900 Lugano / CH
 [2009/36]
Representative(s)Zardi, Marco
M. Zardi & Co. SA
Via Pioda 6
6900 Lugano / CH
[N/P]
Former [2013/49]Zardi, Marco
M. Zardi & Co. S.A. Via Pioda 6
6900 Lugano / CH
Former [2009/36]Zardi, Marco
M. Zardi & Co. S.A. Via Pioda 6
6900 Lugano / CH
Application number, filing date07818806.709.10.2007
[2009/36]
WO2007EP08732
Priority number, dateEP2006002299004.11.2006         Original published format: EP 06022990
[2009/36]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2008052640
Date:08.05.2008
Language:EN
[2008/19]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2094652
Date:02.09.2009
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.05.2008
[2009/36]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2094652
Date:04.12.2013
Language:EN
[2013/49]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP08.05.2008
ClassificationInternational:B01J19/24, C07C273/16, C07D251/62, C07C273/12
[2017/01]
Former International [2009/36]C07C273/12
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/36]
TitleGerman:INTEGRIERTES VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON HARNSTOFF UND MELAMIN[2009/36]
English:INTEGRATED PROCESS FOR UREA AND MELAMINE PRODUCTION[2009/36]
French:PROCÉDÉ INTÉGRÉ DESTINÉ À PRODUIRE DE L'URÉE ET DE LA MÉLAMINE[2009/36]
Entry into regional phase03.06.2009National basic fee paid 
03.06.2009Designation fee(s) paid 
03.06.2009Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure26.05.2008Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
03.06.2009Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
03.06.2009Examination requested  [2009/36]
01.02.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
02.06.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.03.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
26.06.2013Fee for grant paid
26.06.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  01.02.2010
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  02.09.2014  08.09.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Saipem S.p.A.
Via Martiri di Cefalonia, 67
20097 San Donato Milanese (Milano) / IT
Opponent's representative
Cernuzzi, Daniele, et al
Studio Torta S.p.A.
Via Viotti, 9
10121 Torino / IT
 02  03.09.2014  08.09.2014  ADMISSIBLE
EUROTECNICA CONTRACTORS AND ENGINEERS S.p.A.
Via Roberto Bracco, 6
20159 Milano / IT
Opponent's representative
De Gregori, Antonella
Studio Legale Bird & Bird Via Borgogna, 8
20122 Milano / IT
 03  04.09.2014  10.09.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Stamicarbon B.V.
Mercator 3
6135 KW Sittard / NL
Opponent's representative
V.O.
P.O. Box 87930
2508 DH Den Haag / NL
 [2015/47]
Former [2014/41]
Opponent(s)01  02.09.2014   
Saipem S.p.A.
Via Martiri di Cefalonia, 67
20097 San Donato Milanese (Milano) / IT
Opponent's representative
Cernuzzi, Daniele, et al
Studio Torta S.p.A.
Via Viotti, 9
10121 Torino / IT
 02  03.09.2014   
EUROTECNICA CONTRACTORS AND ENGINEERS S.p.A.
Via Roberto Bracco, 6
20159 Milano / IT
Opponent's representative
De Gregori, Antonella
Studio Legale Bird & Bird Via Borgogna, 8
20122 Milano / IT
 03  04.09.2014   
Stamicarbon B.V.
Mercator 3
6135 KW Sittard / NL
Opponent's representative
Jansen, Cornelis Marinus, et al
V.O.
Johan de Wittlaan 7
2517 JR Den Haag / NL
14.10.2014Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
24.04.2015Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
23.11.2016Date of oral proceedings
20.12.2016Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
20.12.2016Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition08.02.2017Appeal received No.  T0350/17
28.04.2017Statement of grounds filed
13.05.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.10.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
25.10.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
26.10.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
25.10.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
24.10.2013Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU09.10.2007
AT04.12.2013
BE04.12.2013
BG04.12.2013
CY04.12.2013
CZ04.12.2013
DK04.12.2013
EE04.12.2013
ES04.12.2013
FI04.12.2013
IT04.12.2013
LT04.12.2013
