EP2190284 - Drinker [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2010/22] | DRINKER | ||
[2012/45] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.02.2014 Database last updated on 19.04.2025 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states La Buvette, Société par Actions Simplifiée Zone Industrielle - Rue Maurice Périn 08090 Tournes / FR | [2010/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MARTIN, Jean 2bis, rue du Belvédère F-08000 Charleville-Mezieres / FR | [2010/22] | Representative(s) | Rhein, Alain Cabinet Bleger-Rhein-Poupon 4A, rue de l'Industrie 67450 Mundolsheim / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2013/15] | Rhein, Alain CABINET BLEGER-RHEIN 17, rue de la Forêt 67550 Vendenheim / FR | ||
Former [2010/22] | Rhein, Alain CABINET BLEGER-RHEIN 17, rue de la Forêt 67550 Vendenheim / FR | Application number, filing date | 07823804.5 | 11.09.2007 | [2010/22] | WO2007FR51908 | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009034239 | Date: | 19.03.2009 | Language: | FR | [2009/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2190284 | Date: | 02.06.2010 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.03.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2190284 | Date: | 10.04.2013 | Language: | FR | [2013/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.03.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A01K7/00 | [2010/22] | CPC: |
A01K7/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/22] | Title | German: | Tränke | [2012/45] | English: | Drinker | [2012/45] | French: | Abreuvoir | [2012/45] |
Former [2010/22] | TRÄNKE | ||
Former [2010/22] | DRINKER | ||
Former [2010/22] | ABREUVOIR | Entry into regional phase | 01.04.2010 | National basic fee paid | 01.04.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.04.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.10.2008 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 01.04.2010 | Examination requested [2010/22] | 24.05.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.11.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.03.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 04.03.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.11.2012 | Opposition(s) | 13.01.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.04.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 11.09.2007 | AT | 10.04.2013 | CY | 10.04.2013 | CZ | 10.04.2013 | DK | 10.04.2013 | EE | 10.04.2013 | FI | 10.04.2013 | IT | 10.04.2013 | LT | 10.04.2013 | LV | 10.04.2013 | MC | 10.04.2013 | MT | 10.04.2013 | NL | 10.04.2013 | PL | 10.04.2013 | RO | 10.04.2013 | SE | 10.04.2013 | SI | 10.04.2013 | SK | 10.04.2013 | TR | 10.04.2013 | BG | 10.07.2013 | GR | 11.07.2013 | ES | 21.07.2013 | IS | 10.08.2013 | PT | 12.08.2013 | GB | 11.09.2013 | IE | 11.09.2013 | LU | 11.09.2013 | BE | 30.09.2013 | CH | 30.09.2013 | LI | 30.09.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 10.04.2013 | |
CY | 10.04.2013 | ||
CZ | 10.04.2013 | ||
DK | 10.04.2013 | ||
EE | 10.04.2013 | ||
FI | 10.04.2013 | ||
IT | 10.04.2013 | ||
LT | 10.04.2013 | ||
LV | 10.04.2013 | ||
MC | 10.04.2013 | ||
MT | 10.04.2013 | ||
NL | 10.04.2013 | ||
PL | 10.04.2013 | ||
RO | 10.04.2013 | ||
SE | 10.04.2013 | ||
SI | 10.04.2013 | ||
SK | 10.04.2013 | ||
TR | 10.04.2013 | ||
BG | 10.07.2013 | ||
GR | 11.07.2013 | ||
ES | 21.07.2013 | ||
IS | 10.08.2013 | ||
PT | 12.08.2013 | ||
GB | 11.09.2013 | ||
IE | 11.09.2013 | ||
BE | 30.09.2013 | ||
CH | 30.09.2013 | ||
LI | 30.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/34] | AT | 10.04.2013 | |
CY | 10.04.2013 | ||
CZ | 10.04.2013 | ||
DK | 10.04.2013 | ||
EE | 10.04.2013 | ||
FI | 10.04.2013 | ||
IT | 10.04.2013 | ||
LT | 10.04.2013 | ||
LV | 10.04.2013 | ||
MC | 10.04.2013 | ||
NL | 10.04.2013 | ||
PL | 10.04.2013 | ||
RO | 10.04.2013 | ||
SE | 10.04.2013 | ||
SI | 10.04.2013 | ||
SK | 10.04.2013 | ||
