Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2089829

EP2089829 - IMPROVEMENTS IN RESISTING THE SPREAD OF UNWANTED CODE AND DATA [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  06.11.2013
Database last updated on 09.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip14.10.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Glasswall (IP) Limited
18A St James's Place
London SW1A 1NH / GB
[2018/15]
Former [2012/33]For all designated states
Glasswall (IP) Limited
Kensal House
77 Springfield Road
Chelmsford, Essex CM2 6JG / GB
Former [2009/34]For all designated states
Glasswall (IP) Limited
2 Bramble Cottages Standon Green End
Herts SG11 1BW / GB
Inventor(s)01 / HUTTON, Samuel, Harrison
Glasswall (IP) Limited 2 Bramble Cottages Standon Green End
Herts SG11 1BW / GB
02 / GODDARD, Trevor
Glasswall (IP) Limited 2 Bramble Cottages Standon Green End
Herts SG11 1BW / GB
 [2009/34]
Representative(s)HGF Limited
8th Floor
140 London Wall
London EC2Y 5DN / GB
[N/P]
Former [2011/44]Harrison Goddard Foote
40-43 Chancery Lane London
WC2A 1JA / GB
Former [2011/39](deleted)
...
Former [2009/48]Dunlop, Hugh Christopher , et al
R.G.C. Jenkins & Co 26 Caxton Street
London SW1H 0RJ / GB
Former [2009/34]Dunlop, Hugh Christopher , et al
R.G.C. Jenkins & Co 26 Caxton Street
GB-London SW1H 0RJ / GB
Application number, filing date07824491.008.11.2007
[2009/34]
WO2007GB04258
Priority number, dateGB2006002422404.12.2006         Original published format: GB 0624224
[2009/34]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2008068450
Date:12.06.2008
Language:EN
[2008/24]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2089829
Date:19.08.2009
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.06.2008
[2009/34]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP07.08.2008
ClassificationInternational:G06F21/00
[2009/34]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/34]
TitleGerman:VERBESSERUNGEN BEIM EINDÄMMEN DER VERBREITUNG VON UNERWÜNSCHTEM CODE UND UNERWÜNSCHTEN DATEN[2009/34]
English:IMPROVEMENTS IN RESISTING THE SPREAD OF UNWANTED CODE AND DATA[2009/34]
French:AMÉLIORATIONS DE LA RÉSISTANCE DE LA PROPAGATION D'UN CODE ET DE DONNÉES INDÉSIRABLES[2009/34]
Entry into regional phase17.06.2009National basic fee paid 
17.06.2009Designation fee(s) paid 
17.06.2009Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure17.06.2009Examination requested  [2009/34]
23.07.2009Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
30.01.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.05.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.07.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
25.10.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.05.2014Date of oral proceedings
11.06.2014Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
11.06.2014Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Appeal following examination07.08.2014Appeal received No.  T0017/15
21.10.2014Statement of grounds filed
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  30.01.2013
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.11.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
12.11.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
07.10.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
11.10.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
03.09.2013Renewal fee patent year 07
08.10.2014Renewal fee patent year 08
12.10.2015Renewal fee patent year 09
17.10.2016Renewal fee patent year 10
16.10.2017Renewal fee patent year 11
22.10.2018Renewal fee patent year 12
11.10.2019Renewal fee patent year 13
Cited inInternational search[XY]US2005081057  (COHEN ODED [IL], et al) [X] 1-19,26-48 * the whole document * [Y] 23,25,52,54;
 [X]GB2357939  (GFI FAX & VOICE LTD [VG]) [X] 1-4,10,17-19,30-33,39,40,47,48 * page 1 - page 10 * * figures 1-7 *;
 [XY]US2003145213  (CARBONE KEVIN J [US]) [X] 22,51 * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0038] * [Y] 23,52;
 [XY]WO2006047163  (PRIDEROCK L L C [US], et al) [X] 24,53 * page 9 * [Y] 25,54;
 [A]EP1657662  (MICROSOFT CORP [US]) [A] 5-13,34 * abstract * * paragraphs [0021] , [0022] *;
 [A]US6401210  (TEMPLETON RANDALL F [US]) [A] 14-16,43-45 * column 1, line 65 - column 2, line 4 *;
 [A]US2004054498  (SHIPP ALEXANDER [GB]) [A] 1-19,26-48 * the whole document *;
 [A]US5951698  (CHEN EVA Y [US], et al) [A] 1-19,26-48 * column 2, line 25 - column 4, line 6 *
by applicantUS2005081057