LV04.12.2013
MC04.12.2013
MT04.12.2013
RO04.12.2013
SE04.12.2013
SI04.12.2013
SK04.12.2013
TR04.12.2013
GR05.03.2014
IS04.04.2014
PT04.04.2014
IE09.10.2014
LU09.10.2014
CH31.10.2014
LI31.10.2014
[2016/33]
Former [2016/32]HU09.10.2007
AT04.12.2013
BE04.12.2013
BG04.12.2013
CY04.12.2013
CZ04.12.2013
DK04.12.2013
EE04.12.2013
ES04.12.2013
FI04.12.2013
IT04.12.2013
LT04.12.2013
LV04.12.2013
MC04.12.2013
RO04.12.2013
SE04.12.2013
SI04.12.2013
SK04.12.2013
TR04.12.2013
GR05.03.2014
IS04.04.2014
PT04.04.2014
IE09.10.2014
LU09.10.2014
CH31.10.2014
LI31.10.2014
Former [2016/28]AT04.12.2013
BE04.12.2013
BG04.12.2013
CY04.12.2013
CZ04.12.2013
DK04.12.2013
EE04.12.2013
ES04.12.2013
FI04.12.2013
IT04.12.2013
LT04.12.2013
LV04.12.2013
MC04.12.2013
RO04.12.2013
SE04.12.2013
SI04.12.2013
SK04.12.2013
GR05.03.2014
IS04.04.2014
PT04.04.2014
IE09.10.2014
LU09.10.2014
CH31.10.2014
LI31.10.2014
Former [2016/25]AT04.12.2013
BE04.12.2013
BG04.12.2013
CY04.12.2013
CZ04.12.2013
DK04.12.2013
EE04.12.2013
ES04.12.2013
FI04.12.2013
IT04.12.2013
LT04.12.2013
LV04.12.2013
MC04.12.2013
RO04.12.2013
SE04.12.2013
SI04.12.2013
SK04.12.2013
IS04.04.2014
PT04.04.2014
IE09.10.2014
LU09.10.2014
CH31.10.2014
LI31.10.2014
Former [2015/46]AT04.12.2013
BE04.12.2013
CY04.12.2013
CZ04.12.2013
DK04.12.2013
EE04.12.2013
ES04.12.2013
FI04.12.2013
IT04.12.2013
LT04.12.2013
LV04.12.2013
MC04.12.2013
RO04.12.2013
SE04.12.2013
SI04.12.2013
SK04.12.2013
IS04.04.2014
PT04.04.2014
IE09.10.2014
LU09.10.2014
CH31.10.2014
LI31.10.2014
Former [2015/37]AT04.12.2013
BE04.12.2013
CY04.12.2013
CZ04.12.2013
DK04.12.2013
EE04.12.2013
ES04.12.2013
FI04.12.2013
IT04.12.2013
LT04.12.2013
LV04.12.2013
MC04.12.2013
RO04.12.2013
SE04.12.2013
SI04.12.2013
SK04.12.2013
IS04.04.2014
PT04.04.2014
LU09.10.2014
CH31.10.2014
LI31.10.2014
Former [2015/33]AT04.12.2013
BE04.12.2013
CY04.12.2013
CZ04.12.2013
DK04.12.2013
EE04.12.2013
ES04.12.2013
FI04.12.2013
LT04.12.2013
LV04.12.2013
MC04.12.2013
RO04.12.2013
SE04.12.2013
SI04.12.2013
SK04.12.2013
IS04.04.2014
PT04.04.2014
LU09.10.2014
CH31.10.2014
LI31.10.2014
Former [2015/27]AT04.12.2013
BE04.12.2013
CY04.12.2013
CZ04.12.2013
DK04.12.2013
EE04.12.2013
ES04.12.2013
FI04.12.2013
LT04.12.2013
LV04.12.2013
MC04.12.2013
RO04.12.2013
SE04.12.2013
SI04.12.2013
SK04.12.2013
IS04.04.2014
PT04.04.2014
LU09.10.2014
Former [2015/26]AT04.12.2013
BE04.12.2013
CY04.12.2013
CZ04.12.2013
DK04.12.2013
EE04.12.2013
ES04.12.2013
FI04.12.2013
LT04.12.2013
LV04.12.2013
RO04.12.2013
SE04.12.2013
SI04.12.2013
SK04.12.2013
IS04.04.2014
PT04.04.2014
LU09.10.2014
Former [2015/14]AT04.12.2013
BE04.12.2013
CY04.12.2013
CZ04.12.2013
DK04.12.2013
EE04.12.2013
ES04.12.2013
FI04.12.2013
LT04.12.2013
LV04.12.2013
RO04.12.2013
SE04.12.2013
SI04.12.2013
SK04.12.2013
IS04.04.2014
PT04.04.2014
Former [2014/48]AT04.12.2013
BE04.12.2013
CY04.12.2013
CZ04.12.2013
DK04.12.2013
EE04.12.2013
ES04.12.2013
FI04.12.2013
LT04.12.2013
LV04.12.2013
RO04.12.2013
SE04.12.2013
SK04.12.2013
IS04.04.2014
PT04.04.2014
Former [2014/37]AT04.12.2013
BE04.12.2013
CY04.12.2013
CZ04.12.2013
EE04.12.2013
ES04.12.2013
FI04.12.2013
LT04.12.2013
LV04.12.2013
RO04.12.2013
SE04.12.2013
SK04.12.2013
IS04.04.2014
PT04.04.2014
Former [2014/36]AT04.12.2013
BE04.12.2013
CY04.12.2013
EE04.12.2013
FI04.12.2013
LT04.12.2013
LV04.12.2013
SE04.12.2013
IS04.04.2014
Former [2014/34]AT04.12.2013
BE04.12.2013
CY04.12.2013
FI04.12.2013
LT04.12.2013
LV04.12.2013
SE04.12.2013
Former [2014/26]AT04.12.2013
CY04.12.2013
FI04.12.2013
LT04.12.2013
LV04.12.2013
SE04.12.2013
Former [2014/25]AT04.12.2013
FI04.12.2013
LT04.12.2013
LV04.12.2013
SE04.12.2013
Former [2014/24]AT04.12.2013
FI04.12.2013
LT04.12.2013
SE04.12.2013
Former [2014/22]FI04.12.2013
LT04.12.2013
SE04.12.2013
Former [2014/20]LT04.12.2013
Cited inInternational search[Y]WO2005080321  (UREA CASALE SA [CH], et al) [Y] 1-21 * the whole document *;
 [Y]WO9808808  (DSM NV [NL], et al) [Y] 1-21 * page 7, line 11 - page 8, line 4 * * page 15, line 3 - line 14 * * figure 1 *;
 [Y]DE1468207  (MONTEDISON SPA) [Y] 1-21 * page 4, paragraph L *;
 [Y]EP1634869  (UREA CASALE SA [CH]) [Y] 1-21 * column 3, paragraph 19 * * column 4, paragraphs 28-30 *