Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2107884

EP2107884 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR RETINAL DIAGNOSIS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  19.11.2010
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip10.10.2016Change - representative 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Heidelberg Engineering GmbH
Tiergartenstrasse 15
69121 Heidelberg / DE
[2009/42]
Inventor(s)01 / ZINSER, Gerhard
Rietburgstrasse 5
67346 Speyer / DE
02 / ENGELHARDT, Ralf
Am Burgfeld 12b
23568 Lübeck / DE
03 / FISCHER, Jörg
Jahnstr. 69
69221 Dossenheim / DE
04 / MÜLLER, Frank Karlheinz
St.-German-Str. 23
67346 Speyer / DE
05 / OTTO, Tilman
Wachenheimerstr. 6
67117 Limburgerhof / DE
 [2011/41]
Former [2011/34]01 / ZINSER, Gerhard
Rietburgstrasse 5
67346 Speyer / DE
02 / ENGELHARDT, Ralf
Am Burgfeld 12b
23568 Lübeck / DE
03 / FISCHER, Jörg
Jahnstr. 69
69221 Dossenheim / DE
04 / MÜLLER, Frank Karlheinz
St.-German-Str. 23
67346 Speyer / DE
05 / OTTO, Tillmann
Wachenheimerstr. 6
67117 Limburgerhof / DE
Former [2009/42]01 / ZINSER, Gerhard
Rietburgstrasse 5
67346 Speyer / DE
Representative(s)Wesch, Arno , et al
Reble & Klose
Rechts- und Patentanwälte
Konrad-Zuse-Ring 32
68163 Mannheim / DE
[N/P]
Former [2010/51]Schmitt, Meinrad , et al
Reble & Klose Rechts- und Patentanwälte Konrad-Zuse-Ring 32
68163 Mannheim / DE
Former [2009/42]Schmitt, Meinrad , et al
Reble, Klose & Schmitt GbR Patente + Marken Postfach 12 15 19
68066 Mannheim / DE
Application number, filing date07819550.002.11.2007
[2009/42]
WO2007EP09526
Priority number, dateDE2006105214902.11.2006         Original published format: DE102006052149
[2009/42]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2008052793
Date:08.05.2008
Language:DE
[2008/19]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2107884
Date:14.10.2009
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.05.2008
[2009/42]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2107884
Date:22.12.2010
Language:DE
[2010/51]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP08.05.2008
ClassificationInternational:A61B3/036
[2015/34]
Former International [2009/42]A61B3/12
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/42]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND GERÄT ZUR NETZHAUTDIAGNOSTIK[2009/42]
English:METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR RETINAL DIAGNOSIS[2009/42]
French:PROCEDE ET APPAREIL DE DIAGNOSTIC DE LA RETINE[2010/42]
Former [2009/42]PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE DIAGNOSTIC DE LA RÉTINE
Entry into regional phase26.03.2009National basic fee paid 
26.03.2009Designation fee(s) paid 
26.03.2009Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure27.05.2008Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
26.03.2009Examination requested  [2009/42]
14.07.2009Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time
28.07.2009Request for decision received: Application is deemed to be withdrawn
14.08.2009Result of request for decision (Application is deemed to be withdrawn): Request granted
29.09.2010Communication of intention to grant the patent
05.11.2010Fee for grant paid
05.11.2010Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  22.09.2011  27.09.2011  ADMISSIBLE
Carl Zeiss Meditec AG
Göschwitzer Strasse 51-52
07745 Jena / DE
Opponent's representative
Patentanwälte Geyer, Fehners & Partner mbB
Perhamerstrasse 31
80687 München / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2011/44]
Opponent(s)01  22.09.2011  27.09.2011  ADMISSIBLE
Carl Zeiss Meditec AG