BG | 10.07.2013 | ||
GR | 11.07.2013 | ||
ES | 21.07.2013 | ||
IS | 10.08.2013 | ||
PT | 12.08.2013 | ||
GB | 11.09.2013 | ||
IE | 11.09.2013 | ||
BE | 30.09.2013 | ||
CH | 30.09.2013 | ||
LI | 30.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/33] | AT | 10.04.2013 | |
CY | 10.04.2013 | ||
CZ | 10.04.2013 | ||
DK | 10.04.2013 | ||
EE | 10.04.2013 | ||
FI | 10.04.2013 | ||
IT | 10.04.2013 | ||
LT | 10.04.2013 | ||
LV | 10.04.2013 | ||
MC | 10.04.2013 | ||
NL | 10.04.2013 | ||
PL | 10.04.2013 | ||
RO | 10.04.2013 | ||
SE | 10.04.2013 | ||
SI | 10.04.2013 | ||
SK | 10.04.2013 | ||
BG | 10.07.2013 | ||
GR | 11.07.2013 | ||
ES | 21.07.2013 | ||
IS | 10.08.2013 | ||
PT | 12.08.2013 | ||
IE | 11.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | AT | 10.04.2013 | |
CY | 10.04.2013 | ||
CZ | 10.04.2013 | ||
DK | 10.04.2013 | ||
EE | 10.04.2013 | ||
FI | 10.04.2013 | ||
IT | 10.04.2013 | ||
LT | 10.04.2013 | ||
LV | 10.04.2013 | ||
MC | 10.04.2013 | ||
NL | 10.04.2013 | ||
PL | 10.04.2013 | ||
RO | 10.04.2013 | ||
SE | 10.04.2013 | ||
SI | 10.04.2013 | ||
SK | 10.04.2013 | ||
BG | 10.07.2013 | ||
GR | 11.07.2013 | ||
ES | 21.07.2013 | ||
IS | 10.08.2013 | ||
PT | 12.08.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | AT | 10.04.2013 | |
CY | 10.04.2013 | ||
CZ | 10.04.2013 | ||
DK | 10.04.2013 | ||
EE | 10.04.2013 | ||
FI | 10.04.2013 | ||
IT | 10.04.2013 | ||
LT | 10.04.2013 | ||
LV | 10.04.2013 | ||
NL | 10.04.2013 | ||
PL | 10.04.2013 | ||
RO | 10.04.2013 | ||
SE | 10.04.2013 | ||
SI | 10.04.2013 | ||
SK | 10.04.2013 | ||
BG | 10.07.2013 | ||
GR | 11.07.2013 | ||
ES | 21.07.2013 | ||
IS | 10.08.2013 | ||
PT | 12.08.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AT | 10.04.2013 | |
CY | 10.04.2013 | ||
DK | 10.04.2013 | ||
EE | 10.04.2013 | ||
FI | 10.04.2013 | ||
LT | 10.04.2013 | ||
LV | 10.04.2013 | ||
NL | 10.04.2013 | ||
PL | 10.04.2013 | ||
SE | 10.04.2013 | ||
SI | 10.04.2013 | ||
BG | 10.07.2013 | ||
GR | 11.07.2013 | ||
ES | 21.07.2013 | ||
IS | 10.08.2013 | ||
PT | 12.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | AT | 10.04.2013 | |
CY | 10.04.2013 | ||
FI | 10.04.2013 | ||
LT | 10.04.2013 | ||
LV | 10.04.2013 | ||
NL | 10.04.2013 | ||
PL | 10.04.2013 | ||
SE | 10.04.2013 | ||
SI | 10.04.2013 | ||
BG | 10.07.2013 | ||
GR | 11.07.2013 | ||
ES | 21.07.2013 | ||
IS | 10.08.2013 | ||
PT | 12.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/50] | AT | 10.04.2013 | |
FI | 10.04.2013 | ||
LT | 10.04.2013 | ||
LV | 10.04.2013 | ||
NL | 10.04.2013 | ||
PL | 10.04.2013 | ||
SE | 10.04.2013 | ||
SI | 10.04.2013 | ||
BG | 10.07.2013 | ||
GR | 11.07.2013 | ||
ES | 21.07.2013 | ||
IS | 10.08.2013 | ||
PT | 12.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | AT | 10.04.2013 | |
FI | 10.04.2013 | ||
LT | 10.04.2013 | ||
NL | 10.04.2013 | ||
SE | 10.04.2013 | ||
SI | 10.04.2013 | ||
GR | 11.07.2013 | ||
ES | 21.07.2013 | ||
IS | 10.08.2013 | ||
PT | 12.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 10.04.2013 | |
LT | 10.04.2013 | ||
NL | 10.04.2013 | ||
SI | 10.04.2013 | ||
ES | 21.07.2013 | ||
IS | 10.08.2013 | ||
PT | 12.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | LT | 10.04.2013 | |
SI | 10.04.2013 | ||
PT | 12.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | SI | 10.04.2013 | Cited in | International search | [X]FR2683703 (BUVETTE [FR]) [X] 1-6,8-10 * page 3, lines 7-12,25-36 * * page 4, line 15 - page 5, line 5 * * figures 1,2 *; | [X]FR2369793 (THAUVIN JOHNNY [FR]) [X] 1-3,5,6,10,11 * page 1, lines 1-5 * * page 2, lines 15-20 * * page 3, line 10 - page 4, line 4 * * figures 1,3-6 *; | [X]WO0038504 (MAASLAND NV [NL]; BERG KAREL VAN DEN [NL]) [X] 1-3,5,6,10 * page 1, line 29 - page 2, line 9 * * page 5, lines 16-34 * * page 8, lines 16-26 * * page 9, lines 3-22 * * figures 1,2,4,5 *; | [X]US2943601 (SHANK HOWARD C) [X] 1,2,4,5,11 * column 1, line 38 - column 2, line 30 * * figures 1,2 * |