Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2086341

EP2086341 - SOLUBLE FOAMING BEVERAGE POWDER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  26.10.2012
Database last updated on 06.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip30.08.2019Change - opposition data/opponents data or that of the opponents representativepublished on 02.10.2019  [2019/40]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Société des Produits Nestlé S.A.
Entre-deux-Villes
1800 Vevey / CH
[2019/28]
Former [2017/42]For all designated states
Nestec S.A.
Avenue Nestlé 55
1800 Vevey / CH
Former [2009/33]For all designated states
Nestec S.A.
Avenue Nestlé 55
1800 Vevey / CH
Inventor(s)01 / WYSS, Christophe Alexander
A1-ph2
Changkat Bandar Utama 2
PJU 6 Bandar Utama
Petaling Jaya, 47800 / MY
02 / GUMY, Jean-Claude
Ch. du Cotter 12
CH-1433 Suchy / CH
03 / WARNERY, Philippe, François
Rue des Moulins 62
CH-1400 Yverdon-les-bains / CH
04 / BOURGEOIS, Thierry
Rue du Moulinet 4
CH-1350 Orbe / CH
 [2012/48]
Former [2009/33]01 / WYSS, Christophe Alexander
A1-ph2 Changkat Bandar Utama 2 PJU 6 Bandar Utama
Petaling Jaya, 47800 / MY
02 / GUMY, Jean-Claude
Ch. du Cotter 12
CH-1433 Suchy / CH
03 / WARNERY, Philippe, François
Rue des Moulins 62
CH-1400 Yverdon-les-bains / CH
04 / BOURGEOIS, Thierry
Rue du Moulinet 4
CH-1350 Orbe / CH
Representative(s)Plougmann Vingtoft a/s
Strandvejen 70
2900 Hellerup / DK
[N/P]
Former [2012/48]Cogniat, Eric Jean Marie
Nestec S.A. Avenue Nestlé 55
1800 Vevey / CH
Former [2009/33]Cogniat, Eric Jean Marie
Nestec S.A. Avenue Nestlé 55
1800 Vevey / CH
Application number, filing date07821936.729.10.2007
[2009/33]
WO2007EP61576
Priority number, dateEP2006012330301.11.2006         Original published format: EP 06123303
[2009/33]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2008052952
Date:08.05.2008
Language:EN
[2008/19]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2086341
Date:12.08.2009
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.05.2008
[2009/33]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2086341
Date:28.11.2012
Language:EN
[2012/48]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP08.05.2008
ClassificationInternational:A23F5/40, A23C11/00
[2009/33]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/33]
TitleGerman:LÖSLICHES SCHÄUMENDES GETRÄNKEPULVER[2009/33]
English:SOLUBLE FOAMING BEVERAGE POWDER[2009/33]
French:POUDRE SOLUBLE POUR BOISSON MOUSSANTE[2009/33]
Entry into regional phase02.06.2009National basic fee paid 
02.06.2009Designation fee(s) paid 
02.06.2009Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure01.05.2009Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
02.06.2009Examination requested  [2009/33]
08.04.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
14.10.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.12.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
12.04.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.06.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.10.2012Fee for grant paid
18.10.2012Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP12162948.9  / EP2474234
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  08.04.2010
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  28.08.2013  22.11.2013  ADMISSIBLE
Mondelez Global LLC
Three Parkway North
Deerfield, IL 60015 / US
Opponent's representative
Boult Wade Tennant LLP
Salisbury Square House
8 Salisbury Square
London EC4Y 8AP / GB
 02  28.08.2013  16.02.2016  WITHDRAWN
Herzog Fiesser & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Isartorplatz 1
80331 München / DE
Opponent's representative
Altmann Stößel Dick Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Isartorplatz 1
80331 München / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2019/40]
Opponent(s)01  28.08.2013  22.11.2013  ADMISSIBLE
Mondelez Global LLC
Three Parkway North
Deerfield, IL 60015 / US
Opponent's representative
Boult Wade Tennant LLP
5th Floor, Salisbury Square House
8, Salisbury Square
London EC4Y 8AP / GB
 02  28.08.2013  16.02.2016  WITHDRAWN
Herzog Fiesser & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Isartorplatz 1
80331 München / DE