Göschwitzer Strasse 51-52
07745 Jena / DE
Opponent's representative
Geyer, Fehners & Partner
Patentanwälte Perhamerstrasse 31
80687 München / DE
28.10.2011Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
08.05.2012Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
24.04.2015Date of oral proceedings
02.12.2015Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
02.12.2015Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
Appeal following opposition01.02.2016Appeal received No.  T0259/16
04.04.2016Statement of grounds filed
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.11.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
10.11.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY22.12.2010
CZ22.12.2010
DK22.12.2010
EE22.12.2010
FI22.12.2010
HU22.12.2010
IE22.12.2010
LT22.12.2010
LV22.12.2010
MT22.12.2010
NL22.12.2010
PL22.12.2010
RO22.12.2010
SE22.12.2010
SI22.12.2010
SK22.12.2010
TR22.12.2010
BG22.03.2011
GR23.03.2011
ES02.04.2011
IS22.04.2011
PT22.04.2011
LU02.11.2011
BE30.11.2011
CH30.11.2011
LI30.11.2011
MC30.11.2011
AT30.11.2012
[2014/09]
Former [2013/45]CY22.12.2010
CZ22.12.2010
DK22.12.2010
EE22.12.2010
FI22.12.2010
HU22.12.2010
IE22.12.2010
LT22.12.2010
LV22.12.2010
MT22.12.2010
NL22.12.2010
PL22.12.2010
RO22.12.2010
SE22.12.2010
SI22.12.2010
SK22.12.2010
TR22.12.2010
BG22.03.2011
GR23.03.2011
ES02.04.2011
IS22.04.2011
PT22.04.2011
LU02.11.2011
BE30.11.2011
CH30.11.2011
LI30.11.2011
MC30.11.2011
Former [2013/44]CY22.12.2010
CZ22.12.2010
DK22.12.2010
EE22.12.2010
FI22.12.2010
IE22.12.2010
LT22.12.2010
LV22.12.2010
MT22.12.2010
NL22.12.2010
PL22.12.2010
RO22.12.2010
SE22.12.2010
SI22.12.2010
SK22.12.2010
TR22.12.2010
BG22.03.2011
GR23.03.2011
ES02.04.2011
IS22.04.2011
PT22.04.2011
LU02.11.2011
BE30.11.2011
CH30.11.2011
LI30.11.2011
MC30.11.2011
Former [2011/38]CY22.12.2010
CZ22.12.2010
EE22.12.2010
FI22.12.2010
LT22.12.2010
LV22.12.2010
NL22.12.2010
PL22.12.2010
RO22.12.2010
SE22.12.2010
SI22.12.2010
SK22.12.2010
BG22.03.2011
GR23.03.2011
ES02.04.2011
IS22.04.2011
PT22.04.2011
Former [2011/37]CY22.12.2010
CZ22.12.2010
EE22.12.2010
FI22.12.2010
LT22.12.2010
LV22.12.2010
PL22.12.2010
RO22.12.2010
SE22.12.2010
SI22.12.2010
SK22.12.2010
BG22.03.2011
GR23.03.2011
ES02.04.2011
IS22.04.2011
PT22.04.2011
Former [2011/35]CY22.12.2010
CZ22.12.2010
EE22.12.2010
FI22.12.2010
LT22.12.2010
LV22.12.2010
SE22.12.2010
SI22.12.2010
BG22.03.2011
GR23.03.2011
ES02.04.2011
IS22.04.2011
PT22.04.2011
Former [2011/34]CY22.12.2010
FI22.12.2010
LT22.12.2010
LV22.12.2010
SE22.12.2010
SI22.12.2010
BG22.03.2011
GR23.03.2011
ES02.04.2011
PT22.04.2011
Former [2011/29]CY22.12.2010
FI22.12.2010
LT22.12.2010
LV22.12.2010
SE22.12.2010
SI22.12.2010
BG22.03.2011
Cited inInternational search[X]US2004036838  (PODOLEANU ADRIAN GH [GB] ET AL) [X] 1-18 * abstract * * figures 2a-2d * * figures 8a-8f * * paragraph [0068] * * paragraph [0106] - paragraph [0126] *;
 [PX]WO2007061769  (UNIV DUKE [US]; TOTH CYNTHIA A [US]; BOWER BRADLEY A [US]; STOPA MARCI) [PX] 1,16 * abstract * * claims 1-3 * * figures 1-9 * * page 6 - page 8 *;
 [PX]EP1836952  (TOPCON CORP [JP]) [PX] 16-18 * abstract * * figure 1 * * claims 1-9 *;
 [A]WO2006058735  (ZEISS CARL MEDITEC AG [DE]; UNIV MIAMI [US]; KNIGHTON ROBERT W [US]; J) [A] 1-18 * abstract * * claim 1 *
 [X]  - YANNUZZI L A ET AL, "Ophthalmic fundus imaging: today and beyond", AMERICAN JOURNAL OF OPHTHALMOLOGY, OPHTHALMIC PUBL., CHICAGO, IL,, US, (200403), vol. 137, no. 3, ISSN 0002-9394, pages 511 - 524, XP004755596 [X] 1-18 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ajo.2003.12.035