Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2080323

EP2080323 - METHOD FOR PROTECTION SWITCHING [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  24.12.2010
Database last updated on 15.08.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip15.08.2014Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): GR
published on 17.09.2014  [2014/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Nokia Siemens Networks GmbH & Co. KG
St. Martin Strasse 76
81541 München / DE
[2009/30]
Inventor(s)01 / DE FRIAS REBELO NUNES, Pedro Ricardo
Rua Antero de Figueredo 7-5 Ä
2795016 Linda-a-Velha / PT
 [2009/30]
Application number, filing date07820674.528.09.2007
[2009/30]
WO2007EP60286
Priority number, dateEP2006002060929.09.2006         Original published format: EP 06020609
[2009/30]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2008037782
Date:03.04.2008
Language:EN
[2008/14]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2080323
Date:22.07.2009
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.04.2008
[2009/30]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2080323
Date:17.02.2010
Language:EN
[2010/07]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP03.04.2008
ClassificationInternational:H04L12/42
[2009/30]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/30]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR SCHUTZUMSCHALTUNG[2009/30]
English:METHOD FOR PROTECTION SWITCHING[2009/30]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE COMMUTATION DE PROTECTION[2009/30]
Entry into regional phase29.04.2009National basic fee paid 
29.04.2009Designation fee(s) paid 
29.04.2009Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure29.04.2009Examination requested  [2009/30]
11.09.2009Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.01.2010Fee for grant paid
08.01.2010Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)18.11.2010No opposition filed within time limit [2011/04]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.09.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT17.02.2010
BE17.02.2010
CY17.02.2010
CZ17.02.2010
DK17.02.2010
EE17.02.2010
FI17.02.2010
GR17.02.2010
IT17.02.2010
LT17.02.2010
LV17.02.2010
MT17.02.2010
NL17.02.2010
PL17.02.2010
RO17.02.2010
SE17.02.2010
SI17.02.2010
SK17.02.2010
TR17.02.2010
BG17.05.2010
ES28.05.2010
IS17.06.2010
PT17.06.2010
HU18.08.2010
IE28.09.2010
LU28.09.2010
MC30.09.2010
[2014/38]
Former [2012/47]AT17.02.2010
BE17.02.2010
CY17.02.2010
CZ17.02.2010
DK17.02.2010
EE17.02.2010
FI17.02.2010
IT17.02.2010
LT17.02.2010
LV17.02.2010
MT17.02.2010
NL17.02.2010
PL17.02.2010
RO17.02.2010
SE17.02.2010
SI17.02.2010
SK17.02.2010
TR17.02.2010
BG17.05.2010
ES28.05.2010
IS17.06.2010
PT17.06.2010
HU18.08.2010
IE28.09.2010
LU28.09.2010
MC30.09.2010
Former [2012/44]AT17.02.2010
BE17.02.2010
CY17.02.2010
CZ17.02.2010
DK17.02.2010
EE17.02.2010
FI17.02.2010
IT17.02.2010
LT17.02.2010
LV17.02.2010
MT17.02.2010
NL17.02.2010
PL17.02.2010
RO17.02.2010
SE17.02.2010
SI17.02.2010
SK17.02.2010
BG17.05.2010
ES28.05.2010
IS17.06.2010
PT17.06.2010
HU18.08.2010
IE28.09.2010
LU28.09.2010
MC30.09.2010
Former [2012/42]AT17.02.2010
BE17.02.2010
CY17.02.2010
CZ17.02.2010
DK17.02.2010
EE17.02.2010
FI17.02.2010
IT17.02.2010
LT17.02.2010
LV17.02.2010
MT17.02.2010
NL17.02.2010
PL17.02.2010
RO17.02.2010
SE17.02.2010
SI17.02.2010
SK17.02.2010
BG17.05.2010
ES28.05.2010
IS17.06.2010
PT17.06.2010
HU18.08.2010
IE28.09.2010
MC30.09.2010
Former [2012/05]AT17.02.2010
BE17.02.2010
CY17.02.2010
CZ17.02.2010
DK17.02.2010
EE17.02.2010
FI17.02.2010
IT17.02.2010
LT17.02.2010
LV17.02.2010
MT17.02.2010
NL17.02.2010
PL17.02.2010
RO17.02.2010
SE17.02.2010
SI17.02.2010
SK17.02.2010
BG17.05.2010
ES28.05.2010
IS17.06.2010
PT17.06.2010
IE28.09.2010
MC30.09.2010
Former [2011/36]AT17.02.2010
BE17.02.2010
CY17.02.2010
CZ17.02.2010
DK17.02.2010
EE17.02.2010
FI17.02.2010
IT17.02.2010
LT17.02.2010
LV17.02.2010
NL17.02.2010
PL17.02.2010
RO17.02.2010
SE17.02.2010
SI17.02.2010
SK17.02.2010
BG17.05.2010
ES28.05.2010
IS17.06.2010
PT17.06.2010
IE28.09.2010
MC30.09.2010
Former [2011/25]AT17.02.2010
BE17.02.2010
CY17.02.2010
CZ17.02.2010
DK17.02.2010
EE17.02.2010
FI17.02.2010
IT17.02.2010
LT17.02.2010
LV17.02.2010
NL17.02.2010
PL17.02.2010
RO17.02.2010
SE17.02.2010
SI17.02.2010
SK17.02.2010
BG17.05.2010
ES28.05.2010
IS17.06.2010
PT17.06.2010
MC30.09.2010
Former [2010/45]AT17.02.2010
FI17.02.2010
LT17.02.2010
LV17.02.2010
NL17.02.2010
PL17.02.2010
SI17.02.2010
ES28.05.2010
IS17.06.2010
PT17.06.2010
Former [2010/44]AT17.02.2010
FI17.02.2010
LT17.02.2010
LV17.02.2010
PL17.02.2010
SI17.02.2010
ES28.05.2010
IS17.06.2010
PT17.06.2010
Former [2010/33]ES28.05.2010
Cited inInternational search[A]US6226111  (CHANG GEE-KUNG [US], et al) [A] 1-6 * figures 1,5-8,16 * * column 2, lines 35-60 * * column 4, lines 43-65 * * column 5, lines 15-50 * * column 8, lines 6-51 *;
 [A]WO03077459  (FOUNDRY NETWORKS INC [US]) [A] 1-6 * figures 1,3,10 * * page 3, lines 9-30 * * page 4, lines 1-20 * * page 6, lines 8-30 * * page 13, lines 15-30 *;
 [A]US2006109802  (ZELIG DAVID [IL], et al) [A] 1-6 * figures 1,7,8,11 * * page 2, paragraphs 13-16 * * page 3, paragraphs 16-18 * * page 5, paragraph 50 * * page 10, paragraph 127 *