Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2074482

EP2074482 - NON-TRANSPARENT MICROVOIDED AXIALLY STRETCHED FILM, PRODUCTION PROCESS THEREFOR AND PROCESS FOR OBTAINING A TRANSPARENT PATTERN THEREWITH. [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  05.09.2016
Database last updated on 11.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip02.10.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Agfa-Gevaert N.V.
Septestraat 27
2640 Mortsel / BE
[2010/21]
Former [2009/27]For all designated states
AGFA-GEVAERT
Corporate IP Department 3802 Septestraat 27
B-2640 Mortsel / BE
Inventor(s)01 / QUINTENS, Dirk
c/o AGFA-GEVAERT Corporate IP Department 3800
B-2640 Mortsel / BE
02 / LEENDERS, Luc
c/o AGFA-GEVAERT Corporate IP Department 3800
B-2640 Mortsel / BE
 [2009/27]
Representative(s)Goedeweeck, Rudi , et al
AGFA NV
Intellectual Property Department
Septestraat 27
2640 Mortsel / BE
[N/P]
Former [2010/21]Goedeweeck, Rudi , et al
Agfa Graphics NV IP Department 3622 Septestraat 27
2640 Mortsel / BE
Application number, filing date07820613.326.09.2007
[2009/27]
WO2007EP60218
Priority number, dateEP2006012166503.10.2006         Original published format: EP 06121665
EP2006012166903.10.2006         Original published format: EP 06121669
EP2007010494727.03.2007         Original published format: EP 07104947
EP2007010494827.03.2007         Original published format: EP 07104948
EP2007010495027.03.2007         Original published format: EP 07104950
EP2007010495327.03.2007         Original published format: EP 07104953
[2009/27]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2008040670
Date:10.04.2008
Language:EN
[2008/15]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2074482
Date:01.07.2009
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.04.2008
[2009/27]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP10.04.2008
ClassificationInternational:G03C1/795, B41M5/41, B41M5/50, C08J5/18, C08L67/02
[2009/27]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/27]
TitleGerman:NICHTTRANSPARENTER AXIAL GESTRECKTER FILM MIT MIKROVOIDS, HERSTELLUNGSPROZESS DAFÜR UND PROZESS ZUM ERHALTEN EINES TRANSPARENTEN MUSTERS DAMIT[2009/27]
English:NON-TRANSPARENT MICROVOIDED AXIALLY STRETCHED FILM, PRODUCTION PROCESS THEREFOR AND PROCESS FOR OBTAINING A TRANSPARENT PATTERN THEREWITH.[2009/27]
French:FILM NON TRANSPARENT ETIRE AXIALEMENT À MICRO VIDES, PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUTION AFFÉRENT ET PROCÉDÉ PERMETTANT D'OBTENIR UN MOTIF TRANSPARENT PAR CE BIAIS[2009/27]
Entry into regional phase04.05.2009National basic fee paid 
04.05.2009Designation fee(s) paid 
04.05.2009Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure21.04.2009Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
04.05.2009Examination requested  [2009/27]
06.03.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
11.09.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.09.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
24.03.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.04.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
07.08.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.08.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
09.12.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.01.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
27.05.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.06.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
09.12.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.12.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.04.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.05.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
05.09.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.03.2017Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 23.03.2017
15.03.2017Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
23.03.2017Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
Appeal following examination23.05.2017Appeal received No.  T1930/17
18.07.2017Statement of grounds filed
16.04.2020Date of oral proceedings
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  06.03.2013
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.09.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
30.09.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
30.09.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
01.10.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
30.09.2013Renewal fee patent year 07
30.09.2014Renewal fee patent year 08
30.09.2015Renewal fee patent year 09
30.09.2016Renewal fee patent year 10
02.10.2017Renewal fee patent year 11
01.10.2018Renewal fee patent year 12
30.09.2019Renewal fee patent year 13
Cited inInternational search[DX]US5457018  (SOMMER KLAUS [US] ET AL) [DX] 1-17,19-27 * abstract * * column 1, line 48 - line 52 * * column 3, line 54 - line 60 * * column 4, line 66 - column 5, line 55 * * example 3; claims 1,5 *;
 [A]JPH09255806  (TOYO BOSEKI) [A] 1-17,19-27 * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0006] * * abstract *;
 [A]JP2004196951  (MITSUBISHI ENG PLASTIC CORP) [A] 1-17,19-27 * paragraphs [0001] , [0006] , [0007] , [0015] , [0020] *;
 [A]US2004167022  (LANEY THOMAS M [US] ET AL) [A] 1-17,19-27 * abstract * * paragraphs [0001] , [0031] , [0032] , [0075] , [0076] *