Opponent's representative
Altmann Stößel Dick Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Isartorplatz 1
80331 München / DE
Former [2016/12]
Opponent(s)01  28.08.2013  22.11.2013  ADMISSIBLE
Mondelez Global LLC
Three Parkway North
Deerfield, IL 60015 / US
Opponent's representative
Boult Wade Tennant
Verulam Gardens
70 Gray's Inn Road
London WC1X 8BT / GB
 02  28.08.2013  22.11.2013  WITHDRAWN
Herzog, Fiesser & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Isartorplatz 1
80331 München / DE
Opponent's representative
Herzog, Fiesser & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Isartorplatz 1
80331 München / DE
Former [2013/41]
Opponent(s)01  28.08.2013   
Mondelez Global LLC
Three Parkway North
Deerfield, IL 60015 / US
Opponent's representative
Boult Wade Tennant
Verulam Gardens
70 Grays Inn Road
London WC1X 8BT / GB
 02  28.08.2013   
Herzog, Fiesser & Partner
Isartorplatz 1
80331 München / DE
Opponent's representative
Herzog, Fiesser & Partner
Isartorplatz 1
80331 München / DE
Former [2013/40]
Opponent(s)01  28.08.2013   
Mondelez Global LLC
Three Parkway North
Deerfield, IL 60015 / US
Opponent's representative
Boult Wade Tennant
Verulam Gardens
70 Grays Inn Road
London WC1X 8BT / GB
10.10.2013Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
10.04.2014Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
07.10.2015Date of oral proceedings
01.12.2015Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
01.12.2015Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
Appeal following opposition10.02.2016Appeal received No.  T0300/16
11.04.2016Statement of grounds filed
09.02.2016Appeal received No.  T0300/16
08.04.2016Statement of grounds filed
04.02.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.10.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
12.10.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
11.10.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
11.10.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY28.11.2012
CZ28.11.2012
DK28.11.2012
EE28.11.2012
IS28.11.2012
LT28.11.2012
LV28.11.2012
MC28.11.2012
MT28.11.2012
RO28.11.2012
SI28.11.2012
SK28.11.2012
IE29.10.2013
LU29.10.2013
BG08.08.2017
[2019/10]
Former [2016/32]CY28.11.2012
CZ28.11.2012
DK28.11.2012
EE28.11.2012
IS28.11.2012
LT28.11.2012
LV28.11.2012
MC28.11.2012
MT28.11.2012
RO28.11.2012
SI28.11.2012
SK28.11.2012
IE29.10.2013
LU29.10.2013
BG31.10.2014
Former [2015/41]CY28.11.2012
CZ28.11.2012
DK28.11.2012
EE28.11.2012
LT28.11.2012
LV28.11.2012
MC28.11.2012
MT28.11.2012
RO28.11.2012
SI28.11.2012
SK28.11.2012
IE29.10.2013
LU29.10.2013
Former [2015/34]CY28.11.2012
CZ28.11.2012
DK28.11.2012
EE28.11.2012
LT28.11.2012
LV28.11.2012
MC28.11.2012
RO28.11.2012
SI28.11.2012
SK28.11.2012
IE29.10.2013
LU29.10.2013
Former [2014/48]CY28.11.2012
CZ28.11.2012
DK28.11.2012
EE28.11.2012
LT28.11.2012
LV28.11.2012
MC28.11.2012
RO28.11.2012
SI28.11.2012
SK28.11.2012
IE29.10.2013
Former [2014/25]CY28.11.2012
CZ28.11.2012
DK28.11.2012
EE28.11.2012
LT28.11.2012
LV28.11.2012
MC28.11.2012
RO28.11.2012
SI28.11.2012
SK28.11.2012
Former [2013/37]CY28.11.2012
CZ28.11.2012
DK28.11.2012
EE28.11.2012
LT28.11.2012
LV28.11.2012
RO28.11.2012
SI28.11.2012
SK28.11.2012
Former [2013/35]CY28.11.2012
CZ28.11.2012
DK28.11.2012
EE28.11.2012
LT28.11.2012
LV28.11.2012
SI28.11.2012
SK28.11.2012
Former [2013/34]CY28.11.2012
DK28.11.2012
LT28.11.2012
LV28.11.2012
SI28.11.2012
Former [2013/26]CY28.11.2012
LT28.11.2012
LV28.11.2012
SI28.11.2012
Former [2013/23]CY28.11.2012
LT28.11.2012
LV28.11.2012
Former [2013/20]LT28.11.2012
Cited inInternational search[DX]EP0888066  (NESTLE SA [CH]) [DX] 1-19 * page 2, paragraphs 11,12 * * page 3, paragraph 18 * * page 5, paragraph 38; example 3; claim 1 *;
 [DA]WO0108504  (NESTLE SA [CH], et al) [DA] 1-19 * page 3, line 1 - line 10 * * page 8, line 15 - line 16; claim 1 *;
 [DA]EP1064850  (KRAFT FOODS INC [US]) [DA] 1-19 * abstract *;
 [A]WO03099030  (KRAFT FOODS HOLDINGS INC [US], et al) [A] 1-19 * page 5, paragraph 12; claims 1,3 *;
 [A]US2005276898  (PASCUAL TERESITA B [US], et al) [A] 1-19 * paragraph [0010]; example 1 *
by applicantEP0154192
 EP0458310
 EP0885566
 WO2006023565
 WO2006023564
 WO0108504